Cedra Pharmacy Houston, L.L.C., et al v. UnitedHealth Group, Inc, et al
Defendant / Appellee: OPTUMRX, INCORPORATED, BRIOVARX OF MAINE, L.L.C., UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INCORPORATED, CATAMARAN, L.L.C., SALVEO SPECIALTY PHARMACY, INCORPORATED, CATAMARAN PBM OF ILLINOIS, INCORPORATED, CATAMARAN CORPORATION, BRIOVARX, L.L.C., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INCORPORATED and BRIOVARX OF MAINE, INCORPORATED
Plaintiff / Appellant: CEDRA PHARMACY LOS ANGELES, L.L.C., CEDRA PHARMACY HOUSTON, L.L.C. and JAMMZ CHEMISTS, L.L.C.
Case Number: 19-20264
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Alec Sauchik for Appellant Cedra Pharmacy Los Angeles, L.L.C. in 19-20264, Attorney Alec Sauchik for Appellant JAMMZ Chemists, L.L.C. in 19-20264, Attorney Alec Sauchik for Appellant Cedra Pharmacy Houston, L.L.C. in 19-20264. [19-20264] (RLL) [Entered: 06/12/2019 02:39 PM]
June 10, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20264] (Alec Sauchik ) [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:42 PM]
June 5, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/15/2019 for Appellants Cedra Pharmacy Houston, L.L.C., Cedra Pharmacy Los Angeles, L.L.C. and JAMMZ Chemists, L.L.C.. [19-20264] (AGL) [Entered: 06/05/2019 03:07 PM]
June 5, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-20264] (AGL) [Entered: 06/05/2019 03:06 PM]
May 23, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:17-CV-3800. Electronic ROA due on 06/07/2019. [19-20264] (CAS) [Entered: 05/23/2019 10:38 AM]
May 23, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-20264] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Cedra Pharmacy Houston, L.L.C., Cedra Pharmacy Los Angeles, L.L.C. and JAMMZ Chemists, L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 05/23/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Boyce, Ellsworth, Whitesell; Attorney for Appellant: Sauchik [19-20264] (Alec Sauchik ) [Entered: 05/23/2019 10:30 AM]
May 7, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jessica Lynn Ellsworth for party(s) Appellee BriovaRx, L.L.C. Appellee UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated Appellee OptumRx, Incorporated Appellee BriovaRx of Maine, L.L.C. Appellee United Healthcare Services, Incorporated Appellee Salveo Specialty Pharmacy, Incorporated, in case 19-20264 [19-20264] (CAS) [Entered: 05/07/2019 10:16 AM]
May 7, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Maria Wyckoff Boyce for Appellee Salveo Specialty Pharmacy, Incorporated in 19-20264, Attorney Maria Wyckoff Boyce for Appellee BriovaRx, L.L.C. in 19-20264, Attorney Maria Wyckoff Boyce for Appellee BriovaRx of Maine, L.L.C. in 19-20264, Attorney Maria Wyckoff Boyce for Appellee United Healthcare Services, Incorporated in 19-20264, Attorney Maria Wyckoff Boyce for Appellee OptumRx, Incorporated in 19-20264, Attorney Maria Wyckoff Boyce for Appellee UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated in 19-20264 [19-20264] (CAS) [Entered: 05/07/2019 10:11 AM]
May 7, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) S. Lee Whitesell for party(s) Appellee BriovaRx, L.L.C. Appellee UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated Appellee OptumRx, Incorporated Appellee BriovaRx of Maine, L.L.C. Appellee United Healthcare Services, Incorporated Appellee Salveo Specialty Pharmacy, Incorporated, in case 19-20264 [19-20264] (CAS) [Entered: 05/07/2019 10:05 AM]
May 3, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Appearance form for Maria Boyce received from Appellees BriovaRx of Maine, L.L.C., BriovaRx, L.L.C., OptumRx, Incorporated, Salveo Specialty Pharmacy, Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Incorporated and UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated because it is a duplicate. [19-20264] (CAS) [Entered: 05/07/2019 10:21 AM]
May 3, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20264] (Jessica Lynn Ellsworth ) [Entered: 05/03/2019 12:48 PM]
May 3, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20264] (Maria Wyckoff Boyce ) [Entered: 05/03/2019 11:39 AM]
May 3, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20264] (S. Lee Whitesell ) [Entered: 05/03/2019 11:20 AM]
May 2, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appearance form for Jessica Ellsworth received from Appellees BriovaRx of Maine, L.L.C., BriovaRx, L.L.C., OptumRx, Incorporated, Salveo Specialty Pharmacy, Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Incorporated and UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated because it is a duplicate [19-20264] (CAS) [Entered: 05/07/2019 10:29 AM]
May 2, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9043147-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 05/17/2019 for Appellants Cedra Pharmacy Houston, L.L.C., Cedra Pharmacy Los Angeles, L.L.C. and JAMMZ Chemists, L.L.C. [19-20264] (CBW) [Entered: 05/02/2019 10:10 AM]
April 22, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Cedra Pharmacy Houston, L.L.C., Cedra Pharmacy Los Angeles, L.L.C. and JAMMZ Chemists, L.L.C. [19-20264] (CBW) [Entered: 04/22/2019 12:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cedra Pharmacy Houston, L.L.C., et al v. UnitedHealth Group, Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OPTUMRX, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
Represented By: S. Lee Whitesell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIOVARX OF MAINE, L.L.C.
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
Represented By: S. Lee Whitesell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CATAMARAN, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SALVEO SPECIALTY PHARMACY, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
Represented By: S. Lee Whitesell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CATAMARAN PBM OF ILLINOIS, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CATAMARAN CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIOVARX, L.L.C.
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
Represented By: S. Lee Whitesell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
Represented By: S. Lee Whitesell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIOVARX OF MAINE, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
Represented By: S. Lee Whitesell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CEDRA PHARMACY LOS ANGELES, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alec Sauchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CEDRA PHARMACY HOUSTON, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alec Sauchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMMZ CHEMISTS, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alec Sauchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?