United Steel, Paper and Forest v. Delek Refining, Ltd., et al
Defendant / Appellee: DELEK REFINING, LIMITED
Defendant / Appellant: LOCAL 202, UNITED STEELWORKERS and UNITED STEELWORKERS AFL-CIO
Plaintiff / Appellee: DELEK US HOLDINGS, INCORPORATED
Plaintiff / Appellant: UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION
Case Number: 12-41119
Filed: October 9, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2014 MANDATE ISSUED. Mandate pull date satisfied. [12-41119] (BCL) [Entered: 08/22/2014 01:54 PM]
August 14, 2014 COURT ORDER denying petition for rehearing filed by Appellee Delek Refining, Limited [ # 7692489-2 ] Mandate pull date is 08/21/2014; denying petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellee Delek Refining, Limited [ # 7692483-2 ] Without Poll. [12-41119] (BCL) [Entered: 08/14/2014 02:52 PM]
August 1, 2014 Paper copies of petition for rehearing filed by Appellee Delek Refining, Limited in 12-41119 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. # of Copies Provided: 4. [12-41119] (CAG) [Entered: 08/01/2014 03:33 PM]
August 1, 2014 Paper copies of petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellee Delek Refining, Limited in 12-41119 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. # of Copies Provided: 20. Paper Copies of Rehearing due deadline satisfied. [12-41119] (CAG) [Entered: 08/01/2014 03:33 PM]
July 28, 2014 PETITION filed by Appellee Delek Refining, Limited for rehearing [7692489-2]. Date of Service: 07/28/2014 via US mail - Attorney for Appellants: Flynn, Kovalik; email - Attorney for Appellants: Flynn, Kovalik, Rebhorn; Attorney for Appellees: Chapman, Davis [12-41119] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. PETITION for rehearing [7692489-2] Number of Copies: 0. Paper Copies of Rehearing due on 08/04/2014 for Appellee Delek Refining, Limited.. [12-41119] (Franklin Dalton Davis ) [Entered: 07/28/2014 03:51 PM]
July 28, 2014 PETITION filed by Appellee Delek Refining, Limited for rehearing en banc [7692483-2]. Date of Service: 07/28/2014 via US mail - Attorney for Appellants: Flynn, Kovalik; email - Attorney for Appellants: Flynn, Kovalik, Rebhorn; Attorney for Appellees: Chapman, Davis [12-41119] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. PETITION for rehearing en banc [7692483-2] Number of Copies:0. Mandate pull date canceled.. Paper Copies of Rehearing due on 08/04/2014 for Appellee Delek Refining, Limited.. [12-41119] (Franklin Dalton Davis ) [Entered: 07/28/2014 03:47 PM]
July 14, 2014 COSTS TAXED: each party bear its own costs on appeal. [12-41119] (JMA) [Entered: 07/14/2014 12:30 PM]
July 14, 2014 JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [12-41119] (JMA) [Entered: 07/14/2014 12:23 PM]
July 14, 2014 UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [12-41119 Affirmed in Part, Reversed and Rendered in Part] Judge: PEH , Judge: EBC , Judge: ECP Mandate pull date is 08/04/2014 [12-41119] (JMA) [Entered: 07/14/2014 12:19 PM]
August 5, 2013 ORAL ARGUMENT HEARD before Judges Higginbotham, Clement, Prado. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Franklin Dalton Davis arguing for Appellee Limited Delek Refining; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Emma Rebecca Rebhorn arguing for Appellant Paper and Forestry United Steel, Rubber Manufacturing, Appellant United Steelworkers AFL-CIO [12-41119] (PFT) [Entered: 08/05/2013 11:49 AM]
July 17, 2013 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Emma Rebecca Rebhorn for party(s) Appellant United Steelworkers, Local 202 Appellant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Appellant United Steelworkers AFL-CIO, in case 12-41119 [12-41119] (BCL) [Entered: 07/17/2013 04:40 PM]
June 24, 2013 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellants United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, United Steelworkers AFL-CIO and United Steelworkers, Local 202 Date of Service: 06/24/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Flynn, Kovalik; Attorney for Appellees: Chapman, Davis [12-41119] (Daniel M. Kovalik ) [Entered: 06/24/2013 11:55 AM]
June 21, 2013 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the 28 J letter received from Appellants United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, United Steelworkers AFL-CIO and United Steelworkers, Local 202 because must be filed electronically [12-41119] (BCL) [Entered: 06/21/2013 02:05 PM]
June 19, 2013 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument on Monday, 08/05/2013 in New Orleans in the En Banc Courtroom -- AM session. In accordance with our policy, lead counsel only will receive via email at a later date a copy of the court's docket and an acknowledgment form. All other counsel of record should monitor the court's website for the posting of the oral argument calendars.. [12-41119] (PFT) [Entered: 06/19/2013 01:19 PM]
