Jay Isaac Hollis v. Loretta Lynch, et al
Defendant / Appellee: LORETTA E. LYNCH, Attorney General of the United States and THOMAS E. BRANDON, Acting Director of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives
Amicus Curiae: FIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION, INCORPORATED, BRADLEY D. ROGERS, MADISON SOCIETY, INCORPORATED, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INCORPORATED, GUN OWNERS OF CALIFORNIA, INCORPORATED, MISSISSIPPI CARRY, INCORPORATED, INSTITUTE ON THE CONSTITUTION, HELLER FOUNDATION, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INCORPORATED, GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, CONSERVATIVE LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, LONE STAR GUN RIGHTS and COLORADO SECOND AMENDMENT ASSOCIATION
Plaintiff / Appellant: JAY AUBREY ISAAC HOLLIS, Individually and as Trustee of the Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis Revocable Living Trust
Case Number: 15-10803
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2016 MANDATE ISSUED. Mandate pull date satisfied. [15-10803] (NFD)
August 16, 2016 COURT ORDER denying petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis [ # 8270920-2 ] Without Poll. Mandate pull date is 08/23/2016 [15-10803] (MCS)
August 3, 2016 Paper copies of petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis in 15-10803 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes Paper Copies of Rehearing due deadline satisfied. [15-10803] (NFD)
August 1, 2016 PAPER COPIES REQUESTED for the petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis in 15-10803 [ # 8270920-2 ]. Mandate pull date canceled.. Paper Copies of Rehearing due on 08/08/2016 for Appellant Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis. [15-10803] (NFD)
July 29, 2016 PETITION filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis for rehearing en banc [8270920-2]. Date of Service: 07/29/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lee, Titus; Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Stamboulieh; Attorney for Appellee: Nemeroff [15-10803] (Stephen Dean Stamboulieh )
June 30, 2016 PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [15-10803 Affirmed] Judge: CDK , Judge: LHS , Judge: CH. Mandate pull date is 08/22/2016; denying as moot motion for judicial notice filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis [ # 8106243-2 ] [15-10803] (JRS)
June 30, 2016 JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [15-10803] (JRS)
May 22, 2016 RESPONSE filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis to the 28j letter filed by Appellees Mr. Thomas E. Brandon and Ms. Loretta E. Lynch in 15-10803 [ # 8207053-2 ] Date of Service: 05/22/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lee, Titus; Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Stamboulieh; Attorney for Appellee: Nemeroff [15-10803] (Stephen Dean Stamboulieh )
May 19, 2016 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellees Mr. Thomas E. Brandon and Ms. Loretta E. Lynch Date of Service: 05/19/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lee, Titus; Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Stamboulieh; Attorney for Appellee: Nemeroff [15-10803] (Patrick George Nemeroff )
April 9, 2016 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis Date of Service: 04/09/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lee, Titus; Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Stamboulieh; Attorney for Appellee: Nemeroff [15-10803] (Stephen Dean Stamboulieh )
April 6, 2016 ORAL ARGUMENT HEARD before Judges King, Southwick, Haynes. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Patrick George Nemeroff arguing for Appellee Thomas E. Brandon; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Stephen Dean Stamboulieh arguing for Appellant Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis [15-10803] (SME)
March 28, 2016 RESPONSE filed by Appellees Mr. Thomas E. Brandon and Ms. Loretta E. Lynch to the 28j letter filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis in 15-10803 [ # 8159354-2 ] Date of Service: 03/28/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lee, Titus; Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Stamboulieh; Attorney for Appellee: Nemeroff [15-10803] (Patrick George Nemeroff )
March 22, 2016 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis Date of Service: 03/22/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lee, Titus; Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Stamboulieh; Attorney for Appellee: Nemeroff [15-10803] (Stephen Dean Stamboulieh )
March 15, 2016 RESPONSE filed by Appellees Mr. Thomas E. Brandon and Ms. Loretta E. Lynch to the 28j letter filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis in 15-10803 [ # 8145808-2 ] Date of Service: 03/15/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lee, Titus; Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Stamboulieh; Attorney for Appellee: Nemeroff [15-10803] (Patrick George Nemeroff )
March 8, 2016 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis Date of Service: 03/08/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lee, Titus; Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Stamboulieh; Attorney for Appellee: Nemeroff [15-10803] (Stephen Dean Stamboulieh )
February 24, 2016 COURT ORDER that appellant's motion for judicial notice is CARRIED WITH THE CASE [ # 8106243-2 ]. [15-10803] (MCS)
February 17, 2016 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument on Tuesday, 04/05/2016 in New Orleans in the En Banc Courtroom -- AM session. In accordance with our policy, lead counsel only will receive via email at a later date a copy of the court's docket and an acknowledgment form. All other counsel of record should monitor the court's website for the posting of the oral argument calendars.. [15-10803] (SME)
