Abigail Fisher, et al v. State of Texas, et al Featured Case
Plaintiff - Appellant: ABIGAIL NOEL FISHER and RACHEL MULTER MICHALEWICZ
Defendant - Appellee: UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN, DAVID B. PRYOR, Executive Vice Chancellor for Academic Affairs in His Official Capacity, WILLIAM POWERS, JR., President of the University of Texas at Austin in His Official Capacity, BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY SYSTEM, BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM, JOHN W. BARNHILL, JR., as Member of the Board of Regents in His Official Capacity, R. STEVEN HICKS, as Member of the Board of Regents in His Official Capacity, H SCOTT CAVEN, JR., as Member of the Board of Regents in His Official Capacity, WILLIAM EUGENE POWELL, as Member of the Board of Regents in His Official Capacity, JAMES R. HUFFINES, as Member of the Board of Regents in His Official Capacity, JANIECE LONGORIA, as Member of the Board of Regents in Her Official Capacity, COLLEEN MCHUGH, as Member of the Board of Regents in Her Official Capacity, ROBERT B. ROWLING, as Member of the Board of Regents in His Official Capacity, ROBERT L. STILLWELL, as Member of the Board of Regents in His Official Capacity, JAMES D. DANNENBAUM, as Member of the Board of Regents in His Official Capacity, PAUL FOSTER, as Member of the Board of Regents in His Official Capacity, PRINTICE L. GARY, as Member of the Board of Regents in His Official Capacity, BRUCE WALKER, Vice Provost and Director of Undergraduate Admissions in His Official Capacity, KEDRA ISHOP, Vice Provost and Director of Undergraduate Admissions in His Official Capacity, KENNETH I. SHINE, Interim Chancellor of the University of Texas System in His Official Capacity and FRANCISCO G. CIGARRO, MD, Interim Chancellor of the University of Texas System in His Official Capacity
Amicus Curiae: THE ASIAN AMERICAN LEGAL FOUNDATION, MOUNTAIN STATES LEGAL FOUNDATION, PACIFIC LEGAL FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL RIGHTS INSTITUTE, CENTER FOR EQUAL OPPORTUNITY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SCHOLARS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, NEW YORK LAW SCHOOL, RACIAL JUSTICE PROJECT, ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN LEGAL CENTER, ASIAN AMERICAN INSTITUTE, ASIAN LAW CAUCUS, ASIAN AMERICAN JUSTICE CENTER, TEXAS LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS, BLACK STUDENT ALLIANCE AT THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN, NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATIONAL FUND, INC., AMERICAN COUNCIL OF EDUCATION, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF COMMUNITY COLLEGES, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF STATE COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY PROFESSORS, THE AMERICAN COLLEGE PERSONNEL ASSOCIATION, THE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES, AMERICAN DENTAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, THE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN UNIVERSITIES, THE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, THE ASSOCIATION OF PUBLIC AND LAND-GRANT UNIVERSITIES, THE ASSOCIATION OF RESEARCH LIBRARIES, HISPANIC ASSOCIATION OF COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY BUSINESS OFFICERS and NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF INDEPENDENT COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
Case Number: 09-50822
Filed: September 18, 2009
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 1, 2011 Abigail Fisher, et al v. State of Texas, et al
June 17, 2011 Summary Abigail Fisher, et al v. State of Texas, et al
July 15, 2014 Summary Fisher, et al. v. State of Texas, et al.
November 12, 2014 Summary Abigail Fisher, et al v. State of Texas, et al

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2012 Filing 107 CERTIFIED RECORD ON APPEAL TRANSMITTED to United States Supreme Court on 07/25/2012. 5th Circuit Volumes Transmitted: 2. [09-50822] (MVM)
July 25, 2012 Filing 106 RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from the district court for the Supreme Court. The entire record on appeal (Envelope 1; Box: 1; Pleadings: 9; Transcripts: 3) was requested. [09-50822] (MVM)
February 22, 2012 Filing 105 SUPREME COURT ORDER received granting petition for writ of certiorari filed by Appellant Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher in 09-50822 on 02/21/2012. [7021042-1] [09-50822] (LGL)
September 20, 2011 Filing 104 SUPREME COURT NOTICE that petition for writ of certiorari [6907928-2] was filed by Appellant Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher on 09/15/2011. Supreme Court Number: 11-345. [09-50822] (LGL)
June 17, 2011 Filing 103 MANDATE ISSUED FORTHWITH. [09-50822] (NFD)
June 17, 2011 Filing 102 COURT ORDER denying petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellants Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher and Ms. Rachel Multer Michalewicz [6729784-2] With Poll (IN DETAIL)(EHJ, with EGJ,JES,EBC, PRO JOIN DISSENTS) . [09-50822] (RMF)
June 3, 2011 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Kimberly Liu is designated as inactive in this case. Reason: We received a letter from Ms. Liu advising to withdraw her appearance. [09-50822] (MCS)
June 2, 2011 Filing 100 LETTER filed by Amici Curiae Black Student Alliance at the University of Texas at Austin and NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund Inc Letter from KIMBERLY LIU re Withdrawal of Appearance as Counsel. Date of Service: June 2, 2011 via email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae(s): Adegbile, Archer, Civin, Detamore, Flynn, Hacker, Hinojosa, Keller, Liu, Perales, Sandefur, Srinivasan, Su, Thome; Attorney for Appellant(s): Consovoy, Evans, McCarthy, Terrill; Attorney for Appellee(s): Ho, Hughes, Mitchell; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae(s): Eng, Fauth, Fox; Attorney for Appellant: Rein [09-50822] (Kimberly Anna Liu )
March 9, 2011 Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Amicus Curiae Asian American Legal Foundation in 09-50822 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 20. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [09-50822] (RSM)
March 7, 2011 Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Amicus Curiae Mountain States Legal Foundation in 09-50822 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 20. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [09-50822] (RFP)
