Doggett Company, L.L.C. v. Thermo King Corporation
Plaintiff / Appellant: DOGGETT COMPANY, L.L.C.
Defendant / Appellee: THERMO KING CORPORATION
Case Number: 17-20551
Filed: August 30, 2017
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2018 CLERK ORDER granting unopposed Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 filed by Appellant Doggett Company, L.L.C. [ # 8673274-2 ] [17-20551] (ABT) [Entered: 01/05/2018 02:51 PM]
January 5, 2018 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Doggett Company, L.L.C. to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 [8673274-2]. Date of service: 01/05/2018 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Crain, Dodson, Myers, Oldham; Attorney for Appellees: Shu, Sinclair, Ulmer [17-20551] (Christopher Dodson ) [Entered: 01/05/2018 02:05 PM]
November 16, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jordan Alana Sinclair for party(s) Appellee Thermo King Corporation, in case 17-20551 [17-20551] (Jd) [Entered: 11/16/2017 12:50 PM]
November 16, 2017 COURT ORDER granting joint motion to view and obtain sealed documents filed by Appellee Thermo King Corporation and Appellant Doggett Company, L.L.C. [ # 8639982-2 ] Judge(s): JWE. [17-20551] (ABT) [Entered: 11/16/2017 07:23 AM]
November 15, 2017 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Thermo King Corporation to view and obtain sealed documents. Date of service: 11/15/2017 [17-20551] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Doggett Company, L.L.C. to view sealed document.. Date of service: 11/15/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Crain, Dodson, Myers, Oldham; Attorney for Appellees: Shu, Ulmer [17-20551] (Christopher Dodson ) [Entered: 11/15/2017 02:41 PM]
November 15, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM Jordan A. Sinclair for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [17-20551] (Jordan Alana Sinclair ) [Entered: 11/15/2017 02:13 PM]
November 15, 2017 CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Doggett Company, L.L.C. [ # 8639689-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 01/05/2018 for Appellant Doggett Company, L.L.C. [17-20551] (ABT) [Entered: 11/15/2017 01:40 PM]
November 15, 2017 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Doggett Company, L.L.C. to extend time to file brief as appellant until 01/05/2018 at 11:59 pm [8639689-2]. Date of service: 11/15/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Crain, Dodson, Myers, Oldham; Attorney for Appellees: Shu, Ulmer [17-20551] (Christopher Dodson ) [Entered: 11/15/2017 11:39 AM]
October 27, 2017 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. SPECIAL ISSUES TO BE BRIEFED. A/Pet's Brief Due on 12/06/2017 for Appellant Doggett Company, L.L.C.. [17-20551] (DDL) [Entered: 10/27/2017 02:00 PM]
October 27, 2017 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [17-20551] (DDL) [Entered: 10/27/2017 01:52 PM]
October 23, 2017 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:16-CV-2673. Electronic ROA due on 11/07/2017. [17-20551] (ABT) [Entered: 10/23/2017 11:09 AM]
October 23, 2017 TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Mary Henry, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 10/02/2017 Transcript deadline satisfied. Court Reporter Discount Date canceled [17-20551] (ABT) [Entered: 10/23/2017 11:09 AM]
September 19, 2017 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Mary Henry, Est. Completion Dt: 10/12/2017, Dt. Fin Arrangements Made: 09/12/2017, Dt. Trans. to be Filed: 10/12/2017, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 06/29/2017 , Status Conference 11/10/2016. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment ddl satisfied. Transcript due on 10/12/2017 for Mary Henry, Court Reporter. Court Reporter Discount Date is 10/12/2017 for Mary Henry, Court Reporter [17-20551] (ABT) [Entered: 09/19/2017 10:45 AM]
September 19, 2017 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGEMENT received from Court Reporter Ms. Mary Henry. [17-20551] (Ebonee S. Mathis ) [Entered: 09/19/2017 09:57 AM]
September 15, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Gregory Clayton Ulmer for Appellee Thermo King Corporation in 17-20551 [17-20551] (Jd) [Entered: 09/15/2017 12:41 PM]
September 13, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Peng-Cheng Glen Shu, for party(s) Appellee Thermo King Corporation; Christopher Lee Dodson, Ryan C. Myers, Jeffrey L. Oldham for Appellant Doggett Company, L.L.C., in case 17-20551, by Attorney Stephen Burton Crain for Appellant Doggett Company, L.L.C. in 17-20551 [17-20551] (ABT) [Entered: 09/13/2017 01:43 PM]
September 13, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Gregory Clayton Ulmer, Esq. for Thermo King Corporation for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [17-20551] (Gregory Clayton Ulmer ) [Entered: 09/13/2017 10:27 AM]
September 11, 2017 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Doggett Company, L.L.C.. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Mary Henry, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 06/29/2017 , Scheduling Conference 11/10/2016. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 09/26/2017 for Mary Henry, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 8588011-2 ] [17-20551] (ABT) [Entered: 09/12/2017 08:18 AM]
September 11, 2017 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Doggett Company, L.L.C. for the Court to process. Date of service: 09/11/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Crain; Attorney for Appellee: Ulmer. [17-20551] (Stephen Burton Crain ) [Entered: 09/11/2017 06:30 PM]
September 11, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM P. Glen Shu for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [17-20551] (Peng-Cheng Glen Shu ) [Entered: 09/11/2017 05:10 PM]
September 11, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM Jeffrey Oldham for Doggett Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [17-20551] (Jeffrey L. Oldham ) [Entered: 09/11/2017 02:46 PM]
September 11, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM Ryan C. Myers for Doggett Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [17-20551] (Ryan C. Myers ) [Entered: 09/11/2017 02:38 PM]
September 11, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Stephen Burton Crain, Esq. for Doggett Company, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [17-20551] (Stephen Burton Crain ) [Entered: 09/11/2017 02:31 PM]
September 11, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM Christopher L. Dodson for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [17-20551] (Christopher Dodson ) [Entered: 09/11/2017 02:27 PM]
September 8, 2017 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: OK to Process with Special Issues to be Briefed. [8585964-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 09/25/2017 for Appellant Doggett Company, L.L.C. [17-20551] (ABT) [Entered: 09/08/2017 10:25 AM]
August 30, 2017 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Doggett Company, L.L.C. [17-20551] (LCA) [Entered: 08/30/2017 03:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doggett Company, L.L.C. v. Thermo King Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DOGGETT COMPANY, L.L.C.
Represented By: Ryan C. Myers
Represented By: Stephen Burton Crain Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Dodson
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THERMO KING CORPORATION
Represented By: Gregory Clayton Ulmer Esq.
Represented By: Peng-Cheng Glen Shu
Represented By: Jordan Alana Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?