Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. v. Goodman Manufacturing Co., LP
Defendant / Appellee: Goodman Manufacturing Company, L.P. and Goodman Global, Incorporated
Plaintiff / Appellant: Seahorn Investments, L.L.C.
Case Number: 16-60066
Filed: January 28, 2016
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2017 SUPREME COURT ORDER received denying petition for writ of certiorari filed by Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. in 16-60066 on 02/21/2017. [8432338-1] [16-60066] (LGL) [Entered: 02/22/2017 11:30 AM]
November 14, 2016 SUPREME COURT NOTICE that petition for writ of certiorari [8356977-2] was filed by Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. on 10/31/2016. Supreme Court Number: 16-628. [16-60066] (CAV) [Entered: 11/14/2016 03:30 PM]
August 10, 2016 MANDATE ISSUED. Mandate pull date satisfied. [16-60066] (DLJ) [Entered: 08/10/2016 08:53 AM]
August 2, 2016 COURT ORDER denying petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. [ # 8256604-2 ] (IN DETAIL). Without Poll. Mandate pull date is 08/09/2016. [16-60066] (DLJ) [Entered: 08/02/2016 12:34 PM]
July 21, 2016 Paper copies of petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. in 16-60066 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. # of Copies Provided: 20. Paper Copies of Rehearing due deadline satisfied. [16-60066] (DLJ) [Entered: 07/21/2016 02:09 PM]
July 14, 2016 PETITION for rehearing en banc [8256604-2]. Number of Copies: 0. Paper Copies of Rehearing due on 07/25/2016, for Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. Mandate pull date canceled. [16-60066] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: PETITION filed by Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. for rehearing en banc [8256604-2]. Date of Service: 07/14/2016, via email - Attorney for Appellants: Corlew, Corlew; Attorney for Appellees: Comley, Cutts, Grossman, Ulmer. [16-60066] (John G. Corlew ) [Entered: 07/14/2016 02:39 PM]
June 30, 2016 JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [16-60066] (DTG) [Entered: 06/30/2016 02:50 PM]
June 30, 2016 UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [16-60066 Affirmed ] Judge: CDK , Judge: EBC , Judge: PRO Mandate pull date is 07/21/2016 [16-60066] (DTG) [Entered: 06/30/2016 02:47 PM]
May 24, 2016 Paper copies of appellant reply brief filed by Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. in 16-60066 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [16-60066] (DLJ) [Entered: 05/24/2016 12:53 PM]
May 19, 2016 APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0. Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 05/25/2016, for Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. [16-60066] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. Date of service: 05/19/2016, via email - Attorney for Appellants: Corlew, Corlew; Attorney for Appellees: Comley, Cutts, Grossman, Ulmer. [16-60066] (John G. Corlew ) [Entered: 05/19/2016 05:02 PM]
May 5, 2016 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C.. Extension Granted to and including 05/19/2016. Reply Brief deadline updated to 05/19/2016, for Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. [16-60066] (DLJ) [Entered: 05/05/2016 11:29 AM]
May 2, 2016 Paper copies of appellees' brief filed by Appellees Goodman Manufacturing Company, L.P. and Goodman Global, Incorporated in 16-60066 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [16-60066] (DLJ) [Entered: 05/02/2016 12:17 PM]
April 25, 2016 APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED . # of Copies Provided: 0 E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Reply Brief due on 05/12/2016 for Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C.. Paper Copies of Brief due on 05/04/2016 for Appellees Goodman Global, Incorporated and Goodman Manufacturing Company, L.P. [16-60066]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Appellees Goodman Global, Incorporated and Goodman Manufacturing Company, L.P. Date of service: 04/25/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Corlew, Corlew; Attorney for Appellees: Comley, Cutts, Grossman, Ulmer [16-60066] (Kyle Cutts ) [Entered: 04/25/2016 05:40 PM]
March 30, 2016 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. in 16-60066 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [16-60066] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/30/2016 04:22 PM]
March 30, 2016 Paper copies of record excerpts filed by Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. in 16-60066 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [16-60066] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/30/2016 04:25 PM]
March 23, 2016 PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. in 16-60066 [ # 8159350-2 ] Brief has been deemed sufficient. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 03/29/2016, for Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. [16-60066] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. in 16-60066 [ # 8159350-2 ]. Date of service: 03/23/2016, via email - Attorney for Appellants: Corlew, Corlew; Attorney for Appellees: Comley, Cutts, Grossman, Ulmer; clerk - Attorney for Appellants: Corlew, Corlew; Attorney for Appellees: Comley, Cutts, Grossman, Ulmer. [16-60066] (John G. Corlew ) [Entered: 03/23/2016 01:28 PM]
March 23, 2016 PROPOSED SUFFICIENT RECORD EXCERPTS filed by Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. in 16-60066 [ # 8159351-2 ]. Record Excerpts have been deemed sufficient. Sufficient Record Excerpts deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 03/29/2016, for Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. [16-60066] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: PROPOSED SUFFICIENT RECORD EXCERPTS filed by Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. in 16-60066 [ # 8159351-2 ]. Date of service: 03/23/2016, via email - Attorney for Appellants: Corlew, Corlew; Attorney for Appellees: Comley, Cutts, Grossman, Ulmer; clerk - Attorney for Appellants: Corlew, Corlew; Attorney for Appellees: Comley, Cutts, Grossman, Ulmer. [16-60066] (John G. Corlew ) [Entered: 03/23/2016 01:29 PM]