March 4, 2011 Filing 97 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Black Student Alliance at the University of Texas at Austin and NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.. Consent is Not Necessary a Motion has been Granted. # of Copies Provided: 20 [09-50822] (RFP)
March 4, 2011 Filing 96 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Asian American Legal Foundation. Consent is Not Necessary a Motion has been Granted. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 03/09/2011 for Amicus Curiae Asian American Legal Foundation. [09-50822] (RFP)
March 4, 2011 Filing 95 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Mountain States Legal Foundation. Consent is Not Necessary a Motion has been Granted. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 03/11/2011 for Amicus Curiae Mountain States Legal Foundation. [09-50822] (RFP)
March 4, 2011 Filing 94 COURT ORDER granting motion to file amicus brief filed by Amicus Curiae Asian American Legal Foundation [6736497-2], granting motion to file amicus brief by The Black Student Alliance @ the University of TX and NAACP [6753126-2], granting motion to file amicus brief by Mountain States Legal Foundation [6735114-2] Judge(s): PEH. [09-50822] (RFP)
March 1, 2011 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Anurima Bhargava is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:Ms. Bhargava is no longer employed by the NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.. [09-50822] (MCS)
March 1, 2011 Filing 92 UNOPPOSED MOTION by The Black Student Alliance at the University of Texas at Austin and the NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. to file amicus brief [6753126-2] Date of service: 03/01/2011 via email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae(s): Adegbile, Archer, Bhargava, Civin, Detamore, Flynn, Hacker, Hinojosa, Keller, Liu, Perales, Sandefur, Srinivasan, Su, Thome; Attorney for Appellant(s): Consovoy, Evans, McCarthy, Terrill; Attorney for Appellee(s): Ho, Hughes, Mitchell; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae(s): Eng, Fauth, Fox; Attorney for Appellant: Rein [09-50822] (Joshua Ian Civin )
March 1, 2011 Filing 91 LETTER filed by Amici Curiae Black Student Alliance at the University of Texas at Austin and NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. Notice of the withdrawal of the appearance of Anurima Bhargava on behalf of amici. Date of Service: 03/01/2011 via email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae(s): Adegbile, Archer, Bhargava, Civin, Detamore, Flynn, Hacker, Hinojosa, Keller, Liu, Perales, Sandefur, Srinivasan, Su, Thome; Attorney for Appellant(s): Consovoy, Evans, McCarthy, Terrill; Attorney for Appellee(s): Ho, Hughes, Mitchell; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae(s): Eng, Fauth, Fox; Attorney for Appellant: Rein [09-50822] (Joshua Ian Civin )
February 22, 2011 Filing 90 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Board of Regents of the University of Texas System, Mr. Francisco G. Cigarro, M.D., Mr. James D. Dannenbaum, Mr. Paul Foster, Mr. Printice L. Gary, Mr. R. Steven Hicks, Mr. James R. Huffines, Mr. Kedra Ishop, Ms. Janiece Longoria, Ms. Colleen McHugh, Mr. William Eugene Powell, Mr. William Powers, Jr., Mr. David B. Pryor, Mr. Robert L. Stillwell and University of Texas at Austin [6747003-1] to the petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellants Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher and Ms. Rachel Multer Michalewicz in 09-50822 [6729784-2] Date of Service: 02/22/2011 via email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae(s): Adegbile, Archer, Bhargava, Civin, Detamore, Eng, Fauth, Flynn, Fox, Hacker, Hinojosa, Keller, Liu, Perales, Sandefur, Srinivasan, Su, Thome; Attorney for Appellant(s): Consovoy, Evans, McCarthy, Rein, Terrill; Attorney for Appellee(s): Ho, Hughes, Mitchell. [09-50822] (Jonathan F. Mitchell )
February 9, 2011 Paper copies of petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellants Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher and Ms. Rachel Multer Michalewicz in 09-50822 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 20. Paper Copies of Rehearing due deadline satisfied. [09-50822] (SDH)
February 9, 2011 Filing 88 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Amicus Curiae Asian American Legal Foundation for leave to file amicus brief in support of petitoin for rehearing en banc [6736497-2]. Date of service: 02/09/2011 via email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae(s): Adegbile, Archer, Bhargava, Civin, Detamore, Flynn, Hacker, Hinojosa, Keller, Liu, Perales, Sandefur, Srinivasan, Su, Thome; Attorney for Appellant(s): Consovoy, Evans, McCarthy, Terrill; Attorney for Appellee(s): Ho, Hughes, Mitchell; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae(s): Eng, Fauth, Fox; Attorney for Appellant: Rein [09-50822] (Ashley C. Keller )
February 8, 2011 Filing 87 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Amicus brief because need permission to file; motion is required [09-50822] (RFP)
February 7, 2011 Filing 86 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Mountain States Legal Foundation to file amicus brief [6735114-2] Date of service: 02/07/2011 via email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae(s): Adegbile, Archer, Bhargava, Civin, Detamore, Flynn, Hacker, Hinojosa, Keller, Liu, Perales, Sandefur, Srinivasan, Su, Thome; Attorney for Appellant(s): Consovoy, Evans, McCarthy, Terrill; Attorney for Appellee(s): Ho, Hughes, Mitchell; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae(s): Eng, Fauth, Fox; Attorney for Appellant: Rein [09-50822] (James Scott Detamore )
February 3, 2011 RESPONSE DUE to court order Court directive requesting a response [6730039-2]Response/Opposition deadline updated to 02/22/2011 per court order dated 2/3/11 [09-50822] (RFP)
February 3, 2011 Filing 84 COURT ORDER granting motion to extend time to file a response filed by Appellees University of Texas at Austin, Ms. Colleen McHugh, Board of Regents of the University of Texas System, Mr. David B. Pryor, Mr. William Powers, Jr., Mr. James R. Huffines, Ms. Janiece Longoria, Mr. James D. Dannenbaum, Mr. Paul Foster, Mr. Printice L. Gary, Mr. R. Steven Hicks, Mr. William Eugene Powell, Mr. Robert L. Stillwell, Mr. Kedra Ishop and Mr. Francisco G. Cigarro, M.D. [6731720-2] Judge(s): PEH. [09-50822] (RFP)
