Frfgtr Pension & Relief Fund, et al v. T. Bulmahn, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Brian M. Neiman, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, William Kruse, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated and Moshe Issac Foundation, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: Albert L. Reese, Jr., Keith R. Godwin, Leland E. Tate and T. Paul Bulmahn
Case Number: 15-31094
Filed: December 23, 2015
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2017 MANDATE ISSUED. Mandate pull date satisfied. [15-31094] (DLJ) [Entered: 05/15/2017 09:24 AM]
April 21, 2017 JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [15-31094] (JMA) [Entered: 04/21/2017 12:33 PM]
April 21, 2017 PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [15-31094 Affirmed ] Judge: PEH , Judge: JWE , Judge: SAH Mandate pull date is 05/12/2017 [15-31094] (JMA) [Entered: 04/21/2017 12:29 PM]
September 26, 2016 ORAL ARGUMENT HEARD before Judges Higginbotham, Elrod, Higginson. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Paul R. Bessette arguing for Appellee T. Paul Bulmahn, Appellee Keith R. Godwin, Appellee Albert L. Reese, Jr. AND Leland Tate; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Stuart William Emmons arguing for Appellant William Kruse, Appellant Moshe Issac Foundation AND Brian Neiman [15-31094] (KMP) [Entered: 09/26/2016 01:43 PM]
August 16, 2016 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument on Monday, 09/26/2016 in New Orleans in the East Courtroom -- AM session. In accordance with our policy, lead counsel only will receive via email at a later date a copy of the court's docket and an acknowledgment form. All other counsel of record should monitor the court's website for the posting of the oral argument calendars.. [15-31094] (SME) [Entered: 08/16/2016 03:53 PM]
July 18, 2016 CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 09/26/2016. [15-31094] (PFT) [Entered: 07/18/2016 11:37 AM]
July 6, 2016 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Roy C. Cheatwood is designated as inactive in this case. Reason: not on brief/no appearance form filed. [15-31094] (PFT) [Entered: 07/06/2016 02:35 PM]
July 5, 2016 Paper copies of appellant reply brief filed by Appellants Mr. Brian M. Neiman, Moshe Issac Foundation and Mr. William Kruse in 15-31094 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-31094] (DDL) [Entered: 07/05/2016 03:27 PM]
June 30, 2016 APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 07/06/2016 for Appellants William Kruse, Moshe Issac Foundation and Brian M. Neiman. [15-31094] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Mr. William Kruse, Moshe Issac Foundation and Mr. Brian M. Neiman. Date of service: 06/30/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Avery, Emmons, Federman; Attorney for Appellees: Bessette, Biles, Cheatwood, Sullivan [15-31094] (William B. Federman ) [Entered: 06/30/2016 03:48 PM]
June 8, 2016 Paper copies of record excerpts filed by Appellees Mr. T. Paul Bulmahn, Mr. Albert L. Reese, Jr., Mr. Keith R. Godwin and Mr. Leland E. Tate in 15-31094 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [15-31094] (DDL) [Entered: 06/10/2016 09:32 AM]
June 8, 2016 Paper copies of appellee brief filed by Appellees Mr. T. Paul Bulmahn, Mr. Albert L. Reese, Jr., Mr. Keith R. Godwin and Mr. Leland E. Tate in 15-31094 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-31094] (DDL) [Entered: 06/10/2016 09:27 AM]
June 8, 2016 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Mr. William Kruse, Moshe Issac Foundation and Mr. Brian M. Neiman. Extension Granted to and including 06/30/2016. Reply Brief deadline updated to 06/30/2016 for Appellants William Kruse, Moshe Issac Foundation and Brian M. Neiman. [15-31094] (SEP) [Entered: 06/08/2016 02:50 PM]
June 7, 2016 CLERK ORDER granting motion to file record excerpts in excess pages. filed by Appellees Mr. T. Paul Bulmahn, Mr. Albert L. Reese, Jr., Mr. Keith R. Godwin and Mr. Leland E. Tate. [ # 8220904-2 ] The clerk is granting your unopposed motion for the Court subject to possible reconsideration by the merits panel at a later date. [15-31094] (SEP) [Entered: 06/07/2016 01:17 PM]
June 6, 2016 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Mr. T. Paul Bulmahn, Mr. Keith R. Godwin, Mr. Albert L. Reese, Jr. and Mr. Leland E. Tate to file record excerpts in excess pages [8220904-2]. Date of service: 06/06/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Avery, Emmons, Federman; Attorney for Appellees: Bessette, Biles, Cheatwood, Sullivan [15-31094] (Paul R. Bessette ) [Entered: 06/06/2016 05:09 PM]
June 6, 2016 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 06/13/2016 for Appellees T. Paul Bulmahn, Keith R. Godwin, Albert L. Reese Jr. and Leland E. Tate. [15-31094] # of Copies Provided: 0 [15-31094] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellees Mr. T. Paul Bulmahn, Mr. Keith R. Godwin, Mr. Albert L. Reese, Jr. and Mr. Leland E. Tate. Date of service: 06/06/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Avery, Emmons, Federman; Attorney for Appellees: Bessette, Biles, Cheatwood, Sullivan [15-31094] (Paul R. Bessette ) [Entered: 06/06/2016 05:06 PM]
