Carolyn Dawson v. Bank of New York Mellon, et al
Defendant / Appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, formerly known as Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Benefit of the Certificate Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-SD1, SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE, L.L.C. and BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, formerly known as Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Benefit of the Certificate Holders of the CWABS, Incorporated, Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-SD1
Plaintiff / Appellant: CAROLYN R. DAWSON
Case Number: 19-20224
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 12, 2019 Carolyn Dawson v. Bank of New York Mellon, et al

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Monica Summers for party(s) Appellee Bank of New York Mellon Appellee Shellpoint Mortgage, L.L.C., in case 19-20224 [19-20224] (CAS) [Entered: 05/02/2019 09:20 AM]
May 2, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) C. Charles Townsend for party(s) Appellee Bank of New York Mellon Appellee Shellpoint Mortgage, L.L.C., in case 19-20224 [19-20224] (CAS) [Entered: 05/02/2019 09:16 AM]
May 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20224] (Monica Summers ) [Entered: 05/01/2019 02:52 PM]
May 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20224] (C. Charles Townsend ) [Entered: 05/01/2019 02:51 PM]
April 29, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/10/2019 for Appellant Carolyn R. Dawson. [19-20224] (AGL) [Entered: 04/29/2019 07:09 AM]
April 29, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-20224] (AGL) [Entered: 04/29/2019 07:08 AM]
April 16, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:18-CV-2846. Electronic ROA due on 05/01/2019. [19-20224] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/16/2019 08:30 AM]
April 16, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9030069-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-20224] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/16/2019 08:23 AM]
April 8, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Carolyn R. Dawson [19-20224] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Carolyn Dawson v. Bank of New York Mellon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, formerly known as Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Benefit of the Certificate Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-SD1
Represented By: Alysia Nicole Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alysia Nicole Carlson
Represented By: C. Charles Townsend Esq.
Represented By: Monica Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, formerly known as Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Benefit of the Certificate Holders of the CWABS, Incorporated, Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-SD1
Represented By: Alysia Nicole Carlson
Represented By: C. Charles Townsend Esq.
Represented By: Monica Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CAROLYN R. DAWSON
Represented By: Carolyn R. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?