February 17, 2016 The oral argument is moved from Tuesday, April 5, 2016 to Wednesday, April 6, 2016. [15-10803] (SME)
February 17, 2016 RESPONSE filed by Appellees Mr. Thomas E. Brandon and Ms. Loretta E. Lynch to the 28j letter filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis in 15-10803 [ # 8122162-2 ] Date of Service: 02/17/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lee, Titus; Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Stamboulieh; Attorney for Appellee: Nemeroff [15-10803] (Patrick George Nemeroff )
February 8, 2016 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis Date of Service: 02/08/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lee, Titus; Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Stamboulieh; Attorney for Appellee: Nemeroff [15-10803] (Stephen Dean Stamboulieh )
February 6, 2016 REPLY filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis [8121390-1] to the response/opposition filed by Appellees Mr. Thomas E. Brandon and Ms. Loretta E. Lynch in 15-10803 [ # 8116263-2 ], to the motion for judicial notice filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis in 15-10803 [ # 8106243-2 ]. [15-10803] (SENT TO ORAL ARGUMENT CALENDAR WITH MOTION AND RESPONSE) REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: REPLY filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis [8121390-1] to the response/opposition filed by Appellees Mr. Thomas E. Brandon and Ms. Loretta E. Lynch in 15-10803 [ # 8116263-2 ], to the motion for judicial notice filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis in 15-10803 [ # 8106243-2 ]. Date of Service: 02/06/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lee, Titus; Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Stamboulieh; Attorney for Appellee: Nemeroff. [15-10803] (Stephen Dean Stamboulieh )
February 3, 2016 CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 04/04/2016. [15-10803] (GAM)
February 1, 2016 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Appellees Mr. Thomas E. Brandon and Ms. Loretta E. Lynch [8116263-1] to the motion for judicial notice filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis in 15-10803 [ # 8106243-2 ] (SEND TO SCREENING JUDGE AND PANEL) [15-10803] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Thomas E. Brandon and Ms. Loretta E. Lynch [8116263-1] to the motion for judicial notice filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis in 15-10803 [ # 8106243-2 ] Date of Service: 02/01/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lee, Titus; Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Stamboulieh; Attorney for Appellee: Nemeroff. [15-10803] (Patrick George Nemeroff )
January 19, 2016 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis for judicial notice (SEND TO SCREENING JUDGE AND PANEL) [8106243-2]. Date of service: 01/19/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lee, Titus; Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Stamboulieh; Attorney for Appellee: Nemeroff [15-10803] (Stephen Dean Stamboulieh )
January 12, 2016 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Daniel M. Riess is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:as he has not filed an appearance form nor is he listed on the brief. [15-10803] (NFD)
January 4, 2016 Paper copies of appellant reply brief filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis in 15-10803 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-10803] (NFD)
December 28, 2015 APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 01/04/2016 for Appellant Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis. [15-10803] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis Date of service: 12/28/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lee, Titus; Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Stamboulieh; Attorney for Appellees: Nemeroff, Riess [15-10803] (Stephen Dean Stamboulieh )
December 17, 2015 Paper copies of appellee brief filed by Appellees Mr. Thomas E. Brandon and Ms. Loretta E. Lynch in 15-10803 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-10803] (NFD)
December 16, 2015 BRIEF MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellees Mr. Thomas E. Brandon and Ms. Loretta E. Lynch in 15-10803 [ # 8081708-2 ]. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 12/21/2015 for Appellees Thomas E. Brandon and Loretta E. Lynch. [15-10803] (NFD)
December 15, 2015 APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED . Brief is INSUFFICIENT: Caption Incorrect. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 12/21/2015 for Appellees Thomas E. Brandon and Loretta E. Lynch.. Reply Brief due on 01/04/2016 for Appellant Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis [15-10803] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Appellees Mr. Thomas E. Brandon and Ms. Loretta E. Lynch. Date of service: 12/15/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lee, Titus; Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Stamboulieh; Attorney for Appellee: Nemeroff; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Riess [15-10803] (Patrick George Nemeroff )
November 19, 2015 Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Amici Curiae Firearms Policy Coalition, Incorporated, Firearms Policy Foundation, Incorporated, Colorado Second Amendment Association, Lone Star Gun Rights, Madison Society, Incorporated and Mississippi Carry, Incorporated in 15-10803 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-10803] (PAC)
November 17, 2015 BRIEF MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Amici Curiae Firearms Policy Coalition, Incorporated, Firearms Policy Foundation, Incorporated, Colorado Second Amendment Association, Lone Star Gun Rights, Madison Society, Incorporated and Mississippi Carry, Incorporated in 15-10803 [ # 8056058-2 ]. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 11/23/2015 for Amici Curiae Colorado Second Amendment Association, Firearms Policy Coalition, Incorporated, Firearms Policy Foundation, Incorporated, Lone Star Gun Rights, Madison Society, Incorporated and Mississippi Carry, Incorporated. [15-10803] (RSM)