June 6, 2016 APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 06/13/2016 for Appellees T. Paul Bulmahn, Keith R. Godwin, Albert L. Reese Jr. and Leland E. Tate.. Reply Brief due on 06/23/2016 for Appellants William Kruse, Moshe Issac Foundation and Brian M. Neiman [15-31094] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. T. Paul Bulmahn, Mr. Keith R. Godwin, Mr. Albert L. Reese, Jr. and Mr. Leland E. Tate. Date of service: 06/06/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Avery, Emmons, Federman; Attorney for Appellees: Bessette, Biles, Cheatwood, Sullivan [15-31094] (Paul R. Bessette ) [Entered: 06/06/2016 05:03 PM]
May 23, 2016 COURT ORDER granting unopposed motion to amend caption filed by Appellees Mr. T. Paul Bulmahn, Mr. Albert L. Reese, Jr., Mr. Keith R. Godwin and Mr. Leland E. Tate. [ # 8208427-2 ] Judge(s): EBC. [15-31094] (SEP) [Entered: 05/23/2016 01:52 PM]
May 20, 2016 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Mr. T. Paul Bulmahn, Mr. Keith R. Godwin, Mr. Albert L. Reese, Jr. and Mr. Leland E. Tate to amend caption [8208427-2]. Date of service: 05/20/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Avery, Emmons, Federman; Attorney for Appellees: Bessette, Biles, Cheatwood, Sullivan [15-31094] (Paul R. Bessette ) [Entered: 05/20/2016 04:15 PM]
April 15, 2016 Paper copies of record excerpts filed by Appellants Mr. Brian M. Neiman, Moshe Issac Foundation and Mr. William Kruse in 15-31094 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. [15-31094] (DDL) [Entered: 04/20/2016 01:03 PM]
April 15, 2016 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellants Mr. Brian M. Neiman, Moshe Issac Foundation and Mr. William Kruse in 15-31094 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-31094] (DDL) [Entered: 04/20/2016 12:58 PM]
April 15, 2016 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellees Mr. T. Paul Bulmahn, Mr. Keith R. Godwin, Mr. Albert L. Reese, Jr. and Mr. Leland E. Tate. Extension Granted in Part to and including 06/06/2016. Reason: Lacking Substantial Reason(s). E/Res's Brief deadline updated to 06/06/2016 for Appellees T. Paul Bulmahn, Keith R. Godwin, Albert L. Reese Jr. and Leland E. Tate. [15-31094] (SEP) [Entered: 04/15/2016 02:10 PM]
April 15, 2016 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellees Mr. T. Paul Bulmahn, Mr. Keith R. Godwin, Mr. Albert L. Reese, Jr. and Mr. Leland E. Tate for filing APPELLEE'S BRIEF until 06/15/2016. [15-31094] (Paul R. Bessette ) [Entered: 04/15/2016 11:55 AM]
April 13, 2016 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 [15-31094] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Mr. William Kruse, Moshe Issac Foundation and Mr. Brian M. Neiman. Date of service: 04/13/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Avery, Emmons, Federman; Attorney for Appellees: Bessette, Biles, Cheatwood, Sullivan [15-31094] (William B. Federman ) [Entered: 04/13/2016 03:38 PM]
April 13, 2016 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/18/2016 for Appellants William Kruse, Moshe Issac Foundation and Brian M. Neiman.. Appellee's Brief due on 05/16/2016 for Appellees T. Paul Bulmahn, Keith R. Godwin, Albert L. Reese Jr. and Leland E. Tate [15-31094] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. William Kruse, Moshe Issac Foundation and Mr. Brian M. Neiman. Date of service: 04/13/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Avery, Emmons, Federman; Attorney for Appellees: Bessette, Biles, Cheatwood, Sullivan [15-31094] (William B. Federman ) [Entered: 04/13/2016 03:36 PM]
February 25, 2016 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Mr. William Kruse, Moshe Issac Foundation and Mr. Brian M. Neiman. Extension Granted to and including 04/13/2016. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 04/13/2016 for Appellants William Kruse, Moshe Issac Foundation and Brian M. Neiman [15-31094] (AGL) [Entered: 02/25/2016 09:24 AM]
February 3, 2016 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/14/2016 for Appellants William Kruse, Moshe Issac Foundation and Brian M. Neiman. [15-31094] (MRB) [Entered: 02/03/2016 12:15 PM]
February 3, 2016 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [15-31094] (MRB) [Entered: 02/03/2016 12:01 PM]
January 26, 2016 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Hamilton Lindley is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:per telephone advice from aty on 1/26/16. [15-31094] (POK) [Entered: 01/26/2016 10:13 AM]
January 26, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Patricia I. Avery for Appellants William Kruse, Moshe Issac Foundation and Brian M. Neiman in 15-31094. [15-31094] (DLJ) [Entered: 01/26/2016 08:11 AM]
January 25, 2016 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:13-CV-3935. Electronic ROA due on 02/10/2016. [15-31094] (SEP) [Entered: 01/25/2016 11:15 AM]
January 25, 2016 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. William Kruse, Moshe Issac Foundation and Mr. Brian M. Neiman advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. [15-31094] (SEP) [Entered: 01/25/2016 11:14 AM]
January 24, 2016 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Mr. William Kruse, Moshe Issac Foundation and Mr. Brian M. Neiman for the Court to process. Date of service: 01/24/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Avery, Emmons, Federman; Attorney for Appellees: Bessette, Biles, Cheatwood, Lindley, Sullivan. [15-31094] (William B. Federman ) [Entered: 01/24/2016 11:40 AM]