June 6, 2013 CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 08/05/2013. [12-41119] (GAM) [Entered: 06/06/2013 12:03 PM]
February 18, 2013 Paper copies of appellant reply brief filed by Appellant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union in 12-41119 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [12-41119] (BCL) [Entered: 02/20/2013 09:39 AM]
February 13, 2013 APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Date of service: 02/11/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Flynn, Kovalik; Attorney for Appellees: Chapman, Davis [12-41119] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0. Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 02/19/2013 for Appellants United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, United Steelworkers AFL-CIO and United Steelworkers, Local 202. [12-41119] (Patrick M. Flynn ) [Entered: 02/13/2013 10:16 AM]
February 11, 2013 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. "Reply to Appellee Delek's Response Brief and to the 28j letter" has been removed from the docket because it was filing is incorrect. Counsel is advised to refile the document under "briefs", "appellant/petitioner reply brief filed". [12-41119] (CAG) [Entered: 02/13/2013 10:23 AM]
February 11, 2013 RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Electronic Pleadings, 3; SEALED EXHIBITS, 1 ENV (doc #2); ROA deadline satisfied. [12-41119] (BCL) [Entered: 02/11/2013 03:23 PM]
January 31, 2013 Paper copies of record excerpts filed by Appellee Delek US Holdings, Incorporated in 12-41119 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [12-41119] (BCL) [Entered: 02/20/2013 09:41 AM]
January 31, 2013 Paper copies of appellee brief filed by Appellee Delek Refining, Limited in 12-41119 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [12-41119] (BCL) [Entered: 02/20/2013 09:40 AM]
January 28, 2013 RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT. ROA due on 02/13/2013 [12-41119] (BCL) [Entered: 01/28/2013 10:38 AM]
January 25, 2013 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellee Delek US Holdings, Incorporated. Date of service: 01/25/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Flynn, Kovalik; Attorney for Appellees: Chapman, Davis [12-41119] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. . # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 02/04/2013 for Appellees Delek Refining, Limited and Delek US Holdings, Incorporated. [12-41119] (Franklin Dalton Davis ) [Entered: 01/25/2013 09:59 AM]
January 25, 2013 APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Appellee Delek Refining, Limited. Date of service: 01/25/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Flynn, Kovalik; Attorney for Appellees: Chapman, Davis [12-41119] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED . # of Copies Provided: 0 E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Reply Brief due on 02/11/2013 for Appellants United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, United Steelworkers AFL-CIO and United Steelworkers, Local 202. Paper Copies of Brief due on 02/04/2013 for Appellees Delek Refining, Limited and Delek US Holdings, Incorporated. [12-41119] (Franklin Dalton Davis ) [Entered: 01/25/2013 09:55 AM]
January 4, 2013 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Daniel M. Kovalik for Appellant United Steelworkers AFL-CIO in 12-41119, Attorney Daniel M. Kovalik for Appellant United Steelworkers, Local 202 in 12-41119, Attorney Daniel M. Kovalik for Appellant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union in 12-41119 [12-41119] (BCL) [Entered: 01/04/2013 01:56 PM]
January 4, 2013 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellants United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, United Steelworkers AFL-CIO and United Steelworkers, Local 202 Date of Service: 01/04/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Flynn, Kovalik; Attorney for Appellees: Chapman, Davis [12-41119] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. (SEND TO SCREENING JUDGE AND PANEL) [12-41119] (Daniel M. Kovalik ) [Entered: 01/04/2013 10:58 AM]
January 4, 2013 LETTER filed by Appellant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Brief Errata Letter to be attached to Appellant's Brief (Document: 00512094448) filed 12-26-2012. Date of Service: 01/04/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Flynn, Kovalik; Attorney for Appellees: Chapman, Davis [12-41119] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. LETTER filed referencing appellant brief filed by Appellant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union in 12-41119 [ # 7258381-2 ]. [12-41119] (SEND TO SCREENING JUDGE & PANEL) (Patrick M. Flynn ) [Entered: 01/04/2013 10:49 AM]
