Edward Burdett v. Remington Arms Company, L.L.C., et al
Defendant / Appellee: REMINGTON ARMS COMPANY, L.L.C. and SPORTING GOODS PROPERTIES, INCORPORATED
Plaintiff / Appellant: EDWARD BURDETT
Case Number: 16-11216
Filed: August 10, 2016
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2017 MANDATE ISSUED. Mandate pull date satisfied. [16-11216] (NFD)
May 4, 2017 REVISED PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [ # 8476374-2 ] [16-11216] (ACM)
May 4, 2017 COURT ORDER granting motion to modify opinion filed by Appellees Remington Arms Company, L.L.C. and Sporting Goods Properties, Incorporated [ # 8483527-2 ] Judge(s): JES, CH and RAJ. [16-11216] (ACM)
April 27, 2017 UNOPPOSED MOTION to modify opinion [8483527-2]. [16-11216] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Remington Arms Company, L.L.C. and Sporting Goods Properties, Incorporated to amend judgment [8483527-2]. Date of service: 04/27/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Monsees, Thrasher; Attorney for Appellees: Jordan, Lothson, Wills [16-11216] (Dale Gene Wills )
April 19, 2017 JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [16-11216] (EAB)
April 19, 2017 PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [16-11216 Affirmed] Judge: JES, Judge: CH, Judge: RAJ. Mandate pull date is 05/10/2017 [16-11216] (EAB)
April 6, 2017 ORAL ARGUMENT HEARD before Judges Smith, Haynes, Junell. Arguing Person Information Updated for: James David Jordan arguing for Appellee L.L.C. Remington Arms Company and Sporting Goods Properties; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Robert Thrasher arguing for Appellant Edward Burdett [16-11216] (PFT)
April 3, 2017 JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER BRIEF FILED AS APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 Miscellaneous deadline satisfied [16-11216] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 Miscellaneous deadline satisfied [16-11216] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED by Remington Arms Company, L.L.C. and Sporting Goods Properties, Incorporated Date of service: 04/03/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Monsees, Thrasher; Attorney for Appellees: Jordan, Lothson, Wills [16-11216] (Andrew Arthur Lothson )
March 27, 2017 ORAL ARGUMENT panel has requested of the parties the following: The attorneys should be prepared to discuss whether the district court had diversity jurisdiction. That depends in part on the principal place of business of corporate parties and of the citizenship of entities that are LLCs. See, e.g., Settlement Funding, L.L.C. v. Rapid Settlements, Ltd., No. 16-20109, 2017 U.S. App. LEXIS 5115, 2017 WL 1088275 (5th Cir. Mar. 22, 2017); Harvey v. Grey Wolf Drilling Co., 542 F.3d 1077 (5th Cir. 2008). The attorneys are directed to submit, by April 3, 2017, letter briefs of not more than five pages addressing jurisdiction. Miscellaneous due on 04/03/2017 for Appellant Edward Burdett and Appellees Remington Arms Company, L.L.C. and Sporting Goods Properties, Incorporated [16-11216] (PFT)
February 17, 2017 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument on Thursday, 04/06/2017 in Lubbock -- AM session. In accordance with our policy, lead counsel only will receive via email at a later date a copy of the court's docket and an acknowledgment form. All other counsel of record should monitor the court's website for the posting of the oral argument calendars.. [16-11216] (PFT)
February 10, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Robert Thrasher for party(s) Appellant Edward Burdett, in case 16-11216 [16-11216] (RSM)
February 9, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM Robert A.Thrasher for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [16-11216] (Robert Thrasher )
February 8, 2017 CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 04/03/2017. [16-11216] (GAM)
January 3, 2017 Paper copies of appellant reply brief filed by Appellant Mr. Edward Burdett in 16-11216 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [16-11216] (MRW)
December 28, 2016 APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 01/04/2017 for Appellant Edward Burdett. [16-11216] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Mr. Edward Burdett. Date of service: 12/28/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Monsees; Attorney for Appellees: Jordan, Lothson, Wills [16-11216] (Timothy W. Monsees )
December 20, 2016 Paper copies of appellee brief filed by Appellees Remington Arms Company, L.L.C. and Sporting Goods Properties, Incorporated in 16-11216 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [16-11216] (MRW)
December 15, 2016 APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Reply Brief due on 12/29/2016 for Appellant Edward Burdett. Paper Copies of Brief due on 12/20/2016 for Appellees Remington Arms Company, L.L.C. and Sporting Goods Properties, Incorporated. [16-11216] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Remington Arms Company, L.L.C. and Sporting Goods Properties, Incorporated. Date of service: 12/15/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Monsees; Attorney for Appellees: Jordan, Lothson, Wills [16-11216] (Dale Gene Wills )