March 22, 2016 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as the Table of Contents must be corrected to include the record citation of each document listed. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0. Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 04/06/2016, for Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. [16-60066] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. Date of service: 03/22/2016, via email - Attorney for Appellants: Corlew, Corlew; Attorney for Appellees: Comley, Cutts, Grossman, Ulmer; clerk - Attorney for Appellants: Corlew, Corlew; Attorney for Appellees: Comley, Cutts, Grossman, Ulmer. [16-60066] (John G. Corlew ) [Entered: 03/22/2016 06:34 PM]
March 22, 2016 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED. Brief NOT Sufficient as the separate "Statement of Relevant Facts" must be removed. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0. A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 04/06/2016, for Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. Appellee's Brief due on 04/25/2016, for Appellees Goodman Global, Incorporated and Goodman Manufacturing Company, L.P. [16-60066] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. Date of service: 03/22/2016, via email - Attorney for Appellants: Corlew, Corlew; Attorney for Appellees: Comley, Cutts, Grossman, Ulmer; clerk - Attorney for Appellants: Corlew, Corlew; Attorney for Appellees: Comley, Cutts, Grossman, Ulmer. [16-60066] (John G. Corlew ) [Entered: 03/22/2016 06:14 PM]
February 17, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Theodore Martin Grossman for Appellees Goodman Global, Incorporated and Goodman Manufacturing Company, L.P., in case 16-60066. [16-60066] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/17/2016 08:16 AM]
February 16, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney John Scott Corlew for Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C., in case 16-60066. [16-60066] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/16/2016 09:01 AM]
February 16, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kyle Cutts for party(s) Appellee Goodman Global, Incorporated Appellee Goodman Manufacturing Company, L.P., in case 16-60066 [16-60066] (CB) [Entered: 02/16/2016 01:54 PM]
February 16, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney John G. Corlew for Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. in 16-60066 [16-60066] (CB) [Entered: 02/16/2016 02:03 PM]
February 12, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM of Theodore M. Grossman on behalf of Goodman Manufacturing Co., L.P. and Goodman Global, Inc. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [16-60066] (Theodore Martin Grossman ) [Entered: 02/12/2016 08:30 AM]
February 11, 2016 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [16-60066] (MRB) [Entered: 02/11/2016 10:55 AM]
February 11, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM Scott Corlew for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [16-60066] (John Scott Corlew ) [Entered: 02/11/2016 11:57 AM]
February 11, 2016 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/22/2016 for Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C.. [16-60066] (MRB) [Entered: 02/11/2016 11:06 AM]
February 11, 2016 Attorney Kyle T. Cutts added as counsel of record for Appellees Goodman Manufacturing Company, L.P. and Goodman Global, Incorporated in 16-60066 [16-60066] (SBS) [Entered: 02/11/2016 03:44 PM]
February 9, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM for Kyle T. Cutts for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [16-60066] (Kyle Cutts ) [Entered: 02/09/2016 08:41 AM]
February 8, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Michael W. Ulmer for Appellees Goodman Global, Incorporated and Goodman Manufacturing Company, L.P., in case 16-60066. [16-60066] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/08/2016 08:18 AM]
February 8, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Hugh Ruston Comley for Appellees Goodman Global, Incorporated and Goodman Manufacturing Company, L.P. in 16-60066. [16-60066] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/08/2016 08:19 AM]
February 8, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. John G. Corlew for Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [16-60066] (John G. Corlew ) [Entered: 02/08/2016 01:50 PM]
February 5, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM For Michael W. Ulmer for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [16-60066] (Michael W. Ulmer ) [Entered: 02/05/2016 10:35 AM]
February 5, 2016 APPEARANCE FORM FOR H. RUSTON COMLEY for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [16-60066] (Hugh Ruston Comley ) [Entered: 02/05/2016 10:44 AM]
February 2, 2016 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8117255-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [16-60066] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/02/2016 12:17 PM]
February 2, 2016 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:15-CV-311. Electronic ROA due on 02/17/2016. [16-60066] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/02/2016 12:19 PM]
January 28, 2016 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. [16-60066] (DLJ) [Entered: 01/28/2016 01:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Seahorn Investments, L.L.C. v. Goodman Manufacturing Co., LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Goodman Manufacturing Company, L.P.
Represented By: Michael W. Ulmer Esq.
Represented By: Kyle Cutts
Represented By: Hugh Ruston Comley
Represented By: Theodore Martin Grossman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Goodman Global, Incorporated
Represented By: Michael W. Ulmer Esq.
Represented By: Kyle Cutts
Represented By: Hugh Ruston Comley
Represented By: Theodore Martin Grossman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Seahorn Investments, L.L.C.
Represented By: John Scott Corlew
Represented By: John G. Corlew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?