Joseph Kiggundu v. Bank of New York Mellon, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOSEPH E. KIGGUNDU
Defendant / Appellee: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C. and BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, formerly known as Bank of New York, as Trustee for CWALT 2006-35CB
Case Number: 19-20215
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 23, 2019 Joseph Kiggundu v. Bank of New York Mellon, et al

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 COURT ORDER denying motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph E. Kiggundu [ # 9064170-2 ] [19-20215] (JMW) [Entered: 05/30/2019 04:01 PM]
May 29, 2019 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Joseph E. Kiggundu. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires the citations to the record are not correct. Additionally the Brief requires: Statement regarding oral argument, statement of jurisdiction, summary of argument; removal of "Final Judgment", as record excerpts are required and the final judgment should be in the record excerpts. . Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 7 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Record Excerpts due on 06/12/2019 for Appellant Joseph E. Kiggundu. Sufficient Brief due on 06/12/2019 for Appellant Joseph E. Kiggundu. [19-20215] (JMW) [Entered: 06/03/2019 01:22 PM]
May 29, 2019 MOTION filed by pro se appellant Mr. Joseph E. Kiggundu for stay pending appeal [9064170-2] Ruling is requested before: 06/04/2019. Document is insufficient for the following reasons: required: certificate of interested persons, certificate of conference, certificate of service, certificate of sompliance Response/Opposition due on 06/10/2019.. Sufficient Mtn/Resp/Reply due on 05/30/2019 for Appellant Joseph E. Kiggundu [19-20215] (JMW) [Entered: 05/30/2019 01:56 PM]
April 24, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/03/2019 for Appellant Joseph E. Kiggundu. [19-20215] (MAS) [Entered: 04/24/2019 09:52 AM]
April 24, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-20215] (MAS) [Entered: 04/24/2019 09:50 AM]
April 23, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:18-CV-1455. Electronic ROA due on 05/08/2019. [19-20215] (JMW) [Entered: 04/23/2019 10:59 AM]
April 19, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Joseph E. Kiggundu advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-20215] (JMW) [Entered: 04/23/2019 10:58 AM]
April 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Daniel P. Troiano for party(s) Appellee Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C. Appellee Bank of New York Mellon, in case 19-20215 [19-20215] (JMW) [Entered: 04/12/2019 04:21 PM]
April 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Richard Dwayne Danner for Appellee Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C. in 19-20215, Attorney Richard Dwayne Danner for Appellee Bank of New York Mellon in 19-20215 [19-20215] (JMW) [Entered: 04/12/2019 04:20 PM]
April 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Matt Delmore Manning for Appellee Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C. in 19-20215, Attorney Matt Delmore Manning for Appellee Bank of New York Mellon in 19-20215 [19-20215] (JMW) [Entered: 04/12/2019 04:18 PM]
April 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20215] (Daniel P. Troiano ) [Entered: 04/12/2019 11:25 AM]
April 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Richard Dwayne Danner for Bank of New York Mellon and Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20215] (Richard Dwayne Danner ) [Entered: 04/12/2019 11:22 AM]
April 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Matt Delmore Manning for Bank of New York Mellon and Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20215] (Matt Delmore Manning ) [Entered: 04/12/2019 11:20 AM]
April 9, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9025774-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 04/24/2019 for Appellant Joseph E. Kiggundu [19-20215] (JMW) [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:20 PM]
April 5, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph E. Kiggundu [19-20215] (AS) [Entered: 04/05/2019 11:34 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Joseph Kiggundu v. Bank of New York Mellon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH E. KIGGUNDU
Represented By: Joseph E. Kiggundu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C.
Represented By: Daniel P. Troiano
Represented By: Richard Dwayne Danner
Represented By: Matt Delmore Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, formerly known as Bank of New York, as Trustee for CWALT 2006-35CB
Represented By: Daniel P. Troiano
Represented By: Richard Dwayne Danner
Represented By: Matt Delmore Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?