USA v. North American Islamic Trust Featured Case
Defendant: HOLY LAND FOUNDATION FOR RELIEF AND DEVELOPMENT
Plaintiff - Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Movant - Appellant: NORTH AMERICAN ISLAMIC TRUST
Case Number: 09-10875
Filed: September 9, 2009
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Presiding Judge: Robert S Carr
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
October 20, 2010 USA v. North American Islamic Trust

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2010 Filing 66 MANDATE ISSUED. Mandate pull date satisfied. [09-10875] (MKC)
October 20, 2010 Filing 65 JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [09-10875] (ARC)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [09-10875 Affirmed in Part, Reversed in Part and Remanded.] Judge: EMG , Judge: FPB , Judge: MAC. Mandate pull date is 11/10/2010 [09-10875] (ARC)
August 30, 2010 ORAL ARGUMENT HEARD before Judges Garza, Benavides, Crone. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Timothy M. Maggio arguing for Appellant North American Islamic Trust; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Vijay Shanker arguing for Appellee United States of America [09-10875] (PFT)
August 23, 2010 Filing 62 LETTER filed by Appellee USA To inform the Court that government trial counsel intends to attend the sealed oral argument.. Date of Service: 08/23/2010 via email - Attorney for Appellant(s): Maggio, Wisniewski [09-10875] (VS)
August 17, 2010 Filing 61 LETTER filed by Appellant North American Islamic Trust Letter to Clerk's Office Regarding Oral Argument Attendees. Date of Service: 08/17/2010 via email - Attorney for Appellant(s): Loose, Maggio, Stephenson, Wisniewski; Attorney for Appellee(s): Cowger, Shanker [09-10875] (KAW)
August 12, 2010 CASE CAPTION updated. Involvement terminated for Movant Joshua A. Gerstein in 09-10875. Reason: Not a party in the case and Court denied motion to view sealed documents. [09-10875] (MFY)
August 12, 2010 Filing 59 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the letter in response to Court's order of 7/27/10 denying Movant's Motion to View Sealed Documents received from Movant Mr. Joshua A. Gerstein because he is not a party to the case and Court denied his request to view sealed documents. [Mr. Gerstein will not be served with nor may he respond to anything filed in the case. No further correspondence will be sent in this matter] [09-10875] (MFY)
August 3, 2010 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kevin A. Wisniewski for party(s) Appellant North American Islamic Trust, in case 09-10875 [09-10875] (GRM)
July 27, 2010 Filing 57 COURT ORDER denying motion to unseal the briefs and record in this case filed by Movant Mr. Joshua A. Gerstein [6560629-2]; granting motion to seal oral argument filed by Appellant North American Islamic Trust [6586113-3] [09-10875] (PFT)
July 22, 2010 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument on 08/30/2010 in New Orleans in the East Courtroom -- PM session. In accordance with our policy, lead counsel only will receive via email at a later date a copy of the court's docket and an acknowledgment form. All other counsel of record should monitor the court's website for the posting of the oral argument calendars.. [09-10875] (PFT)
July 20, 2010 Filing 55 UNOPPOSED MOTION FILED by Appellant North American Islamic Trust . Date of service: 07/20/2010 via email - Attorney for Appellant(s): Loose, Maggio, Stephenson; Attorney for Appellee(s): Cowger, Shanker; [09-10875] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. UNOPPOSED MOTION to seal oral argument. [09-10875] (TMM)
June 17, 2010 Filing 54 CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 08/30/2010. [09-10875] (SME)
May 20, 2010 Filing 53 MOTION filed by Movant Mr. Joshua A. Gerstein to unseal documents (briefs and record). Date of service: 05/19/2010 [09-10875] [SUBMIT TO MERITS PANEL] (MFY)
May 20, 2010 CASE CAPTION updated. Movant Joshua A. Gerstein added to case. Reason: Filing Motion as directed per Court for party's request to unseal documents. [09-10875] (MFY)
May 13, 2010 Record Part: Exhibits, Comments: 1 env. (Doc. #'s 1, 656, 777, 778, 782, 799, 850, 851, 1356, 1358-1360, 1365, 1381, 1382, 1386-1388), Action Type: FILED [09-10875] (ALSO FILED IN 09-10560) (GRM)
