Ivan Vetcher v. Dusty Rowden, et al
Defendant / Appellee: ICE AGENTS, LNU/FNU, ICEA1, FNU HERNANDEZ, Detention Officer at Rolling Plains Regional Jail Detention Center, MARCELLO VILLEGAS, Warden, Rolling Plains Regional Jail Detention Center, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, Supervisors, JEH C. JOHNSON, Secretary of Department of Homeland Security, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, Supervisors, FNU ASHLEY, Detention Officer at Rolling Plains Regional Jail Detention Center, DUSTY ROWDEN, ICE Deportation Officer, FNU ROSS, Detention Officer at Rolling Plains Regional Jail Detention Center, PHILIP T. MILLER, Assistant Director of Field Operations for Enforcement and Removal Operations, ICE AGENTS, LNU/FNU, ICEA2, ROLLING PLAINS REGIONAL JAIL & DETENTION CENTER STAFF and ICE OFFICERS, LNU/FNU
Plaintiff / Appellant: IVAN VETCHER
Case Number: 19-10156
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 1, 2021 Vetcher v. Img and Customs Enforcement, et al

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 CLERK ORDER denying Motion for leave for pro se to file electronically filed by Appellant Mr. Ivan Vetcher [ # 9021308-2 ] [19-10156] (MFY) [Entered: 04/04/2019 09:26 AM]
March 29, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Ivan Vetcher for leave to file electronically as a pro se party [9021308-2]. [19-10156] (MFY) [Entered: 04/03/2019 04:07 PM]
March 14, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-10156] (DDL) [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:46 PM]
March 12, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:16-CV-164. Electronic ROA due on 03/27/2019. [19-10156] (DLM) [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:50 PM]
March 12, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief due on 04/22/2019 for Appellant Ivan Vetcher. [19-10156] (DLM) [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:46 PM]
March 12, 2019 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 02/22/2019 granting IFP for Appellant Mr. Ivan Vetcher. [19-10156] (DLM) [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:40 PM]
February 26, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Ann Elizabeth Cruce-Haag for Appellee DHS in 19-10156, Attorney Ann Elizabeth Cruce-Haag for Appellee Dusty Rowden in 19-10156, Attorney Ann Elizabeth Cruce-Haag for Appellee Immigration and Customs Enforcement in 19-10156 [19-10156] (RSM) [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:02 AM]
February 25, 2019 FORWARDING MOTION for IFP received from Appellant Mr. Ivan Vetcher to the District Court for filing.Fee deadline canceled. [19-10156] (MRW) [Entered: 03/08/2019 12:58 PM]
February 21, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Ann Elizabeth Cruce-Haag for Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mr. Dusty Rowden and DHS for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10156] (Ann Elizabeth Cruce-Haag ) [Entered: 02/21/2019 10:38 AM]
February 15, 2019 CLERK ORDER denying Motion for leave for pro se to file electronically filed by Appellant Mr. Ivan Vetcher [ # 8984481-2 ] [19-10156] (MRW) [Entered: 02/15/2019 09:15 AM]
February 13, 2019 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 02/05/2019 allowing 20 days from the date of this order for appellant to pay the $505.00 filing fee or file a signed application to proceed IFP with the clerk. Fee deadline updated to 02/25/2019 for Appellant Ivan Vetcher [19-10156] (DLM) [Entered: 02/13/2019 01:55 PM]
February 13, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8983471-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-10156] (DLM) [Entered: 02/13/2019 01:51 PM]
February 11, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Ivan Vetcher for leave to file electronically as a pro se party [8984481-2]. [19-10156] (MRW) [Entered: 02/14/2019 02:05 PM]
February 8, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Ivan Vetcher [19-10156] (RSM) [Entered: 02/08/2019 10:11 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ivan Vetcher v. Dusty Rowden, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ICE AGENTS, LNU/FNU, ICEA1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU HERNANDEZ, Detention Officer at Rolling Plains Regional Jail Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARCELLO VILLEGAS, Warden, Rolling Plains Regional Jail Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, Supervisors
Represented By: Ann Elizabeth Cruce-Haag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEH C. JOHNSON, Secretary of Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, Supervisors
Represented By: Ann Elizabeth Cruce-Haag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU ASHLEY, Detention Officer at Rolling Plains Regional Jail Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DUSTY ROWDEN, ICE Deportation Officer
Represented By: Ann Elizabeth Cruce-Haag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU ROSS, Detention Officer at Rolling Plains Regional Jail Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIP T. MILLER, Assistant Director of Field Operations for Enforcement and Removal Operations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ICE AGENTS, LNU/FNU, ICEA2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROLLING PLAINS REGIONAL JAIL & DETENTION CENTER STAFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ICE OFFICERS, LNU/FNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: IVAN VETCHER
Represented By: Ivan Vetcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?