Defense Distributed, et al v. U.S. Dept. of State, et al
Defendant / Appellee: GLENN SMITH, Individually and in His Official Capacity as the Senior Advisor, Office of Defense Trade Controls, KENNETH B. HANDELMAN, Individually and in His Official Capacity as the Deputy Assistant Secretary of State for Defense Trade Controls in the Bureau of Political-Military Affairs, SARAH J. HEIDEMA, Individually and in Her Official Capacity as the Division Chief, Regulatory and Multilateral Affairs, Office of Defense Trade Controls Policy, DIRECTORATE OF DEFENSE TRADE CONTROLS, Department of State Bureau of Political Military Affairs, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, JOHN F. KERRY, In His Official Capacity as the Secretary of the Department of State and C. EDWARD PEARTREE, Individually and in His Official Capacity as the Director of the Office of Defense Trade Controls Policy Division
Amicus Curiae: REPRESENTATIVE STEVE KING, TEXAS PUBLIC POLICY FOUNDATION, REPRESENTATIVE BRIAN BABIN, REPRESENTATIVE PAUL GOSAR, REPRESENTATIVE K. MIKE CONAWAY, REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS, REPRESENTATIVE DANIEL WEBSTER, REPRESENTATIVE WALTER JONES, REPRESENTATIVE BLAKE FARENTHOLD, CATO INSTITUTE, REPRESENTATIVE RAUL LABRADOR, BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE, REPRESENTATIVE BILL POSEY, REPRESENTATIVE JEFF DUNCAN, THOMAS JEFFERSON CENTER FOR THE PROTECTION OF FREE EXPRESSION, REPRESENTATIVE JOHN FLEMING, REPRESENTATIVE THOMAS MASSIE, MADISON SOCIETY FOUNDATION, INCORPORATED, MIKE KELLY, REPRESENTATIVE TODD ROKITA, ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION and REPRESENTATIVE JEFF MILLER
Plaintiff / Appellant: SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INCORPORATED and DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED
Case Number: 15-50759
Filed: August 18, 2015
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2018 SUPREME COURT ORDER received denying petition for writ of certiorari filed by Appellant Defense Distributed in 15-50759 on 01/08/2018. [8675956-1] [15-50759] (CAV)
August 8, 2017 SUPREME COURT NOTICE that petition for writ of certiorari [8562495-2] was filed by Appellant Defense Distributed on 08/02/2017. Supreme Court Number: 17-190. [15-50759] (SMC)
May 1, 2017 SUPREME COURT ORDER received extending time to file petition for writ of certiorari to 08/27/2017. Extension request filed by Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. Application No. 16A1033. [8485989-1] [15-50759] (CAV)
April 4, 2017 COURT ORDER denying motion to stay issuance of the mandate filed by Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated [ # 8452985-2 ] Judge(s): WED. [15-50759] Judge Jones dissents from this order. (SDH)
April 4, 2017 MANDATE ISSUED. [15-50759] (SDH)
March 21, 2017 OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated to stay issuance of the mandate [8452985-2]. Date of service: 03/21/2017 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Brown, Hardy, Henneke, Kimball, Krezalek, Melkonian, Meyer, Olson, Shapiro, Walsh; Attorney for Appellants: Blackman, Goldstein, Gura, Mateja, Morris; Attorney for Appellees: Raab, Tenny; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Mateja [15-50759] (Alan Gura )
March 15, 2017 COURT ORDER denying petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated [ # 8350515-2 ] With Poll. Mandate pull date is 03/22/2017 [15-50759] (JRS)
February 10, 2017 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated Date of Service: 02/10/2017 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Brown, Hardy, Henneke, Kimball, Krezalek, Melkonian, Meyer, Olson, Shapiro, Walsh; Attorney for Appellants: Blackman, Goldstein, Gura, Mateja, Morris; Attorney for Appellees: Raab, Tenny [15-50759] (Alan Gura )
November 23, 2016 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Mr. Kenneth B. Handelman, Ms. Sarah J. Heidema, Mr. John F. Kerry, Mr. C. Edward Peartree, Mr. Glenn Smith and United States Department of State [8364708-1] to the petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in 15-50759 [ # 8350515-2 ] Date of Service: 11/23/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Brown, Henneke, Kimball, Krezalek, Melkonian, Meyer, Olson, Shapiro; Attorney for Appellants: Blackman, Goldstein, Gura, Morris; Attorney for Appellees: Raab, Tenny. [15-50759] (Daniel Bentele Hahs Tenny )
November 14, 2016 COURT DIRECTIVE ISSUED requesting a response to the petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in 15-50759 [ # 8350515-2 ] Response/Opposition due on 11/25/2016. [15-50759] (MBC)
November 8, 2016 Paper copies of petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in 15-50759 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 20. Paper Copies of Rehearing due deadline satisfied. [15-50759] (PAC)
November 4, 2016 PETITION filed by Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated for rehearing en banc [8350515-2]. Date of Service: 11/04/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Brown, Hardy, Henneke, Kimball, Krezalek, Melkonian, Meyer, Olson, Shapiro, Walsh; Attorney for Appellants: Blackman, Goldstein, Gura, Mateja, Morris; Attorney for Appellees: Raab, Tenny [15-50759] (Alan Gura )
November 4, 2016 PAPER COPIES REQUESTED for the petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in 15-50759 [ # 8350515-2 ]. Mandate pull date canceled.. Paper Copies of Rehearing due on 11/09/2016 for Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. [15-50759] (RSM)
September 26, 2016 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Joel Stonedale is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:no longer with firm. [15-50759] (MBC)
September 20, 2016 JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [15-50759] (JRS)