November 8, 2016 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellees Remington Arms Company, L.L.C. and Sporting Goods Properties, Incorporated. Extension Granted in Part to and including 12/15/2016. Reason: Lacking Substantial Reason(s). E/Res's Brief deadline updated to 12/15/2016 for Appellees Remington Arms Company, L.L.C. and Sporting Goods Properties, Incorporated [16-11216] (PAC)
November 8, 2016 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellees Remington Arms Company, L.L.C. and Sporting Goods Properties, Incorporated for filing Motion for Extension to File Appellees' Brief until 12/30/2016 at 11:59 pm. [16-11216] (Andrew Arthur Lothson )
November 1, 2016 Paper copies of record excerpts filed by Appellant Mr. Edward Burdett in 16-11216 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [16-11216] (RSM)
November 1, 2016 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellant Mr. Edward Burdett in 16-11216 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [16-11216] (RSM)
October 28, 2016 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Mr. Edward Burdett. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 11/02/2016 for Appellant Edward Burdett. [16-11216] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Mr. Edward Burdett. Date of service: 10/28/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Monsees; Attorney for Appellees: Jordan, Lothson, Wills [16-11216] (Timothy W. Monsees )
October 28, 2016 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Edward Burdett. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 11/30/2016 for Appellees Remington Arms Company, L.L.C. and Sporting Goods Properties, Incorporated. Paper Copies of Brief due on 11/02/2016 for Appellant Edward Burdett. [16-11216] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Edward Burdett. Date of service: 10/28/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Monsees; Attorney for Appellees: Jordan, Lothson, Wills [16-11216] (Timothy W. Monsees )
September 30, 2016 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Mr. Edward Burdett. Extension Granted to and including 10/31/2016. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 10/31/2016 for Appellant Edward Burdett [16-11216] (MFY)
September 30, 2016 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. Edward Burdett for filing Appellant's Brief until 10/31/2016 at 11:59 pm. [16-11216] (Timothy W. Monsees )
September 1, 2016 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/11/2016 for Appellant Edward Burdett. [16-11216] (MRB)
September 1, 2016 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [16-11216] (MRB)
August 30, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Andrew Arthur Lothson for party(s) Appellee Remington Arms Company, L.L.C. Appellee Sporting Goods Properties, Incorporated, in case 16-11216 [16-11216] (CB)
August 26, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED [16-11216] (LEF)
August 26, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Dale Gene Wills for party(s) Appellee Remington Arms Company, L.L.C. Appellee Sporting Goods Properties, Incorporated, in case 16-11216 [16-11216] (CAS)
August 25, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. James David Jordan for Remington Arms Company, L.L.C. and Sporting Goods Properties, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [16-11216] (James David Jordan )
August 22, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM Andrew A. Lothson for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [16-11216] (Andrew Arthur Lothson )
August 22, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM Dale G. Wills for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [16-11216] (Dale Gene Wills )
August 19, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Timothy W. Monsees for Appellant Edward Burdett in 16-11216 [16-11216] (LEF)
August 17, 2016 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary [16-11216] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Edward Burdett advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 08/17/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Monsees; Attorney for Appellee: Jordan [16-11216] (Timothy W. Monsees )
August 17, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Timothy W. Monsees for Mr. Edward Burdett for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [16-11216] (Timothy W. Monsees )
August 15, 2016 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:15-CV-4038. Electronic ROA due on 08/30/2016. [16-11216] (CAG)
August 15, 2016 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8284142-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [16-11216] (CAG)
August 10, 2016 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Edward Burdett [16-11216] (RLL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edward Burdett v. Remington Arms Company, L.L.C., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REMINGTON ARMS COMPANY, L.L.C.
Represented By: Dale Gene Wills Esq.
Represented By: James David Jordan
Represented By: Andrew Arthur Lothson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SPORTING GOODS PROPERTIES, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Dale Gene Wills Esq.
Represented By: James David Jordan
Represented By: Andrew Arthur Lothson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDWARD BURDETT
Represented By: Robert Thrasher
Represented By: Timothy W. Monsees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?