January 22, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Stuart William Emmons for party(s) Appellant William Kruse Appellant Brian M. Neiman Appellant Moshe Issac Foundation, in case 15-31094 [15-31094] (MAS) [Entered: 01/22/2016 01:47 PM]
January 22, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Patricia I. Avery for Mr. Brian M. Neiman, Moshe Issac Foundation and Mr. William Kruse for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-31094] (Patricia I. Avery ) [Entered: 01/22/2016 01:37 PM]
January 22, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) William B. Federman for party(s) Appellant William Kruse Appellant Brian M. Neiman Appellant Moshe Issac Foundation, in case 15-31094 [15-31094] (DDL) [Entered: 01/22/2016 09:38 AM]
January 21, 2016 Attorney William Federman added as counsel of record for Appellants Brian M. Neiman, Moshe Issac Foundation and William Kruse in 15-31094 [15-31094] (AGL) [Entered: 01/21/2016 11:08 AM]
January 21, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM by Stuart W. Emmons for Appellants for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-31094] (Stuart William Emmons ) [Entered: 01/21/2016 10:50 AM]
January 21, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM by William B. Federman for Appellants for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-31094] (William B. Federman ) [Entered: 01/21/2016 10:48 AM]
January 12, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Paul R. Bessette for Appellee Leland E. Tate in 15-31094, by Attorney(s) Paul R. Bessette for party(s) Appellee Albert L. Reese Jr. Appellee Keith R. Godwin Appellee T. Paul Bulmahn, in case 15-31094 [15-31094] (DDL) [Entered: 01/12/2016 12:42 PM]
January 12, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michael John Biles for party(s) Appellee Albert L. Reese Jr. Appellee Leland E. Tate Appellee Keith R. Godwin Appellee T. Paul Bulmahn, in case 15-31094 [15-31094] (DDL) [Entered: 01/12/2016 12:39 PM]
January 12, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney James Patrick Sullivan for Appellee Keith R. Godwin in 15-31094, Attorney James Patrick Sullivan for Appellee Albert L. Reese Jr. in 15-31094, Attorney James Patrick Sullivan for Appellee T. Paul Bulmahn in 15-31094, by Attorney(s) James Patrick Sullivan for party(s) Appellee Leland E. Tate, in case 15-31094 [15-31094] (DDL) [Entered: 01/12/2016 12:36 PM]
January 11, 2016 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8100085-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 01/26/2016 for Appellants William Kruse, Moshe Issac Foundation and Brian M. Neiman [15-31094] (LCA) [Entered: 01/11/2016 03:49 PM]
January 8, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Paul R. Bessette for Mr. Leland E. Tate Mr. T. Paul Bulmahn, Mr. Albert L. Reese, Jr. and and Mr. Keith R. Godwin for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-31094] (Paul R. Bessette ) [Entered: 01/08/2016 04:26 PM]
January 8, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-31094] (Michael John Biles ) [Entered: 01/08/2016 02:30 PM]
January 8, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. James Patrick Sullivan for Mr. T. Paul Bulmahn, Mr. Albert L. Reese, Jr. and Mr. Keith R. Godwin and Mr. Leland E. Tate for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-31094] (James Patrick Sullivan ) [Entered: 01/08/2016 12:07 PM]
December 23, 2015 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. William Kruse, Moshe Issac Foundation and Mr. Brian M. Neiman [15-31094] (LCA) [Entered: 12/23/2015 09:11 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Frfgtr Pension & Relief Fund, et al v. T. Bulmahn, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brian M. Neiman, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Patricia I. Avery
Represented By: William B. Federman
Represented By: Stuart William Emmons Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: William Kruse, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Patricia I. Avery
Represented By: William B. Federman
Represented By: Stuart William Emmons Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Moshe Issac Foundation, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Patricia I. Avery
Represented By: William B. Federman
Represented By: Stuart William Emmons Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Albert L. Reese, Jr.
Represented By: James Patrick Sullivan
Represented By: Paul R. Bessette
Represented By: Michael John Biles Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Keith R. Godwin
Represented By: James Patrick Sullivan
Represented By: Paul R. Bessette
Represented By: Michael John Biles Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Leland E. Tate
Represented By: James Patrick Sullivan
Represented By: Paul R. Bessette
Represented By: Michael John Biles Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: T. Paul Bulmahn
Represented By: James Patrick Sullivan
Represented By: Paul R. Bessette
Represented By: Michael John Biles Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?