Curtis Marsh, et al v. Specialized Loan Servicing, et al
Defendant / Appellee: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, As Trustee, MACKIE WOLF ZIENTZ & MANN, P.C and SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C., Alleged Mortgage Servicer for Morgan Stanley Mortgage Trust 2006-15XS
Plaintiff / Appellant: CURTIS MARSH and JAIME MARSH
Case Number: 19-10034
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 20, 2020 Curtis Marsh, et al v. Specialized Loan Servicing,

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Branch Masterson Sheppard for Appellee U.S. Bank National Association in 19-10034, Attorney Branch Masterson Sheppard for Appellee Specialized Loan Servicing, L.L.C. in 19-10034 [19-10034] (AGL) [Entered: 02/14/2019 11:53 AM]
February 13, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10034] (Branch Masterson Sheppard ) [Entered: 02/13/2019 12:03 PM]
February 4, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. SPECIAL ISSUES TO BE BRIEFED. A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/18/2019 for Appellants Curtis Marsh and Jaime Marsh. [19-10034] (DDL) [Entered: 02/04/2019 12:47 PM]
February 4, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-10034] (DDL) [Entered: 02/04/2019 12:46 PM]
January 31, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Mark Douglas Cronenwett for Appellee Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C in 19-10034 [19-10034] (CB) [Entered: 01/31/2019 10:14 AM]
January 30, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Mark Douglas Cronenwett for Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10034] (Mark Douglas Cronenwett ) [Entered: 01/30/2019 01:51 PM]
January 18, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:17-CV-2111. Electronic ROA due on 02/04/2019. [19-10034] (RSM) [Entered: 01/18/2019 01:54 PM]
January 18, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: OK to Process with Special Issues to be Briefed. [8964741-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-10034] (RSM) [Entered: 01/18/2019 01:51 PM]
January 11, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Curtis Marsh and Mr. Jaime Marsh [19-10034] (CMB) [Entered: 01/11/2019 03:42 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Curtis Marsh, et al v. Specialized Loan Servicing, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, As Trustee
Represented By: Branch Masterson Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MACKIE WOLF ZIENTZ & MANN, P.C
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Represented By: Dustin C. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C., Alleged Mortgage Servicer for Morgan Stanley Mortgage Trust 2006-15XS
Represented By: Branch Masterson Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CURTIS MARSH
Represented By: Curtis L. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAIME MARSH
Represented By: Curtis L. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?