November 16, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney George M. Lee for Amicus Curiae Firearms Policy Foundation, Incorporated in 15-10803, Attorney George M. Lee for Amicus Curiae Firearms Policy Coalition, Incorporated in 15-10803, by Attorney(s) George M. Lee for party(s) Amicus Curiae Madison Society, Incorporated Amicus Curiae Colorado Second Amendment Association Amicus Curiae Lone Star Gun Rights Amicus Curiae Mississippi Carry, Incorporated, in case 15-10803 [15-10803] (PAC)
November 13, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Herbert W. Titus for Amicus Curiae Bradley D. Rogers in 15-10803, Attorney Herbert W. Titus for Amicus Curiae Institute on the Constitution in 15-10803, Attorney Herbert W. Titus for Amicus Curiae Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund in 15-10803, Attorney Herbert W. Titus for Amicus Curiae Heller Foundation in 15-10803, Attorney Herbert W. Titus for Amicus Curiae Gun Owners Foundation in 15-10803, Attorney Herbert W. Titus for Amicus Curiae Gun Owners of America, Incorporated in 15-10803. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied [15-10803] (RLL)
November 13, 2015 CASE CAPTION updated. Party information modified for Bradley D. Rogers, Institute on the Constitution, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund and Heller Foundation in 15-10803. Update: attorney Titus added for amicus parties. [15-10803] (RSM)
November 12, 2015 CLERK ORDER granting in part unopposed motion to extend time to file appellee's brief to and including 12/15/15 filed by Appellees Mr. Thomas E. Brandon and Ms. Loretta E. Lynch [ # 8051746-2 ]. E/Res's Brief deadline updated to 12/15/2015 for Appellees Thomas E. Brandon and Loretta E. Lynch. [15-10803] (MCS)
November 11, 2015 COURT ORDER granting unopposed motion of Firearms Policy Coalition, Incorporated, Firearms Policy Foundation, Incorporated, Colorado Second Amendment Association, Lone Star Gun Rights, Madison Society, Incorporated, and Mississippi Carry, Incorporated to file their amicus curiae brief out of time [ # 8052537-2 ] Judge(s): JEG. [15-10803] (RSM)
November 11, 2015 CASE CAPTION updated. Party information modified for Firearms Policy Coalition, Incorporated, Firearms Policy Foundation, Incorporated, Colorado Second Amendment Association, Lone Star Gun Rights, Madison Society, Incorporated and Mississippi Carry, Incorporated in 15-10803. Update: amicus parties added to case. [15-10803] (RSM)
November 11, 2015 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Colorado Second Amendment Association, Firearms Policy Coalition, Incorporated, Firearms Policy Foundation, Incorporated, Lone Star Gun Rights, Madison Society, Incorporated and Mississippi Carry, Incorporated. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires an Appearance Form from counsel signing the brief (Lee). Additionally the Brief requires CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IS MISSING THE DATE OF SERVICE. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief due on 11/25/2015 for Amici Curiae Colorado Second Amendment Association, Firearms Policy Coalition, Incorporated, Firearms Policy Foundation, Incorporated, Gun Owners of America, Incorporated, Lone Star Gun Rights, Madison Society, Incorporated and Mississippi Carry, Incorporated. [15-10803] (RSM)
November 9, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Herbert W. Titus, Esq. for Gun Owners Foundation and Gun Owners of America, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-10803] (Herbert W. Titus )
November 5, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. George M. Lee for Firearms Policy Coalition, Incorporated and Firearms Policy Foundation, Incorporated , Colorado Second Amendment Association, Lone Star Gun Rights, The Madison Society, Inc. and Mississippi Carry, Inc. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-10803] (George M. Lee )
November 5, 2015 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Firearms Policy Foundation, Incorporated; Firearms Policy Coalition, Incorporated; Colorado Second Amendment Association; Mississippi Carry, Incorporated; Lone Star Gun Rights; Madison Society, Incorporated to file amicus brief out of fime [8052537-2] [15-10803] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION to file amicus brief [8052537-2] Date of service: 11/05/2015 via email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Titus; Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Stamboulieh; Attorney for Appellee: Nemeroff; Attorney for Not Party: Lee [15-10803] (George M. Lee )
November 4, 2015 Paper copies of record excerpts filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis in 15-10803 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [15-10803] (RSM)
November 4, 2015 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis in 15-10803 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-10803] (RSM)
November 4, 2015 CASE CAPTION updated. Not Parties Firearms Policy Coalition, Incorporated, Firearms Policy Foundation, Incorporated, Colorado Second Amendment Association, Lone Star Gun Rights, Madison Society, Incorporated and Mississippi Carry, Incorporated added to case. Reason: amicus brief not filed electronically. Filed in paper form only. Document received no action taken. [15-10803] (RSM)
November 4, 2015 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the paper copies of amicus brief received from Not Parties Colorado Second Amendment Association, Firearms Policy Coalition, Incorporated, Firearms Policy Foundation, Incorporated, Lone Star Gun Rights, Madison Society, Incorporated and Mississippi Carry, Incorporated because brief must be filed electronically before sending in paper copies. [15-10803] (RSM)