May 10, 2010 Paper copies of record excerpts filed by Appellee USA in 09-10875 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [09-10875] (GRM)
May 5, 2010 Filing 49 SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant North American Islamic Trust. # of Copies Provided: 4 [09-10875] (GRM)
May 5, 2010 Filing 48 RECORD EXCERPTS MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellee USA in 09-10875 [6506103-2]. Sufficient Record Excerpts deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 05/10/2010 for Appellee United States of America. [09-10875] Excess pages allowed per court's order 5/5/2010. (GRM)
May 5, 2010 Filing 47 COURT ORDER granting motion to place brief under seal filed by Appellant North American Islamic Trust [6467644-2], granting motion to place brief under seal filed by Appellee USA [6504417-2], granting motion to place brief under seal filed by Appellant North American Islamic Trust [6525905-2]; granting motion to place record excerpts under seal filed by Appellant North American Islamic Trust [6467644-3], granting motion to place record excerpts under seal filed by Appellee USA [6504417-3], granting motion to place record excerpts under seal filed by Appellant North American Islamic Trust [6525905-3]; granting motion view sealed document filed by Appellee USA [6467667-2]; granting motion to file record excerpts in excess pages. filed by Appellee USA [6528940-2]; granting motion leave to file a supplemental document filed by Appellant North American Islamic Trust [6525429-2]; granting motion to place motion under seal filed by Appellee USA [6506012-2] Judge(s): JLD. [09-10875] (GRM)
April 30, 2010 Paper copies of appellant reply brief filed by Appellant North American Islamic Trust in 09-10875 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [09-10875] (GRM)
April 30, 2010 Filing 45 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant North American Islamic Trust For Leave To File Supplemental Record Excerpts [6525429-2]. Date of service: 04/30/2010 via email - Attorney for Appellant(s): Loose, Maggio; Attorney for Appellee(s): Cowger, Shanker; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Stephenson [09-10875] (TMM)
April 29, 2010 Filing 44 APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by North American Islamic Trust. # of Copies Provided: 0 Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 05/04/2010 for Appellant North American Islamic Trust. [09-10875] (GRM)
April 29, 2010 Filing 43 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant North American Islamic Trust to place reply brief under seal [6525905-2], to place supplemental record excerpts under seal [6525905-3]. Date of service: 04/29/2010 [09-10875] (MFY)
April 29, 2010 Filing 42 MOTION AND/OR DOCUMENT UNDER TEMPORARY SEAL pending a ruling by the court filed by Appellant North American Islamic Trust For Leave To File Under Seal Appellant's Reply Brief and Record Excerpts This document is unopposed. Date of service: 04/29/2010 via email - Attorney for Appellant(s): Loose, Maggio; Attorney for Appellee(s): Cowger, Shanker; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Stephenson [09-10875] (TMM)
April 19, 2010 1st SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Record Part: Supp Electronic Tran, No. of Volumes: 46; Record Part: SuppPaper Transcript, No. of Volumes: 1; Record Part: SEALED EXHIBITS, Comments: 1 env. (Sealed Transcript) [09-10875] (GRM)
April 19, 2010 RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Record Part: Electronic Pleadings, No. of Volumes: 8; Record Part: ElectronicTranscript, No. of Volumes: 6 [09-10875] ( Volumes 1-3 As to Holy Land) ( Volume 4 As to Baker) (Volume 5 As to El-Mezain) (Volume 6 As to Elashi) ( Volume 7 As to Abdulqader) (Volume 8 As to Odeh) (Volumes 9 & 10 As to Baker) (Volume 11 As to El-Mezain) ( Volume 12 As to Elashi) (Volume 13 As to Abdulqader) (Volume 14 As to Odeh) (GRM)
April 8, 2010 Paper copies of appellee brief filed by Appellee USA in 09-10875 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [09-10875] (GRM)