February 2, 2011 Filing 83 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Board of Regents of the University of Texas System, Mr. Francisco G. Cigarro, M.D., Mr. James D. Dannenbaum, Mr. Paul Foster, Mr. Printice L. Gary, Mr. R. Steven Hicks, Mr. James R. Huffines, Mr. Kedra Ishop, Ms. Janiece Longoria, Ms. Colleen McHugh, Mr. William Eugene Powell, Mr. William Powers, Jr., Mr. David B. Pryor, Mr. Robert L. Stillwell and University of Texas at Austin to extend the time to file a response to the petition for rehearing en banc [6729784-2] filed by Appellants Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher and Ms. Rachel Multer Michalewicz in 09-50822 until 02/22/2011 at 11:00 pm [6731720-2]. Date of service: 02/02/2011 via email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae(s): Adegbile, Archer, Bhargava, Civin, Detamore, Eng, Fauth, Flynn, Fox, Hacker, Hinojosa, Keller, Liu, Perales, Sandefur, Srinivasan, Su, Thome; Attorney for Appellant(s): Consovoy, Evans, McCarthy, Rein, Terrill; Attorney for Appellee(s): Ho, Hughes, Mitchell [09-50822] (Joseph David Hughes )
February 2, 2011 RESPONSE DUE to court order Court directive requesting a response from appellees to appellants' petition for rehearing en banc. [6730039-2]Response/Opposition deadline updated to 02/15/2011 [09-50822] (POK)
February 2, 2011 Filing 81 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: to advise counsel for appellees that the court has decided to allow them 14 days within which to file the response to the rehearing en banc [09-50822] (POK)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REVISED PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [6719099-2] [09-50822] (DTG)
February 1, 2011 Filing 79 COURT DIRECTIVE ISSUED requesting a response Response/Opposition to the petition for rehearing en banc filed by appellants and due on 02/11/2011. [09-50822] (POK)
February 1, 2011 Filing 78 PETITION filed by Appellants Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher and Ms. Rachel Multer Michalewicz for rehearing en banc [6729784-2]. Date of Service: 02/01/2011 via email - Attorney for (null)(s): Hughes, Mitchell; Attorney for Amicus Curiae(s): Adegbile, Archer, Bhargava, Civin, Detamore, Eng, Fauth, Flynn, Fox, Hacker, Hinojosa, Keller, Liu, Perales, Sandefur, Srinivasan, Su, Thome; Attorney for Appellant(s): Consovoy, Evans, McCarthy, Rein, Terrill [09-50822] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. PETITION filed by Appellants Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher and Ms. Rachel Multer Michalewicz for rehearing en banc [6729784-2] Number of Copies:0. Mandate pull date canceled.. Paper Copies of Rehearing due on 02/07/2011 for Appellant Abigail Noel Fisher and Appellant Rachel Multer Michalewicz.. Date of Service: 02/01/2011 [09-50822] (Claire Evans )
January 18, 2011 Filing 77 JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [09-50822] (JRC)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [09-50822 Affirmed] Judge: CDK , Judge: PEH , Judge: EMG. Mandate pull date is 02/08/2011 [09-50822] (JRC)
January 3, 2011 APPEARANCE FORM FILED Attorney Jonathan Franklin Mitchell for Appellee Francisco G. Cigarro in 09-50822, Appellee Kedra Ishop in 09-50822,Appellee Printice L. Gary in 09-50822, Appellee Paul Foster in 09-50822,Appellee James D. Dannenbaum in 09-50822, Appellee Robert L. Stillwell in 09-50822, Appellee Colleen McHugh in 09-50822, Appellee Janiece Longoria in 09-50822, Appellee James R. Huffines in 09-50822, Appellee William Eugene Powell in 09-50822, Appellee R. Steven Hicks in 09-50822,Appellee Board of Regents of the University of Texas System in 09-50822 Appellee William Powers Jr. in 09-50822, AAppellee David B. Pryor in 09-50822, University of Texas at Austin in 09-50822 [09-50822] (RFP)
December 28, 2010 Attorney Jonathan Mitchell added as counsel of record for (null) University of Texas at Austin, Appellees David B. Pryor, William Powers Jr., Board of Regents of the University of Texas System, R. Steven Hicks, William Eugene Powell, James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, Robert L. Stillwell, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Kedra Ishop and Francisco G. Cigarro in 09-50822 [09-50822] (RFP)
August 3, 2010 ORAL ARGUMENT HEARD before Judges King, Higginbotham, Garza. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Joshua Ian Civin arguing for Amicus Curiaes Black Student Alliance at the University of Texas at Austin and Inc. NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund; Arguing Person Information Updated for: James C. Ho arguing for Appellees University of Texas at Austin, David B. Pryor, William Powers Jr., James R. Huffines, Janiece Longoria, Colleen McHugh, James D. Dannenbaum, Paul Foster, Printice L. Gary, Board of Regents of the University of Texas System, R. Steven Hicks, William Eugene Powell, Robert L. Stillwell, Kedra Ishop, and Francisco G. Cigarro; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Bert W Rein arguing for Appellants Abigail Noel Fisher and Rachel Multer Michalewicz [09-50822] (VLB)
July 19, 2010 Filing 72 COURT ORDER granting unopposed motion to participate in oral argument using five minutes of appellees' allotted time filed by Amici Curiae Black Student Alliance at the University of Texas at Austin and NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. [6583822-2] [09-50822] (VLB)
July 16, 2010 Filing 71 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Amici Curiae Black Student Alliance at the University of Texas at Austin and NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. to participate in oral argument [6583822-2]. Date of service: 07/16/2010 via email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae(s): Adegbile, Archer, Bhargava, Civin, Detamore, Flynn, Hacker, Hinojosa, Keller, Liu, Perales, Sandefur, Srinivasan, Su, Thome; Attorney for Appellant(s): Consovoy, Evans, McCarthy, Terrill; Attorney for Appellee(s): Ho, Hughes; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae(s): Eng, Fauth, Fox; Attorney for Appellant: Rein [09-50822] (Joshua Ian Civin )
June 21, 2010 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument on 08/03/2010 in New Orleans in the West Courtroom -- AM session. In accordance with our policy, lead counsel only will receive at a later date via email a copy of the court's docket and an acknowledgment form. All other counsel of record should monitor the court's website for the posting of the oral argument calendars.. [09-50822] (VLB)