September 20, 2016 PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [15-50759 Affirmed ] Judge: WED , Judge: EHJ , Judge: JEG. Mandate pull date is 11/14/2016 [15-50759] This opinion includes URL material that is archived by the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals Library, and made available at http://www.lb5.uscourts.gov/ArchivedURLS/. (JRS)
June 21, 2016 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated Date of Service: 06/21/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Brown, Hardy, Henneke, Kimball, Krezalek, Melkonian, Meyer, Olson, Shapiro, Stonedale, Walsh; Attorney for Appellants: Blackman, Goldstein, Gura, Mateja, Morris; Attorney for Appellees: Raab, Tenny [15-50759] (Alan Gura )
June 6, 2016 ORAL ARGUMENT HEARD before Judges Davis, Jones, Graves. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Alan Gura arguing for Appellant Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Daniel Bentele Hahs Tenny arguing for Appellee Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Appellee Kenneth B. Handelman, Appellee Sarah J. Heidema, Appellee John F. Kerry, Appellee C. Edward Peartree, Appellee Glenn Smith and United States Department of State. [15-50759] (PFT)
June 3, 2016 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated Date of Service: 06/03/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Brown, Hardy, Henneke, Kimball, Krezalek, Melkonian, Meyer, Olson, Shapiro, Stonedale, Walsh; Attorney for Appellants: Blackman, Goldstein, Gura, Mateja, Morris; Attorney for Appellees: Raab, Tenny [15-50759] (Alan Gura )
April 19, 2016 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument on Monday, 06/06/2016 in New Orleans in the East Courtroom -- PM session. In accordance with our policy, lead counsel only will receive via email at a later date a copy of the court's docket and an acknowledgment form. All other counsel of record should monitor the court's website for the posting of the oral argument calendars.. [15-50759] (PFT)
April 11, 2016 CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 06/06/2016. [15-50759] (GAM)
March 4, 2016 Paper copies of appellant reply brief filed by Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in 15-50759 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-50759] (SDH)
March 3, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney William Bryan Mateja for Appellant Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in 15-50759, Attorney William Bryan Mateja for Appellant Defense Distributed in 15-50759 [15-50759] (SDH)
March 3, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney David Scott Morris for Appellant Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in 15-50759, Attorney David Scott Morris for Appellant Defense Distributed in 15-50759 Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied [15-50759] (SDH)
March 2, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM of William B. Mateja for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-50759] (William Bryan Mateja )
March 2, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. David Scott Morris for Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated APPELLANTS for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-50759] (David Scott Morris )
March 1, 2016 Attorney David S. Morris added as counsel of record for Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in 15-50759 [15-50759] (SDH)
February 29, 2016 APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires an appearance form for David Morris. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 03/14/2016 for Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated.. Paper Copies of Brief due on 03/07/2016 for Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. [15-50759] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated Date of service: 02/29/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Brown, Hardy, Henneke, Kimball, Krezalek, Melkonian, Meyer, Olson, Shapiro, Stonedale, Walsh; Attorney for Appellants: Blackman, Goldstein, Gura; Attorney for Appellees: Raab, Tenny [15-50759] (Alan Gura )
February 22, 2016 Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence in 15-50759 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-50759] (SDH)
February 18, 2016 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 02/23/2016 for Amicus Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [15-50759] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. Date of service: 02/18/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Brown, Henneke, Melkonian, Meyer, Olson, Shapiro, Stonedale; Attorney for Appellants: Blackman, Goldstein, Gura, Mateja; Attorney for Appellees: Raab, Tenny [15-50759] (John Devereux Kimball )
February 18, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-50759] (Martin Simon Krezalek )
February 18, 2016 Paper copies of appellee brief filed by Appellees Mr. Glenn Smith, United States Department of State, Mr. John F. Kerry, Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Mr. Kenneth B. Handelman, Mr. C. Edward Peartree and Ms. Sarah J. Heidema in 15-50759 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-50759] (SDH)
February 18, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-50759] (John Devereux Kimball )
February 18, 2016 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Bill Mateja is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:no longer with the law firm handling this case. [15-50759] (POK)
February 18, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney John Devereux Kimball for Amicus Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence in 15-50759 [15-50759] (SDH)
February 18, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Martin Simon Krezalek for party(s) Amicus Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, in case 15-50759 [15-50759] (SDH)