April 7, 2010 PHONE EXTENSION CONFIRMED for Appellant North American Islamic Trust. Extension granted to and including 04/29/2010. Reply Brief deadline updated to 04/29/2010 for Appellant North American Islamic Trust [09-10875] (GRM)
April 6, 2010 Filing 37 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee USA to place motion under seal [6506012-2]. Date of service: 04/06/2010 via email - Attorney for Appellant(s): Loose, Maggio, Stephenson; Attorney for Appellee(s): Cowger, Shanker [09-10875] (VS)
April 5, 2010 Filing 36 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee USA to file record excerpts in excess pages [6528940-2]. Date of service: 04/05/2010 [09-10875] (MFY)
April 5, 2010 Filing 35 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellee USA. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as they require motion to file in excess pages. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 04/19/2010 for Appellee United States of America [09-10875] (GRM)
April 5, 2010 Filing 34 APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Appellee USA. # of Copies Provided: 0 E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Reply Brief due on 04/22/2010 for Appellant North American Islamic Trust. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/12/2010 for Appellee United States of America. [09-10875] (GRM)
April 5, 2010 Filing 33 MOTION AND/OR DOCUMENT UNDER TEMPORARY SEAL pending a ruling by the court filed by Appellee USA This document is unopposed. Date of service: 04/05/2010 via email - Attorney for Appellant(s): Loose, Maggio, Stephenson; Attorney for Appellee(s): Cowger, Shanker [09-10875] (VS)
April 5, 2010 Filing 32 MOTION AND/OR DOCUMENT UNDER TEMPORARY SEAL pending a ruling by the court filed by Appellee USA This document is unopposed. Date of service: 04/05/2010 via email - Attorney for Appellant(s): Loose, Maggio, Stephenson; Attorney for Appellee(s): Cowger, Shanker [09-10875] (VS)
April 5, 2010 Filing 31 MOTION AND/OR DOCUMENT UNDER TEMPORARY SEAL pending a ruling by the court filed by Appellee USA This document is unopposed. Date of service: 04/05/2010 via email - Attorney for Appellant(s): Loose, Maggio, Stephenson; Attorney for Appellee(s): Cowger, Shanker [09-10875] (VS)
April 5, 2010 Filing 30 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee USA to place brief under seal [6504417-2], to place record excerpts under seal [6504417-3]. Date of service: 04/05/2010 via email - Attorney for Appellant(s): Loose, Maggio, Stephenson; Attorney for Appellee(s): Cowger, Shanker [09-10875] (VS)
February 15, 2010 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Vijay Shanker for party(s) Appellee USA, in case 09-10875 [09-10875] (GRM)
February 11, 2010 Filing 28 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee USA to view sealed record. Date of service: 02/10/2010 [09-10875] (KSW)
February 10, 2010 Filing 27 CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellee's brief filed by Appellee USA [6466655-2] E/Res's Brief deadline updated to 04/05/2010 for Appellee United States of America. [09-10875] (GRM)
February 10, 2010 Filing 26 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee USA to extend time to file brief of appellee until 04/02/2010 [6466655-2]. Date of service: 02/09/2010 [09-10875] (KSW)
February 2, 2010 Filing 25 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant North American Islamic Trust to place brief under seal [6467644-2], to place record excerpts under seal [6467644-3]. Date of service: 02/01/2010 [09-10875] (KSW)
February 2, 2010 Filing 24 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant North American Islamic Trust. # of Copies Provided: 4 (2 vols.) ; [09-10875] (GRM)
February 2, 2010 Filing 23 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by North American Islamic Trust. # of Copies Provided: 7 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 03/04/2010 for Appellee United States of America [09-10875] (GRM)
February 1, 2010 NOTICE RECEIVED FROM DISTRICT COURT.Record Part: Sup ROA Cert by DCt, Action Type: FILED [09-10875] (GRM)
January 25, 2010 Filing 21 COURT ORDER granting motion view sealed document filed by Appellant North American Islamic Trust [6447255-2]; granting motion to place motion under seal filed by Appellant North American Islamic Trust [6447241-2] Judge(s): JLD. [09-10875] (GRM)