November 4, 2015 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Mr. Thomas E. Brandon and Ms. Loretta E. Lynch to extend the time to file appellees' brief [ # 8043986-2 ] filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis in 15-10803 until 01/13/2016 at 11:59 pm [8051746-2]. Date of service: 11/04/2015 via email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Titus; Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Stamboulieh; Attorney for Appellee: Nemeroff; Attorney for Not Party: Lee; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Riess [15-10803] (Patrick George Nemeroff )
November 2, 2015 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Mr. Bradley D. Rogers, Mr. Institute on the Constitution, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Heller Foundation, Gun Owners of California, Incorporated, Gun Owners Foundation and Gun Owners of America, Incorporated. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires an Appearance Form from counsel signing the brief (Titus). Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief due on 11/16/2015 for Amici Curiae Gun Owners of America, Incorporated, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of California, Incorporated, Heller Foundation, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Institute on the Constitution and Bradley D. Rogers.. Paper Copies of Brief due on 11/09/2015 for Amici Curiae Gun Owners of America, Incorporated, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of California, Incorporated, Heller Foundation, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Institute on the Constitution and Bradley D. Rogers. [15-10803] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of California, Inc., The Heller Foundation, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Institute on the Constitution, and Sheriff Bradley D. Rogers (Elkhart County, Indiana). Date of service: 11/02/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Stamboulieh; Attorney for Appellee: Nemeroff [15-10803] (William Jeffrey Olson )
October 26, 2015 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 11/30/2015 for Appellees Thomas E. Brandon and Loretta E. Lynch. Paper Copies of Brief due on 11/04/2015 for Appellant Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis. [15-10803] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis. Date of service: 10/26/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Stamboulieh; Attorney for Appellee: Nemeroff; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Riess [15-10803] (Stephen Dean Stamboulieh )
October 26, 2015 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 11/04/2015 for Appellant Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis. [15-10803] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis. Date of service: 10/26/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Stamboulieh; Attorney for Appellee: Nemeroff; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Riess [15-10803] (Stephen Dean Stamboulieh )
September 16, 2015 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/26/2015 for Appellant Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis. [15-10803] (MRB)
September 16, 2015 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [15-10803] (MRB)
September 11, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Patrick George Nemeroff for party(s) Appellee Loretta E. Lynch Appellee Thomas E. Brandon, in case 15-10803 [15-10803] (RLL)
September 9, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Alan Alexander Beck for party(s) Appellant Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis, in case 15-10803 [15-10803] (RLL)
August 27, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Stephen Dean Stamboulieh for Appellant Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis in 15-10803 [15-10803] (RLL)
August 27, 2015 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7998296-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [15-10803] (NFD)
August 27, 2015 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. [15-10803] (MCS)
August 27, 2015 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:14-CV-3872. Electronic ROA due on 09/11/2015. [15-10803] (NFD)
August 21, 2015 CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis [15-10803] (SDH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jay Isaac Hollis v. Loretta Lynch, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LORETTA E. LYNCH, Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Patrick George Nemeroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS E. BRANDON, Acting Director of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives
Represented By: Patrick George Nemeroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION, INCORPORATED
Represented By: George M. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRADLEY D. ROGERS
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MADISON SOCIETY, INCORPORATED
Represented By: George M. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GUN OWNERS OF CALIFORNIA, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MISSISSIPPI CARRY, INCORPORATED
Represented By: George M. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INSTITUTE ON THE CONSTITUTION
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HELLER FOUNDATION
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INCORPORATED
Represented By: George M. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CONSERVATIVE LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LONE STAR GUN RIGHTS
Represented By: George M. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COLORADO SECOND AMENDMENT ASSOCIATION
Represented By: George M. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAY AUBREY ISAAC HOLLIS, Individually and as Trustee of the Jay Aubrey Isaac Hollis Revocable Living Trust
Represented By: Alan Alexander Beck Esq.
Represented By: Stephen Dean Stamboulieh Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?