June 15, 2010 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) William Spencer Consovoy for party(s) Rachel Multer Michalewicz Appellant Abigail Noel Fisher, in case 09-50822 [09-50822] (RFP)
June 11, 2010 Filing 68 CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 08/02/2010. [09-50822] (GAM)
April 26, 2010 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Linda Frances Thome for party(s) Amicus Curiae USA, in case 09-50822 [09-50822] (RFP)
April 16, 2010 Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Amicus Curiae Texas League of United Latin American Citizens in 09-50822 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [09-50822] (RFP)
April 15, 2010 Filing 65 SHOW CAUSE ORDER issued to Mr. Sri Srinivasan for Texas League of United Latin American Citizens for failure to submit paper copies of the brief. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/30/2010 for Amicus Curiae Texas League of United Latin American Citizens [09-50822] (RFP)
March 30, 2010 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Vincent Adrian Eng for party(s) Amicus Curiae Asian American Justice Center, in case 09-50822 [09-50822] (RFP)
March 30, 2010 EXTENSION CONFIRMED for Amicus Curiae Texas League of United Latin American Citizens. Extension granted to and including 04/05/2010. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/05/2010 for Amicus Curiae Texas League of United Latin American Citizens [09-50822] (RFP)
March 29, 2010 RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Record Part: SEALED EXHIBITS, Comments: 1 envelope (docs 52 & 54) ROA deadline satisfied. [09-50822] (RFP)
March 26, 2010 Paper copies of appellant reply brief filed by Appellants Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher and Ms. Rachel Multer Michalewicz in 09-50822 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [09-50822] (RFP)
March 25, 2010 Filing 60 APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher and Ms. Rachel Multer Michalewicz. Date of service: 03/25/2010 via email - Attorney for Appellee(s): Ho, Hughes [09-50822] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher and Ms. Rachel Multer Michalewicz. . # of Copies Provided: 0 Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 03/30/2010 for Appellant Abigail Noel Fisher and Appellant Rachel Multer Michalewicz. [09-50822] (Claire Evans )
March 22, 2010 Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Amicus Curiae USA in 09-50822 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [09-50822] (RFP)
March 18, 2010 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Anurima Bhargava for party(s) Amicus Curiae Black Student Alliance at the University of Texas at Austin NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., in case 09-50822 [09-50822] (RFP)
March 18, 2010 Filing 57 Attorney Anurima Bhargava for Amicus Curia The Black Student Alliance at the University of Texas at Austin and the NAACP Legal & Educational Fund, Inc. is advised to resubmit appearance form. Reason: No signature on appearance form. [09-50822] (MAS)
March 17, 2010 RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Record Part: Electronic Pleadings, No. of Volumes: 9; Record Part: ElectronicTranscript, No. of Volumes: 3; Record Part: Exhibits, Comments: 1 box (hearing exhibits) [09-50822] (RFP)
March 15, 2010 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Debo P. Adegbile, Kimberly Anna Liu for party(s) Black Student Alliance at the University of Texas at Austin Amicus Curiae Black Student Alliance at the University of Texas at Austin NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., in case 09-50822 [09-50822] (RFP)
March 15, 2010 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Lawrence J Fox in 09-50822 for Amicus Curiaes National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Hispanic Association of Colleges and Universities, The Association of Public and Land-Grant Universities, The Association of Research Libraries, The Association of American Universities, American Dental Education Association, The Association of American Colleges and Universities, The American College Personnel Association, American Association of University Professors, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Association of Community Colleges, American Council of Education and The Association of American Medical Colleges in 09-50822 Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied [09-50822] (RFP)
March 15, 2010 Filing 53 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, AAUP, American Council of Education, American Dental Education Association, Hispanic Association of Colleges and Universities, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, The American College Personnel Association, The Association of American Colleges and Universities, The Association of American Medical Colleges, The Association of American Universities, The Association of Public and Land-Grant Universities and The Association of Research Libraries. The Consent is Included in the Brief Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires an Appearance Form from counsel signing the brief (being processed). # of Copies Provided: 7 Sufficient Brief due on 03/29/2010 for Amicus Curiae American Association of Community Colleges, Amicus Curiae American Association of State Colleges and Universities, Amicus Curiae American Association of University Professors, Amicus Curiae American Council of Education, Amicus Curiae American Dental Education Association, Amicus Curiae Hispanic Association of Colleges and Universities, Amicus Curiae National Association of College and University Business Officers, Amicus Curiae National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Amicus Curiae The American College Personnel Association, Amicus Curiae The Association of American Colleges and Universities, Amicus Curiae The Association of American Medical Colleges, Amicus Curiae The Association of American Universities, Amicus Curiae The Association of Public and Land-Grant Universities and Amicus Curiae The Association of Research Libraries. [09-50822] (RFP)