February 15, 2016 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Eric J. Soskin is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:not listed on brief and no appearance form on file. [15-50759] (SDH)
February 11, 2016 APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Appellees Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Mr. Kenneth B. Handelman, Ms. Sarah J. Heidema, Mr. John F. Kerry, Mr. C. Edward Peartree, Mr. Glenn Smith and United States Department of State. Date of service: 02/11/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Brown, Henneke, Melkonian, Meyer, Olson, Shapiro, Stonedale; Attorney for Appellants: Blackman, Goldstein, Gura, Mateja; Attorney for Appellees: Raab, Tenny [15-50759] (Daniel Bentele Hahs Tenny )
February 4, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Randal John Meyer for party(s) Amicus Curiae Cato Institute, in case 15-50759 [15-50759] (SDH)
February 4, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-50759] (Randal John Meyer )
January 5, 2016 Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation in 15-50759 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-50759] (SDH)
December 29, 2015 Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Madison Society Foundation, Incorporated in 15-50759 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-50759] (MVM)
December 29, 2015 Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Amicus Curiae Texas Public Policy Foundation in 15-50759 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-50759] (RSM)
December 23, 2015 Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Mr. Brian Babin, Mr. Jeff Miller, Mr. Mike Kelly, Mr. John Fleming, Mr. Steve King, Mr. Jeff Duncan, Mr. Thomas Massie, Mr. K. Mike Conaway, Mr. Blake Farenthold, Mr. Paul Gosar, Mr. Walter Jones, Mr. Raul Labrador, Mr. Bill Posey, Mr. Todd Rokita and Mr. Daniel Webster in 15-50759 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-50759] (SDH)
December 23, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Joel Stonedale for party(s) Not Party Texas Public Policy Foundation, in case 15-50759 [15-50759] (SDH)
December 23, 2015 Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression in 15-50759 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-50759] (SDH)
December 23, 2015 CASE CAPTION updated. Party information modified for Texas Public Policy Foundation in 15-50759. Update: motion to file out of time granted and consent of all parties. [15-50759] (SDH)
December 23, 2015 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Texas Public Policy Foundation. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 12/28/2015 for Amicus Curiae Texas Public Policy Foundation. [15-50759] (SDH)
December 23, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Robert E. Henneke for Not Party Texas Public Policy Foundation in 15-50759 [15-50759] (SDH)
December 23, 2015 CLERK ORDER granting motion to file amicus brief of Texas Public Policy out of time [ # 8085975-2 ]. [15-50759] (SDH)
December 23, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae Daniel Webster in 15-50759, Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae Todd Rokita in 15-50759, Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae Bill Posey in 15-50759, Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae Jeff Miller in 15-50759, Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae Raul Labrador in 15-50759, Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae Steve King in 15-50759, Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae Mike Kelly in 15-50759, Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae Walter Jones in 15-50759, Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae Paul Gosar in 15-50759, Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae John Fleming in 15-50759, Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae Blake Farenthold in 15-50759, Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae Jeff Duncan in 15-50759, Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae K. Mike Conaway in 15-50759, Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae Brian Babin in 15-50759, Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae Thomas Massie in 15-50759 Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied [15-50759] (SDH)
December 23, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Leif A. Olson for Amicus Curiae Madison Society Foundation, Incorporated in 15-50759 Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied [15-50759] (SDH)
December 22, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Kit Walsh for Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation in 15-50759 Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied [15-50759] (SDH)
December 22, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Bruce D. Brown for Amicus Curiae Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression in 15-50759, Attorney Bruce D. Brown for Amicus Curiae Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press in 15-50759 [15-50759] (SDH)
December 22, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Ilya Shapiro for Amicus Curiae Cato Institute in 15-50759 [15-50759] (SDH)
December 22, 2015 Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Cato Institute in 15-50759 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-50759] (SDH)
December 21, 2015 BRIEF MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression in 15-50759 [ # 8084911-2 ]. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 12/28/2015 for Amici Curiae Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression. [15-50759] (SDH)