January 14, 2010 Filing 20 CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant North American Islamic Trust [6448411-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 02/01/2010 for Appellant North American Islamic Trust. [09-10875] (GRM)
January 13, 2010 Filing 19 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant North American Islamic Trust to extend time to file brief as appellant until 02/01/2010 [6448411-2]. Date of service: 01/12/2010 [09-10875] (KSW)
January 5, 2010 Filing 18 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant North American Islamic Trust to view sealed documents. Date of service: 01/04/2010 [09-10875] (KSW)
January 5, 2010 Filing 17 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant North American Islamic Trust to place motion to view sealed documents under seal [6447241-2]. Date of service: 01/04/2010 [09-10875] (KSW)
December 3, 2009 PHONE EXTENSION CONFIRMED for Appellant North American Islamic Trust. Extension granted to and including 01/20/2010. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 01/20/2010 for Appellant North American Islamic Trust [09-10875] (GRM)
November 11, 2009 Filing 15 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 12/21/2009 for Appellant North American Islamic Trust. [09-10875] (GRM)
November 3, 2009 NOTICE RECEIVED FROM DISTRICT COURT. Record Part: ROA Certified by DCt, Action Type: FILED Certified ROA due deadline satisfied. [09-10875] (GRM)
November 3, 2009 EXTENSION OF TIME GRANTED to the District Court to prepare the Certified ROA until 11/06/2009. Notice of Certified ROA due on 11/06/2009 [09-10875] (DC advised the record is very large) (MCS)
October 28, 2009 EXTENSION OF TIME GRANTED to the District Court to prepare the Certified ROA until 10/30/2009. Notice of Certified ROA due on 10/30/2009 [09-10875] (MCS)
October 21, 2009 EXTENSION OF TIME GRANTED to the District Court to prepare the Certified ROA until 10/27/2009. Notice of Certified ROA due on 10/27/2009 [09-10875] (MCS)
October 13, 2009 EXTENSION OF TIME GRANTED to the District Court to prepare the Certified ROA until 10/20/2009. Notice of Certified ROA due on 10/20/2009 [09-10875] (MFY)
October 6, 2009 EXTENSION OF TIME GRANTED to the District Court to prepare the Certified ROA until 10/13/2009. Notice of Certified ROA due on 10/13/2009 [09-10875] (MCS)
September 24, 2009 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. James T. Jacks is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:not participating. [09-10875] (GRM)
September 24, 2009 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Susan B Cowger for party(s) Appellee USA, in case 09-10875 [09-10875] (GRM)
September 21, 2009 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Robert M Stephenson and Timothy M Maggio for party(s) North American Islamic Trust Appellant North American Islamic Trust, in case 09-10875 [09-10875] (GRM)
September 17, 2009 Request issued to district court (via email) to CERTIFY THE RECORD ON APPEAL.Notice of Certified ROA Due on 10/02/2009. [09-10875] (POK)
September 17, 2009 FEE PAID by Appellant North American Islamic Trust. Fee deadline satisfied [09-10875] (POK)
September 14, 2009 Filing 3 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant North American Islamic Trust advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [09-10875] (MCS)
September 14, 2009 Filing 2 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [6365382-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 09/29/2009 for Appellant North American Islamic Trust. Fee due on 09/24/2009 for Appellant North American Islamic Trust. [09-10875] (GRM)
September 9, 2009 Filing 1 NON-DIRECT CRIMINAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant North American Islamic Trust [09-10875] (MKC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. North American Islamic Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Susan Cowger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLY LAND FOUNDATION FOR RELIEF AND DEVELOPMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant - appellant: NORTH AMERICAN ISLAMIC TRUST
Represented By: Timothy M. Maggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?