March 15, 2010 CASE CAPTION updated. Amicus Curiaes American Council of Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, AAUP, The American College Personnel Association, The Association of American Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, The Association of American Universities, The Association of American Medical Colleges, The Association of Public and Land-Grant Universities, The Association of Research Libraries, Hispanic Association of Colleges and Universities, National Association of College and University Business Officers and National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities added to case. [09-50822] (RFP)
March 15, 2010 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorneys Joshua Ian Civin and Joshua Ian Civin in 09-50822 for Amicus Curiaes Black Student Alliance at the University of Texas at Austin and NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. in 09-50822 [09-50822] (RFP)
March 15, 2010 Filing 50 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. and Black Student Alliance at the University of Texas at Austin. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 7 [09-50822] (RFP)
March 12, 2010 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorneys Julie Ann Suin 09-50822 for Amicus Curiaes Asian American Justice Center, Asian Law Caucus, Asian American Institute and Asian Pacific American Legal Center in 09-50822 Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied [09-50822] (RFP)
March 12, 2010 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Nina Perales for party(s) Amicus Curiae Texas League of United Latin American Citizens, in case 09-50822 [09-50822] (RFP)
March 12, 2010 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) David G. Hinojosa for party(s) Amicus Curiae Texas League of United Latin American Citizens, in case 09-50822 [09-50822] (RFP)
March 12, 2010 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jonathan D. Hacker for party(s) Amicus Curiae Texas League of United Latin American Citizens, in case 09-50822 [09-50822] (RFP)
March 12, 2010 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Sri Srinivasan in 09-50822 for Amicus Curiae Texas League of United Latin American Citizens in 09-50822 [09-50822] (RFP)
March 12, 2010 CASE CAPTION updated. Amicus Curiae Texas League of United Latin American Citizens added to case. [09-50822] (RFP)
March 12, 2010 Filing 43 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Asian American Institute, Asian American Justice Center, Asian Law Caucus and Asian Pacific American Legal Center. The Consent is Included in the Brief Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires an Appearance Form from counsel signing the brief. Appearance form being processed. # of Copies Provided: 7 Sufficient Brief due on 03/26/2010 for Amicus Curiae Asian American Institute, Amicus Curiae Asian American Justice Center, Amicus Curiae Asian Law Caucus and Amicus Curiae Asian Pacific American Legal Center. [09-50822] (RFP)
March 12, 2010 CASE CAPTION updated. Amicus Curiaes Asian Pacific American Legal Center, Asian American Institute, Asian Law Caucus and Asian American Justice Center added to case. [09-50822] (RFP)
March 12, 2010 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorneys Deborah Nicole Archer and Deborah Nicole Archer in 09-50822 for Amicus Curiaes New York Law School and Racial Justice Project in 09-50822 [09-50822] (RFP)
March 12, 2010 Filing 40 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Racial Justice Project and New York Law School. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 7 [09-50822] (RFP)
March 12, 2010 CASE CAPTION updated. Amicus Curiae USA added to case. . [09-50822] (RFP)
March 12, 2010 Filing 38 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Texas League of United Latin American Citizens. Date of service: 03/12/2010 via email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae(s): Detamore, Fauth, Keller, Sandefur; Attorney for Appellant(s): Evans, McCarthy, Rein, Terrill; Attorney for Appellee(s): Ho, Hughes [09-50822] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Texas League of United Latin American Citizens. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 03/19/2010 for Amicus Curiae Texas League of United Latin American Citizens. [09-50822] (Sri Srinivasan )
March 12, 2010 Filing 37 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by United States. Date of service: 03/12/2010 via US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae(s): Detamore, Fauth, Keller; Attorney for Appellant(s): McCarthy, Rein; email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Sandefur; Attorney for Appellant(s): Evans, Terrill; Attorney for Appellee(s): Ho, Hughes [09-50822] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by USA. Consent is Not Necessary as Amicus is a Government Entity. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 03/22/2010 for Amicus Curiae United States of America. [09-50822] (Diana Katherine Flynn )
March 11, 2010 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Diana Katherine Flynn in 09-50822 for Amicus Curiae United States of America in 09-50822 [09-50822] (RFP)
March 8, 2010 Filing 35 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellees Board of Regents of the University of Texas System, Mr. Francisco G Cigarro, MD, Mr. James D. Dannenbaum, Mr. Paul Foster, Mr. Printice L. Gary, Mr. R Steven Hicks, Mr. James R. Huffines, Mr. Kedra Ishop, Ms. Janiece Longoria, Ms. Colleen McHugh, Mr. William Eugene Powell, Mr. William Powers, Jr., Mr. David B Pryor, Mr. Robert L Stillwell and University of Texas at Austin. # of Copies Provided: 4 [09-50822] (RFP)
March 8, 2010 Filing 34 APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Board of Regents of the University of Texas System, Mr. Francisco G Cigarro, MD, Mr. James D. Dannenbaum, Mr. Paul Foster, Mr. Printice L. Gary, Mr. R Steven Hicks, Mr. James R. Huffines, Mr. Kedra Ishop, Ms. Janiece Longoria, Ms. Colleen McHugh, Mr. William Eugene Powell, Mr. William Powers, Jr., Mr. David B Pryor, Mr. Robert L Stillwell and University of Texas at Austin. . # of Copies Provided: 7 E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Reply Brief due on 03/25/2010 for Appellant Abigail Noel Fisher and Appellant Rachel Multer Michalewicz [09-50822] (RFP)
March 3, 2010 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Ashley C. Keller for party(s) Amicus Curiae The Asian American Legal Foundation, in case 09-50822 [09-50822] (RFP)