December 21, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Raffi Melkonian for Mr. Brian Babin, Mr. Jeff Miller, Mr. Mike Kelly, Mr. John Fleming, Mr. Steve King, Mr. Jeff Duncan, Mr. Thomas Massie, Mr. K. Mike Conaway, Mr. Blake Farenthold, Mr. Paul Gosar, Mr. Walter Jones, Mr. Raul Labrador, Mr. Bill Posey, Mr. Todd Rokita and Mr. Daniel Webster for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-50759] (Raffi Melkonian )
December 21, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Bruce D. Brown for Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-50759] (Bruce D. Brown )
December 21, 2015 Attorney Mr. Leif A. Olson for Amicus Curiae Madison Society Foundation, Incorporated is advised to resubmit appearance form. Reason: Counsel failed to complete the lower portion of the form. [15-50759] (LBM)
December 21, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Leif A. Olson for Madison Society Foundation, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-50759] (Leif A. Olson )
December 18, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Ilya Shapiro, Esq. for Cato Institute for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-50759] (Ilya Shapiro )
December 18, 2015 AN ADDITIONAL 1 COPIES OF BRIEF FILED by Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. (ONLY 6 were initially received) [15-50759] (SDH)
December 18, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM for Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-50759] (Christopher Cody Walsh )
December 18, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM R. Henneke for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-50759] (Robert E. Henneke )
December 18, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM J. Stonedale for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-50759] (Joel Stonedale )
December 18, 2015 BRIEF MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Cato Institute in 15-50759 [ # 8084928-2 ]. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 12/23/2015 for Amicus Curiae Cato Institute. [15-50759] (SDH)
December 18, 2015 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Texas Public Policy Foundation to file amicus brief one day out of time [8085975-2] Date of service: 12/18/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Brown, Melkonian, Olson, Shapiro; Attorney for Appellants: Blackman, Goldstein, Gura, Mateja; Attorney for Appellees: Raab, Tenny; US mail - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Hardy, Walsh; Attorney for Appellee: Soskin [15-50759] (Joel Stonedale )
December 17, 2015 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Electronic Frontier Foundation. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires an Appearance Form from counsel signing the brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief due on 12/31/2015 for Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation.. Paper Copies of Brief due on 12/23/2015 for Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation. [15-50759] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Date of service: 12/17/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Blackman, Goldstein, Gura, Mateja; Attorney for Appellees: Raab, Tenny; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Soskin [15-50759] (Christopher Cody Walsh )
December 17, 2015 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Cato Institute. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires a corrected caption and an Appearance Form from counsel signing the brief. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief due on12/31/2015 for Amicus Curiae Cato Institute. [15-50759] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Cato Institute. 12/17/2015 Date of service: 12/17/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Blackman, Goldstein, Gura, Mateja; Attorney for Appellees: Raab, Tenny; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Soskin [15-50759] (Ilya Shapiro )
December 17, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-50759] (Leif A. Olson )
December 17, 2015 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression and Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires each citation to the record to be properly cited. The use of "id" to cite to the record is prohibited. Additionally the Brief requires a corrected caption. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief due on 12/31/2015 for Amici Curiae Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression. [15-50759] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and the Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression. Date of service: 12/17/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Blackman, Goldstein, Gura, Mateja; Attorney for Appellees: Raab, Soskin, Tenny [15-50759] (Bruce D. Brown )
December 17, 2015 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Mr. Daniel Webster, Mr. Todd Rokita, Mr. Bill Posey, Mr. Jeff Miller, Mr. Raul Labrador, Mr. Steve King, Mr. Mike Kelly, Mr. Walter Jones, Mr. Paul Gosar, Mr. John Fleming, Mr. Blake Farenthold, Mr. Jeff Duncan, Mr. K. Mike Conaway, Mr. Brian Babin and Mr. Thomas Massie. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires an Appearance Form from counsel signing the brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief due on 12/31/2015 for Amici Curiae Thomas Massie, Brian Babin, K. Mike Conaway, Jeff Duncan, Blake Farenthold, John Fleming, Paul Gosar, Walter Jones, Mike Kelly, Steve King, Raul Labrador, Jeff Miller, Bill Posey, Todd Rokita and Daniel Webster.. Paper Copies of Brief due on 12/23/2015 for Amici Curiae Thomas Massie, Brian Babin, K. Mike Conaway, Jeff Duncan, Blake Farenthold, John Fleming, Paul Gosar, Walter Jones, Mike Kelly, Steve King, Raul Labrador, Jeff Miller, Bill Posey, Todd Rokita and Daniel Webster. [15-50759] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Representative Thomas Massie and certain members of the U.S. House of Representatives. Date of service: 12/17/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Blackman, Goldstein, Gura, Mateja; Attorney for Appellees: Raab, Tenny; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Soskin [15-50759] (Raffi Melkonian )
