Rita Joshua, et al v. Jasmine Foreman, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JON CHATMAN, ROBERT CARDENAS, SUSAN DAVIS, TIFFANY REEDY, DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY AND PROTECTIVE SERVICES, AYESHIA REYNOLDS, ANGELA MCPHEE, AZELIA G. SMITH, CHIEF JUSTICE FROST, KIMBERLY GRANT, HARRIS COUNTY POLICE DEPARTMENT, MYRON EVANS, TENEIL WHITFIELD, LIEDER ELEMENTARY, JULIE KETTERMAN, STEPHANIE EWING, MEAGHAN L. DICKERSON, MICHELLE M. KIM, JUSTICE DONOVAN, ERIC MCFERREN, ALYSSA LEMKUIL, MICHAEL DAVID SYDOW, JR., Judge, JARED WOODFILL, JASMINE FOREMAN, JUSTICE BROWN and MEGHANN SMITH
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANTHONY DENNISON and RITA JOSHUA
Case Number: 19-20446
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 CLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to order transcript and make financial arrangements with court reporter[9121183-2] [19-20446] (JMW) [Entered: 08/14/2019 01:38 PM]
July 23, 2019 DISMISSAL NOTICE ISSUED for failure to order transcript and make financial arrangements with court reporter[9104022-2] Transcript order deadline canceled for Anthony Dennison and Rita Joshua. DIS-1 Remedy due on 08/07/2019 for Appellants Anthony Dennison and Rita Joshua. [19-20446] (LLL) [Entered: 07/23/2019 01:57 PM]
July 17, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Seth Barrett Hopkins for Appellee Tiffany Reedy in 19-20446, Attorney Seth Barrett Hopkins for Appellee Harris County Police Department in 19-20446, Attorney Seth Barrett Hopkins for Appellee Alyssa Lemkuil in 19-20446, Attorney Seth Barrett Hopkins for Appellee Stephanie Ewing in 19-20446 [19-20446] (JMW) [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:40 AM]
July 17, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Scot Macdonald Graydon for Appellee Brown in 19-20446, Attorney Scot Macdonald Graydon for Appellee Donovan in 19-20446, Attorney Scot Macdonald Graydon for Appellee Frost in 19-20446, by Attorney(s) Scot Macdonald Graydon for party(s) Appellee Teneil Whitfield Appellee Jasmine Foreman Appellee Ayeshia Reynolds Appellee Department of Family and Protective Services Appellee Kimberly Grant Appellee Myron Evans Appellee Jon Chatman, in case 19-20446 [19-20446] (JMW) [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:37 AM]
July 16, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Scot Macdonald Graydon for NFN Brown, NFN Donovan and NFN Frost for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20446] (Scot Macdonald Graydon ) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:32 PM]
July 16, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Seth Barrett Hopkins for Ms. Stephanie Ewing, Harris County Police Department, Ms. Alyssa Lemkuil and Ms. Tiffany Reedy for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20446] (Seth Barrett Hopkins ) [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:48 AM]
July 3, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Christopher Blewer Gilbert for Appellee Lieder Elementary in 19-20446 [19-20446] (JMW) [Entered: 07/03/2019 10:30 AM]
July 2, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Christopher Blewer Gilbert for Lieder Elementary for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20446] (Christopher Blewer Gilbert ) [Entered: 07/02/2019 12:10 PM]
July 1, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9087834-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 07/16/2019 for Appellants Anthony Dennison and Rita Joshua [19-20446] (JMW) [Entered: 07/01/2019 12:40 PM]
June 26, 2019 CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Anthony Dennison and Ms. Rita Joshua [19-20446] (AS) [Entered: 06/26/2019 12:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rita Joshua, et al v. Jasmine Foreman, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JON CHATMAN
Represented By: Christine Hervey Smith
Represented By: Scot Macdonald Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT CARDENAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN DAVIS
Represented By: Isaac Edwin Henderson Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIFFANY REEDY
Represented By: Seth Barrett Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY AND PROTECTIVE SERVICES
Represented By: Christine Hervey Smith
Represented By: Scot Macdonald Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AYESHIA REYNOLDS
Represented By: Christine Hervey Smith
Represented By: Scot Macdonald Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANGELA MCPHEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AZELIA G. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHIEF JUSTICE FROST
Represented By: Scot Macdonald Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIMBERLY GRANT
Represented By: Christine Hervey Smith
Represented By: Scot Macdonald Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HARRIS COUNTY POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Seth Barrett Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MYRON EVANS
Represented By: Christine Hervey Smith
Represented By: Scot Macdonald Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TENEIL WHITFIELD
Represented By: Christine Hervey Smith
Represented By: Scot Macdonald Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIEDER ELEMENTARY
Represented By: Christopher Blewer Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JULIE KETTERMAN
Represented By: Julie A. Ketterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHANIE EWING
Represented By: Seth Barrett Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MEAGHAN L. DICKERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHELLE M. KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUSTICE DONOVAN
Represented By: Scot Macdonald Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIC MCFERREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALYSSA LEMKUIL
Represented By: Seth Barrett Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL DAVID SYDOW, JR., Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JARED WOODFILL
Represented By: Jared Ryker Woodfill V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASMINE FOREMAN
Represented By: Christine Hervey Smith
Represented By: Scot Macdonald Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUSTICE BROWN
Represented By: Scot Macdonald Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MEGHANN SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTHONY DENNISON
Represented By: Anthony Dennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RITA JOSHUA
Represented By: Rita Joshua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?