March 2, 2010 Filing 32 Attorney Deborah Archer for Amicus Curiae New York Law School, Racial Justice, The University of Texas at Austin is advised to resubmit appearance form. (Counsel failed to have signature on appearance.) [09-50822] (MAS)
February 1, 2010 Filing 31 CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellee's brief filed by Appellees University of Texas at Austin, Ms. Colleen McHugh, Board of Regents of the University of Texas System, Mr. David B Pryor, Mr. William Powers, Jr., Mr. James R Huffines, Ms. Janiece Longoria, Mr. James D Dannenbaum, Mr. Paul Foster, Mr. Printice L Gary, Mr. R Steven Hicks, Mr. William Eugene Powell, Mr. Robert L Stillwell, Mr. Kedra Ishop and Mr. Francisco G Cigarro, MD [6460389-2] E/Res's Brief deadline updated to 03/05/2010 for Appellee Board of Regents of the University of Texas System, Appellee Francisco G Cigarro, Appellee James D Dannenbaum, Appellee Paul Foster, Appellee Printice L Gary, Appellee R Steven Hicks, Appellee James R Huffines, Appellee Kedra Ishop, Appellee Janiece Longoria, Appellee Colleen McHugh, Appellee William Eugene Powell, Appellee William Powers Jr., Appellee David B Pryor, Appellee Robert L Stillwell and Appellee University of Texas at Austin. [09-50822] (RFP)
February 1, 2010 Filing 30 2nd UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Board of Regents of the University of Texas System, Mr. Francisco G Cigarro, MD, Mr. James D Dannenbaum, Mr. Paul Foster, Mr. Printice L Gary, Mr. R Steven Hicks, Mr. James R Huffines, Mr. Kedra Ishop, Ms. Janiece Longoria, Ms. Colleen McHugh, Mr. William Eugene Powell, Mr. William Powers, Jr., Mr. David B Pryor, Mr. Robert L Stillwell and University of Texas at Austin to extend time to file brief of appellee until 03/05/2010 [6460389-2]. Date of service: 01/29/2010 [09-50822] (POK)
January 8, 2010 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney James Scott Detamore in 09-50822 for Amicus Curiae Mountain States Legal Foundation in 09-50822 Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied [09-50822] (RFP)
January 5, 2010 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorneys Timothy Mason Sandefur, in 09-50822 for Amicus Curiaes Center for Equal Opportunity, American Civil Rights Institute, Pacific Legal Foundation and National Association of Scholars in 09-50822 Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied [09-50822] (RFP)
December 30, 2009 PHONE EXTENSION CONFIRMED for Appellees Board of Regents of the University of Texas System, Mr. Francisco G Cigarro, MD, Mr. James D Dannenbaum, Mr. Paul Foster, Mr. Printice L Gary, Mr. R Steven Hicks, Mr. James R Huffines, Mr. Kedra Ishop, Ms. Janiece Longoria, Ms. Colleen McHugh, Mr. William Eugene Powell, Mr. William Powers, Jr., Mr. David B Pryor, Mr. Robert L Stillwell and University of Texas at Austin. Extension granted to and including 02/19/2009. E/Res's Brief deadline updated to 02/19/2010 for Appellee Board of Regents of the University of Texas System, Appellee Francisco G Cigarro, Appellee James D Dannenbaum, Appellee Paul Foster, Appellee Printice L Gary, Appellee R Steven Hicks, Appellee James R Huffines, Appellee Kedra Ishop, Appellee Janiece Longoria, Appellee Colleen McHugh, Appellee William Eugene Powell, Appellee William Powers Jr., Appellee David B Pryor, Appellee Robert L Stillwell and Appellee University of Texas at Austin [09-50822] (MKC)
December 29, 2009 Filing 26 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the motion for leave to file brief amicus curiae received from Amici Curiae American Civil Rights Institute, Center for Equal Opportunity, National Association of Scholars and Pacific Legal Foundation because it is unnecessary, the consent included in brief [09-50822] (RFP)
December 29, 2009 Filing 25 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by American Civil Rights Institute, Center for Equal Opportunity, National Association of Scholars and Pacific Legal Foundation. The Consent is Included in the Brief Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires an Appearance Form from counsel signing the brief. # of Copies Provided: 7 Sufficient Brief due on 01/12/2010 for Amicus Curiae American Civil Rights Institute, Amicus Curiae Center for Equal Opportunity, Amicus Curiae National Association of Scholars and Amicus Curiae Pacific Legal Foundation. [09-50822] (RFP)
December 29, 2009 CASE CAPTION updated. Amicus Curiaes Pacific Legal Foundation, American Civil Rights Institute, Center for Equal Opportunity and National Association of Scholars added to case. Reason: amicus curiae. [09-50822] (RFP)
December 29, 2009 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Gordon Morris Fauth in 09-50822 for Amicus Curiae The Asian American Legal Foundation in 09-50822 Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied [09-50822] (RFP)
December 29, 2009 Filing 22 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Mountain States Legal Foundation. The Consent is Included in the Brief Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires an Appearance Form from counsel signing the brief. # of Copies Provided: 7 Sufficient Brief due on 01/12/2010 for Amicus Curiae Mountain States Legal Foundation. [09-50822] (RFP)
December 29, 2009 CASE CAPTION updated. Amicus Curiae Mountain States Legal Foundation added to case. Reason: amicus brief. [09-50822] (RFP)
December 29, 2009 Filing 20 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by The Asian American Legal Foundation. The Consent is Included in the Brief Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires an Appearance Form from counsel signing the brief. # of Copies Provided: 7 Sufficient Brief due on 01/12/2010 for Amicus Curiae The Asian American Legal Foundation. [09-50822] (RFP)
December 29, 2009 CASE CAPTION updated. Amicus Curiae The Asian American Legal Foundation added to case. Reason: amicus brief. [09-50822] (RFP)
December 22, 2009 Paper copies of record excerpts filed by Appellants Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher and Ms. Rachel Multer Michalewicz in 09-50822 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [09-50822] (RFP)
December 22, 2009 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellants Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher and Ms. Rachel Multer Michalewicz in 09-50822 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [09-50822] (RFP)