December 17, 2015 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Madison Society Foundation, Incorporated. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires an Appearance Form from counsel signing the brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief due on 12/31/2015 for Amicus Curiae Madison Society Foundation, Incorporated.. Paper Copies of Brief due on 12/23/2015 for Amicus Curiae Madison Society Foundation, Incorporated. [15-50759] (SDH)
December 17, 2015 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in 15-50759 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-50759] (SDH)
December 17, 2015 Paper copies of record excerpts filed by Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in 15-50759 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [15-50759] (SDH)
December 17, 2015 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the motion to file amicus brief received from Amicus Curiae Madison Society Foundation, Incorporated because it is unnecessary as the amicus party has consent of all parties [15-50759] (SDH)
December 15, 2015 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellees Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Mr. Kenneth B. Handelman, Ms. Sarah J. Heidema, Mr. John F. Kerry, Mr. C. Edward Peartree, Mr. Glenn Smith and United States Department of State. Extension Granted to and including 02/11/2016. E/Res's Brief deadline updated to 02/11/2016 for Appellees Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, John F. Kerry, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith and United States Department of State [15-50759] (MCS)
December 10, 2015 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 12/21/2015 for Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. [15-50759] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. Date of service: 12/10/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Blackman, Goldstein, Gura, Mateja; Attorney for Appellees: Raab, Soskin, Tenny [15-50759] (Alan Gura )
December 10, 2015 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 01/12/2016 for Appellees Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, John F. Kerry, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith and United States Department of State. Paper Copies of Brief due on 12/21/2015 for Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. [15-50759] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. Date of service: 12/10/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Blackman, Goldstein, Gura, Mateja; Attorney for Appellees: Raab, Soskin, Tenny [15-50759] (Alan Gura )
December 4, 2015 SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. [15-50759] (SMH)
November 5, 2015 COURT ORDER granting motion view sealed document filed by Appellant Defense Distributed [ # 8048357-2 ] Judge(s): JES. [15-50759] (SDH)
October 30, 2015 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Defense Distributed Distributed to view sealed document.. Date of service: 10/30/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Blackman, Goldstein, Gura, Mateja; Attorney for Appellees: Raab, Soskin, Tenny [15-50759] (Matthew Goldstein )
October 23, 2015 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. Extension Granted to and including 12/10/2015. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 12/10/2015 for Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated [15-50759] (RSM)
October 16, 2015 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 11/25/2015 for Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. [15-50759] (SMH)
October 16, 2015 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [15-50759] (SMH)
October 9, 2015 TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Joe Reynosa, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 08/31/2015 Transcript deadline satisfied. Court Reporter Discount Date canceled [15-50759] (MBC)
October 9, 2015 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:15-CV-372. Electronic ROA due on 10/26/2015. [15-50759] (MBC)
October 9, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney William Bryan Mateja for Appellant Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in 15-50759, Attorney William Bryan Mateja for Appellant Defense Distributed in 15-50759 [15-50759] (SDH)
October 8, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. William Bryan Mateja, Esq. for Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-50759] (William Bryan Mateja )
September 17, 2015 NO COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGEMENT RECEIVED for Mr. Joe Reynosa. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Joe Reynosa, Dt. Ct. Rprt. Time Begins: 09/26/2015. Transcript deadlines created - Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment deadline canceled. Transcript due on 09/28/2015 for Joe Reynosa, Court Reporter. Court Reporter Discount Date is 09/28/2015 for Joe Reynosa, Court Reporter [15-50759] (MBC)
September 17, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Matthew Goldstein for party(s) Appellant Defense Distributed, in case 15-50759 [15-50759] (SDH)
September 14, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM Matthew Goldstein for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-50759] (Matthew Goldstein )
September 8, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Joshua Michael Blackman for party(s) Appellant Defense Distributed Appellant Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated, in case 15-50759 [15-50759] (SDH)
