Anson General Hospital, et al v. Alex Azar, II, Secretary
Defendant / Appellee: ALEX M. AZAR, II, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANSON GENERAL HOSPITAL, SOUTHERN OAKS HEALTHCARE, INCORPORATED, doing business as Wisteria Place, STAMFORD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL and CONTINUE CARE HOSPITAL AT HENDRICK MEDICAL CENTER
Case Number: 19-10470
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 24, 2020 Anson General Hospital, et al v. Alex Azar, II, Se

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Paper copies of Record Excerpts filed by Appellants Anson General Hospital, Continue Care Hospital at Hendrick Medical Center, Stamford Memorial Hospital and Southern Oaks Healthcare, Incorporated in 19-10470 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [19-10470] (NFD) [Entered: 06/21/2019 09:08 AM]
June 19, 2019 Paper copies of Appellant Brief filed by Appellants Anson General Hospital, Continue Care Hospital at Hendrick Medical Center, Stamford Memorial Hospital and Southern Oaks Healthcare, Incorporated in 19-10470 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10470] (NFD) [Entered: 06/21/2019 09:07 AM]
June 17, 2019 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 06/24/2019 for Appellants Anson General Hospital, Continue Care Hospital at Hendrick Medical Center, Southern Oaks Healthcare, Incorporated and Stamford Memorial Hospital. [19-10470] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Anson General Hospital, Continue Care Hospital at Hendrick Medical Center, Southern Oaks Healthcare, Incorporated and Stamford Memorial Hospital. Date of service: 06/17/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Parker; Attorney for Appellant: Roth [19-10470] (Robert L. Roth ) [Entered: 06/17/2019 02:39 PM]
June 17, 2019 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 07/17/2019 for Appellee Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. Paper Copies of Brief due on 06/24/2019 for Appellants Anson General Hospital, Continue Care Hospital at Hendrick Medical Center, Southern Oaks Healthcare, Incorporated and Stamford Memorial Hospital. [19-10470] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Anson General Hospital, Continue Care Hospital at Hendrick Medical Center, Southern Oaks Healthcare, Incorporated and Stamford Memorial Hospital. Date of service: 06/17/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Parker; Attorney for Appellant: Roth [19-10470] (Robert L. Roth ) [Entered: 06/17/2019 02:35 PM]
May 7, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/17/2019 for Appellants Anson General Hospital, Continue Care Hospital at Hendrick Medical Center, Southern Oaks Healthcare, Incorporated and Stamford Memorial Hospital. [19-10470] (CB) [Entered: 05/07/2019 07:39 AM]
May 7, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-10470] (CB) [Entered: 05/07/2019 07:38 AM]
May 6, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:18-CV-11. Electronic ROA due on 05/21/2019. [19-10470] (CBW) [Entered: 05/06/2019 01:04 PM]
May 6, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9045714-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-10470] (CBW) [Entered: 05/06/2019 01:01 PM]
May 6, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Robert L. Roth for Appellant Southern Oaks Healthcare, Incorporated in 19-10470, Attorney Robert L. Roth for Appellant Stamford Memorial Hospital in 19-10470, Attorney Robert L. Roth for Appellant Continue Care Hospital at Hendrick Medical Center in 19-10470, Attorney Robert L. Roth for Appellant Anson General Hospital in 19-10470 [19-10470] (CB) [Entered: 05/06/2019 11:34 AM]
May 6, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Robert L. Roth for Anson General Hospital, Continue Care Hospital at Hendrick Medical Center, Southern Oaks Healthcare, Incorporated and Stamford Memorial Hospital for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10470] (Robert L. Roth ) [Entered: 05/06/2019 09:41 AM]
April 25, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Anson General Hospital, Continue Care Hospital at Hendrick Medical Center, Southern Oaks Healthcare, Incorporated and Stamford Memorial Hospital [19-10470] (CBW) [Entered: 04/25/2019 10:07 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Anson General Hospital, et al v. Alex Azar, II, Secretary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEX M. AZAR, II, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Tami C. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANSON GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SOUTHERN OAKS HEALTHCARE, INCORPORATED, doing business as Wisteria Place
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STAMFORD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONTINUE CARE HOSPITAL AT HENDRICK MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?