December 21, 2009 Filing 16 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher and Ms. Rachel Multer Michalewicz. Date of service: 12/21/2009 via email - Attorney for Appellee(s): Ho, Hughes ; [09-50822] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher and Ms. Rachel Multer Michalewicz. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 01/05/2010 for Appellant Abigail Noel Fisher and Appellant Rachel Multer Michalewicz. [09-50822] (Claire Evans )
December 21, 2009 Filing 15 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher and Ms. Rachel Multer Michalewicz. Date of service: 12/21/2009 via email - Attorney for Appellee(s): Ho, Hughes [09-50822] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher and Ms. Rachel Multer Michalewicz. . # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 01/05/2010 for Appellant Abigail Noel Fisher and Appellant Rachel Multer Michalewicz.. Appellee's Brief due on 01/20/2010 for Appellee Board of Regents of the University of Texas System, Appellee Francisco G Cigarro, Appellee James D Dannenbaum, Appellee Paul Foster, Appellee Printice L Gary, Appellee R Steven Hicks, Appellee James R Huffines, Appellee Kedra Ishop, Appellee Janiece Longoria, Appellee Colleen McHugh, Appellee William Eugene Powell, Appellee William Powers Jr., Appellee David B Pryor, Appellee Robert L Stillwell and Appellee University of Texas at Austin [09-50822] (Claire Evans )
December 11, 2009 Filing 14 COURT ORDER granting motion to substitute party filed by Appellees University of Texas at Austin, Mr. H Scott Caven, Jr., Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, Ms. Colleen McHugh, Mr. Bruce Walker, Mr. David B Pryor, Mr. William Powers, Jr., Mr. John W Barnhill, Jr., Mr. James R Huffines, Ms. Janiece Longoria, Mr. Robert B Rowling, Mr. James D Dannenbaum, Mr. Paul Foster, Mr. Printice L Gary and Mr. Kenneth I Shine [6421911-2] Appellees Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, John W Barnhill Jr., H Scott Caven Jr., Robert B Rowling, Bruce Walker and Kenneth I Shine in 09-50822 substituted by Appellees Board of Regents of the University of Texas System, R Steven Hicks, William Eugene Powell, Robert L Stillwell, Kedra Ishop and Francisco G Cigarro in 09-50822 Judge(s): CES. [09-50822] (RFP)
December 2, 2009 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Mr. John W Barnhill, Jr., Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, Mr. H Scott Caven, Jr., Mr. James D Dannenbaum, Mr. Paul Foster, Mr. Printice L Gary, Mr. James R Huffines, Ms. Janiece Longoria, Ms. Colleen McHugh, Mr. William Powers, Jr., Mr. David B Pryor, Mr. Robert B Rowling, Mr. Kenneth I Shine, University of Texas at Austin and Mr. Bruce Walker to substitute Kenneth I. Shine with Francisco G. Cigarroa, M.D., substitute Bruce Walker with Kedra Ishop, substitute John W. Barnhill, Jr., H. Scott Caven, Jr., and Robert B. Rowling with R. Steven Hicks, Wm. Eugene Powell, and Robert L. Stillwell, substitute Board of Regents of the Texas State University System with Board of Regents of the University of Texas System. Date of Service: 11/30/2009 [09-50822] (KSW)
November 16, 2009 Filing 12 CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellants Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher and Ms. Rachel Multer Michalewicz [6408820-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 12/21/2009 for Appellant Abigail Noel Fisher and Appellant Rachel Multer Michalewicz. [09-50822] (RFP)
November 13, 2009 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher and Ms. Rachel Multer Michalewicz to extend time to file brief as appellant until 12/21/2009 [6408820-2]. Date of Service: 11/12/2009 [09-50822] (POK)
October 20, 2009 Filing 10 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 11/30/2009 for Appellant Abigail Noel Fisher and Appellant Rachel Multer Michalewicz. [09-50822] (DMS)
October 15, 2009 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorneys James C. Ho in 09-50822 for Appellees Shine, Kenneth I, Walker, Bruce, Gary, Printice L, Foster, Paul, Dannenbaum, James D, Rowling, Robert B, McHugh, Colleen, Longoria, Janiece, Huffines, James R, Caven, H Scott Jr., Barnhill, John W Jr., Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, Powers, William Jr., Pryor, David B and University of Texas at Austin in 09-50822, by Attorney(s) Joseph David Hughes for party(s) James D Dannenbaum Paul Foster Board of Regents of the Texas State University System Janiece Longoria Printice L Gary William Powers Jr. H Scott Caven Jr. James R Huffines Bruce Walker Kenneth I Shine Barry D Burgdorf Robert B Rowling Appellee University of Texas at Austin John W Barnhill Jr. Colleen McHugh David B Pryor, in case 09-50822 [09-50822] (RFP)
October 14, 2009 NOTICE RECEIVED FROM DISTRICT COURT. Record Part: ROA Certified by DCt, Action Type: FILED Certified ROA due deadline satisfied. [09-50822] (DMS)
October 8, 2009 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Claire J Evans for party(s) Rachel Multer Michalewicz Appellant Abigail Noel Fisher, in case 09-50822 [09-50822] (RFP)
October 8, 2009 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Thomas R. McCarthy for party(s) Rachel Multer Michalewicz Appellant Abigail Noel Fisher, in case 09-50822 [09-50822] (RFP)
October 8, 2009 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorneys Bert W Rein and Bert W Rein in 09-50822 for Appellants Michalewicz, Rachel Multer and Fisher, Abigail Noel in 09-50822 [09-50822] (RFP)
October 5, 2009 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorneys Paul M Terrill and Paul M Terrill in 09-50822 for Appellants Michalewicz, Rachel Multer and Fisher, Abigail Noel in 09-50822 [09-50822] (RFP)
September 29, 2009 Filing 3 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher and Ms. Rachel Multer Michalewicz advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Notice of Certified ROA due on 10/14/2009 [09-50822] (MFY)
September 22, 2009 Filing 2 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [6370837-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 10/07/2009 for Appellant Abigail Noel Fisher and Appellant Rachel Multer Michalewicz. [09-50822] (RFP)
September 18, 2009 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Abigail Noel Fisher and Ms. Rachel Multer Michalewicz [09-50822] (RFP)

Search for this case: Abigail Fisher, et al v. State of Texas, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: ABIGAIL NOEL FISHER
Represented By: Bert W. Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: RACHEL MULTER MICHALEWICZ