August 31, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michael S. Raab for party(s) Appellee Glenn Smith Appellee United States Department of State Appellee C. Edward Peartree Appellee Sarah J. Heidema Appellee John F. Kerry Appellee Directorate of Defense Trade Controls Appellee Kenneth B. Handelman, in case 15-50759 [15-50759] (SDH)
August 31, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Daniel Bentele Hahs Tenny for party(s) Appellee Glenn Smith Appellee United States Department of State Appellee C. Edward Peartree Appellee Sarah J. Heidema Appellee John F. Kerry Appellee Directorate of Defense Trade Controls Appellee Kenneth B. Handelman, in case 15-50759 [15-50759] (SDH)
August 27, 2015 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Joe Reynosa, Proceeding Type and Date: Preliminary Injunction Hearing 07/06/2015. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 09/11/2015 for Joe Reynosa, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 7998554-2 ] [15-50759] (MVM)
August 27, 2015 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated for the Court to process. Date of service: 08/27/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Gura, Mateja; Attorney for Appellee: Soskin. [15-50759] (Alan Gura )
August 26, 2015 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Alan Gura for Appellant Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in 15-50759, Attorney Alan Gura for Appellant Defense Distributed in 15-50759 [15-50759] (SDH)
August 25, 2015 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7995721-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 09/09/2015 for Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated [15-50759] (SDH)
August 18, 2015 CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated [15-50759] (NFD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Defense Distributed, et al v. U.S. Dept. of State, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GLENN SMITH, Individually and in His Official Capacity as the Senior Advisor, Office of Defense Trade Controls
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Daniel Bentele Hahs Tenny Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH B. HANDELMAN, Individually and in His Official Capacity as the Deputy Assistant Secretary of State for Defense Trade Controls in the Bureau of Political-Military Affairs
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Daniel Bentele Hahs Tenny Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SARAH J. HEIDEMA, Individually and in Her Official Capacity as the Division Chief, Regulatory and Multilateral Affairs, Office of Defense Trade Controls Policy
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Daniel Bentele Hahs Tenny Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIRECTORATE OF DEFENSE TRADE CONTROLS, Department of State Bureau of Political Military Affairs
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Daniel Bentele Hahs Tenny Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Daniel Bentele Hahs Tenny Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN F. KERRY, In His Official Capacity as the Secretary of the Department of State
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Daniel Bentele Hahs Tenny Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. EDWARD PEARTREE, Individually and in His Official Capacity as the Director of the Office of Defense Trade Controls Policy Division
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Daniel Bentele Hahs Tenny Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPRESENTATIVE STEVE KING
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TEXAS PUBLIC POLICY FOUNDATION
Represented By: Robert E. Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPRESENTATIVE BRIAN BABIN
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPRESENTATIVE PAUL GOSAR
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPRESENTATIVE K. MIKE CONAWAY
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPRESENTATIVE DANIEL WEBSTER
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPRESENTATIVE WALTER JONES
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPRESENTATIVE BLAKE FARENTHOLD
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CATO INSTITUTE
Represented By: Randal John Meyer
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPRESENTATIVE RAUL LABRADOR
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Martin Simon Krezalek
Represented By: John Devereux Kimball Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPRESENTATIVE BILL POSEY
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPRESENTATIVE JEFF DUNCAN
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THOMAS JEFFERSON CENTER FOR THE PROTECTION OF FREE EXPRESSION
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPRESENTATIVE JOHN FLEMING
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPRESENTATIVE THOMAS MASSIE
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MADISON SOCIETY FOUNDATION, INCORPORATED
Represented By: David T. Hardy
Represented By: Leif A. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MIKE KELLY
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPRESENTATIVE TODD ROKITA
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION
Represented By: Kit Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPRESENTATIVE JEFF MILLER
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INCORPORATED
Represented By: William Bryan Mateja Esq.
Represented By: Alan Gura
Represented By: David Scott Morris
Represented By: Joshua Michael Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED
Represented By: William Bryan Mateja Esq.
Represented By: Alan Gura
Represented By: David Scott Morris
Represented By: Joshua Michael Blackman
Represented By: Matthew Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?