Suniverse, L.L.C. v. Ameriquest Mortgage Company, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: SUNIVERSE, L.L.C.
Defendant / Appellee: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., as Trustee for Park Place Securities, Incorporated, Asset-Backed Pass Through Certificates, Series 2004-MCW1, Class A-1 Certificates, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., AMERIQUEST MORTGAGE COMPANY, JACK PALMER and SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C.
Case Number: 19-20352
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/29/2019 for Appellant Suniverse, L.L.C.. [19-20352] (CB) [Entered: 06/19/2019 07:53 AM]
June 19, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-20352] (CB) [Entered: 06/19/2019 07:52 AM]
June 10, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:18-CV-3320 (please correct the transcript hearing date before creating the record). Electronic ROA due on 06/25/2019. [19-20352] (ABT) [Entered: 06/10/2019 02:21 PM]
June 10, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Suniverse, L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-20352] (ABT) [Entered: 06/10/2019 02:19 PM]
June 10, 2019 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Suniverse, L.L.C.for the Court to process. Date of service: 06/10/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bernhardt, Davis, Jones; Attorney for Appellant: Jackson. [19-20352] (Jeffrey Craig Jackson ) [Entered: 06/10/2019 09:41 AM]
June 7, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Connie Flores Jones for party(s) Appellee Bank of America, N.A., in case 19-20352 [19-20352] (ABT) [Entered: 06/07/2019 08:48 AM]
June 6, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20352] (Connie Flores Jones ) [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:32 PM]
May 31, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jason Ryan Bernhardt for Appellee Specialized Loan Servicing, L.L.C. in 19-20352, Attorney Jason Ryan Bernhardt for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in 19-20352 [19-20352] (ABT) [Entered: 05/31/2019 01:28 PM]
May 31, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20352] (Jason Ryan Bernhardt ) [Entered: 05/31/2019 12:29 PM]
May 28, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9061464-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 06/12/2019 for Appellant Suniverse, L.L.C. [19-20352] (CSG) [Entered: 05/28/2019 08:19 AM]
May 23, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jeffrey Craig Jackson for Appellant Suniverse, L.L.C. in 19-20352 [19-20352] (ABT) [Entered: 05/23/2019 10:16 AM]
May 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Jeffrey Craig Jackson for Suniverse, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20352] (Jeffrey Craig Jackson ) [Entered: 05/22/2019 01:50 PM]
May 21, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Suniverse, L.L.C. [19-20352] (CSG) [Entered: 05/21/2019 01:49 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Suniverse, L.L.C. v. Ameriquest Mortgage Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUNIVERSE, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jeffrey Craig Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., as Trustee for Park Place Securities, Incorporated, Asset-Backed Pass Through Certificates, Series 2004-MCW1, Class A-1 Certificates
Represented By: Jason Ryan Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By: Kathryn Buza Davis
Represented By: Connie Flores Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERIQUEST MORTGAGE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACK PALMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jason Ryan Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?