Represented By: Bert W. Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN
Represented By: James C. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: DAVID B. PRYOR, Executive Vice Chancellor for Academic Affairs in His Official Capacity
Represented By: James C. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: WILLIAM POWERS, JR., President of the University of Texas at Austin in His Official Capacity
Represented By: James C. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM
Represented By: James C. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: JOHN W. BARNHILL, JR., as Member of the Board of Regents in His Official Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: R. STEVEN HICKS, as Member of the Board of Regents in His Official Capacity
Represented By: James C. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: H SCOTT CAVEN, JR., as Member of the Board of Regents in His Official Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: WILLIAM EUGENE POWELL, as Member of the Board of Regents in His Official Capacity
Represented By: James C. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: JAMES R. HUFFINES, as Member of the Board of Regents in His Official Capacity
Represented By: James C. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: JANIECE LONGORIA, as Member of the Board of Regents in Her Official Capacity
Represented By: James C. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: COLLEEN MCHUGH, as Member of the Board of Regents in Her Official Capacity
Represented By: James C. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: ROBERT B. ROWLING, as Member of the Board of Regents in His Official Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: ROBERT L. STILLWELL, as Member of the Board of Regents in His Official Capacity
Represented By: James C. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: JAMES D. DANNENBAUM, as Member of the Board of Regents in His Official Capacity
Represented By: James C. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: PAUL FOSTER, as Member of the Board of Regents in His Official Capacity
Represented By: James C. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: PRINTICE L. GARY, as Member of the Board of Regents in His Official Capacity
Represented By: James C. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: BRUCE WALKER, Vice Provost and Director of Undergraduate Admissions in His Official Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: KEDRA ISHOP, Vice Provost and Director of Undergraduate Admissions in His Official Capacity
Represented By: James C. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: KENNETH I. SHINE, Interim Chancellor of the University of Texas System in His Official Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: FRANCISCO G. CIGARRO, MD, Interim Chancellor of the University of Texas System in His Official Capacity
Represented By: James C. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE ASIAN AMERICAN LEGAL FOUNDATION
Represented By: Gordon Morris Fauth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MOUNTAIN STATES LEGAL FOUNDATION
Represented By: James Scott Detamore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PACIFIC LEGAL FOUNDATION
Represented By: Timothy Mason Sandefur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN CIVIL RIGHTS INSTITUTE
Represented By: Timothy Mason Sandefur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTER FOR EQUAL OPPORTUNITY
Represented By: Timothy Mason Sandefur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SCHOLARS
Represented By: Timothy Mason Sandefur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Diana Katherine Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEW YORK LAW SCHOOL
Represented By: Deborah Nicole Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RACIAL JUSTICE PROJECT
Represented By: Deborah Nicole Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN LEGAL CENTER
Represented By: Julie Ann Su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASIAN AMERICAN INSTITUTE
Represented By: Julie Ann Su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASIAN LAW CAUCUS
Represented By: Julie Ann Su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASIAN AMERICAN JUSTICE CENTER
Represented By: Julie Ann Su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TEXAS LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS
Represented By: Sri Srinivasan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BLACK STUDENT ALLIANCE AT THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN
Represented By: Joshua Ian Civin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATIONAL FUND, INC.
Represented By: Joshua Ian Civin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COUNCIL OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Lawrence J. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF COMMUNITY COLLEGES
Represented By: Lawrence J. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF STATE COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
Represented By: Lawrence J. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY PROFESSORS
Represented By: Lawrence J. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE AMERICAN COLLEGE PERSONNEL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Lawrence J. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
Represented By: Lawrence J. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN DENTAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Lawrence J. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN UNIVERSITIES
Represented By: Lawrence J. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES
Represented By: Lawrence J. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE ASSOCIATION OF PUBLIC AND LAND-GRANT UNIVERSITIES
Represented By: Lawrence J. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE ASSOCIATION OF RESEARCH LIBRARIES
Represented By: Lawrence J. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HISPANIC ASSOCIATION OF COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
Represented By: Lawrence J. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY BUSINESS OFFICERS
Represented By: Lawrence J. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF INDEPENDENT COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
Represented By: Lawrence J. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?