January 4, 2013 Attorney Daniel M. Kovalik added as counsel of record for Appellants United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, United Steelworkers, Local 202 and United Steelworkers AFL-CIO in 12-41119 [12-41119] (BCL) [Entered: 01/04/2013 10:33 AM]
January 3, 2013 Paper copies of record excerpts filed by Appellant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union in 12-41119 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [12-41119] (BCL) [Entered: 01/04/2013 09:36 AM]
January 3, 2013 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union in 12-41119 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [12-41119] (BCL) [Entered: 01/04/2013 09:35 AM]
December 26, 2012 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union. Date of service: 12/26/2012 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Flynn; Attorney for Appellees: Chapman, Davis [12-41119] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 01/02/2013 for Appellants United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, United Steelworkers AFL-CIO and United Steelworkers, Local 202. [12-41119] (Patrick M. Flynn ) [Entered: 12/26/2012 02:04 PM]
December 26, 2012 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union. Date of service: 12/26/2012 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Flynn; Attorney for Appellees: Chapman, Davis [12-41119] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 01/28/2013 for Appellees Delek Refining, Limited and Delek US Holdings, Incorporated. Paper Copies of Brief due on 01/02/2013 for Appellants United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, United Steelworkers AFL-CIO and United Steelworkers, Local 202. [12-41119] (Patrick M. Flynn ) [Entered: 12/26/2012 01:37 PM]
November 13, 2012 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Patrick M. Flynn for Appellant United Steelworkers AFL-CIO in 12-41119, Attorney Patrick M. Flynn for Appellant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union in 12-41119, by Attorney(s) Patrick M. Flynn for party(s) Appellant United Steelworkers, Local 202, in case 12-41119 [12-41119] (BCL) [Entered: 11/14/2012 09:57 AM]
November 12, 2012 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 12/26/2012 for Appellants United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, United Steelworkers AFL-CIO and United Steelworkers, Local 202. [12-41119] (MRB) [Entered: 11/12/2012 12:44 PM]
November 12, 2012 NOTICE RECEIVED FROM DISTRICT COURT. ROA Certified by DCt, FILED [12-41119] (MRB) [Entered: 11/12/2012 12:44 PM]
November 12, 2012 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, United Steelworkers AFL-CIO and United Steelworkers, Local 202 advising no hearing took place in district court. (NOTICE WAS FILED IN DISTRICT COURT ON 10/9/12) Transcript Order ddl satisfied [12-41119] (MRB) [Entered: 11/12/2012 12:43 PM]
October 22, 2012 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Ronald Wayne Chapman Jr. for Appellee Delek US Holdings, Incorporated in 12-41119, by Attorney(s) Ronald Wayne Chapman Jr. for party(s) Appellee Delek Refining, Limited, in case 12-41119 [12-41119] (BCL) [Entered: 10/22/2012 04:59 PM]
October 19, 2012 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Franklin Dalton Davis for Appellee Delek US Holdings, Incorporated in 12-41119, Attorney Franklin Dalton Davis for Appellee Delek Refining, Limited in 12-41119 [12-41119] (BCL) [Entered: 10/22/2012 11:35 AM]
October 15, 2012 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7205441-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 10/30/2012 for Appellants United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, United Steelworkers AFL-CIO, United Steelworkers, Local 202 [12-41119] (BCL) [Entered: 10/15/2012 01:48 PM]
October 9, 2012 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, United Steelworkers AFL-CIO and United Steelworkers, Local 202 [12-41119] (BCL) [Entered: 10/09/2012 10:31 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: United Steel, Paper and Forest v. Delek Refining, Ltd., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DELEK REFINING, LIMITED
Represented By: Ronald Wayne Chapman Jr.
Represented By: Franklin Dalton Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LOCAL 202, UNITED STEELWORKERS
Represented By: Emma Rebecca Rebhorn Esq.
Represented By: Patrick M. Flynn Esq.
Represented By: Daniel M. Kovalik Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STEELWORKERS AFL-CIO
Represented By: Emma Rebecca Rebhorn Esq.
Represented By: Patrick M. Flynn Esq.
Represented By: Daniel M. Kovalik Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DELEK US HOLDINGS, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Ronald Wayne Chapman Jr.
Represented By: Franklin Dalton Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION
Represented By: Emma Rebecca Rebhorn Esq.
Represented By: Patrick M. Flynn Esq.
Represented By: Daniel M. Kovalik Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?