Moses Kanja v. Select Portfolio Svc, Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY, N.A. and SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INCORPORATED
Plaintiff / Appellant: MOSES KANJA
Case Number: 19-20549
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 10, 2020 Moses Kanja v. Select Portfolio Svc, Inc., et al

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. A/Pet's Brief Due on 11/12/2019 for Appellant Moses Kanja. [19-20549] (RLL) [Entered: 10/02/2019 09:41 AM]
October 2, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. [19-20549] (RLL) [Entered: 10/02/2019 09:40 AM]
October 2, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Moses Kanja advising no hearings. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. [19-20549] (RLL) [Entered: 10/02/2019 09:37 AM]
September 19, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process additional appeal docketed September 12, 2019. [9148155-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-20549] (CAG) [Entered: 09/19/2019 08:39 AM]
September 12, 2019 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9143576-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Moses Kanja. [9143576-1] [19-20549] (CAG) [Entered: 09/12/2019 02:44 PM]
September 12, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting implied Motion to reopen case filed by Appellant Mr. Moses Kanja [ # 9143272-2 ]. Transcript order due on 09/27/2019 for Appellant Moses Kanja. [19-20549] (CAG) [Entered: 09/12/2019 02:29 PM]
September 12, 2019 FEE PAID by Appellant Mr. Moses Kanja. [19-20549] (CAG) [Entered: 09/12/2019 11:45 AM]
September 10, 2019 Implied MOTION to reopen case [9143272-2] filed by Appellant Mr. Moses Kanja. Default has been remedied as to the fee. [19-20549] (CAG) [Entered: 09/12/2019 11:41 AM]
September 3, 2019 CLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to pay fee [9135398-2]; failure to order transcript and make financial arrangements with court reporter[9135398-2] [19-20549] (WMJ) [Entered: 09/03/2019 01:14 PM]
August 27, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Michael F. Hord for Appellee Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. in 19-20549, Attorney Michael F. Hord for Appellee Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated in 19-20549 [19-20549] (CAG) [Entered: 08/27/2019 04:59 PM]
August 27, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michael Doyle Conner for party(s) Appellee Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated Appellee Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., in case 19-20549 [19-20549] (LLL) [Entered: 08/27/2019 11:55 AM]
August 26, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20549] (Michael F. Hord ) [Entered: 08/26/2019 02:12 PM]
August 26, 2019 Attorney Mr. Michael F. Hord, Esq. for Appellees Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated and Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. is advised to resubmit an appearance form to include complete address of law firm. [19-20549] (LBM) [Entered: 08/26/2019 01:16 PM]
August 26, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20549] (Michael Doyle Conner ) [Entered: 08/26/2019 12:27 PM]
August 26, 2019 Attorney Michael D. Conner is advised to resubmit an appearance form to include address of law firm. [19-20549] (LBM) [Entered: 08/26/2019 11:20 AM]
August 23, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20549] (Michael F. Hord ) [Entered: 08/23/2019 02:11 PM]
August 23, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20549] (Michael Doyle Conner ) [Entered: 08/23/2019 02:05 PM]
August 12, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9119057-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 08/27/2019 for Appellant Moses Kanja. Transcript order due on 08/27/2019 for Appellant Moses Kanja [19-20549] (CBW) [Entered: 08/12/2019 11:53 AM]
August 6, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Moses Kanja [19-20549] (CBW) [Entered: 08/06/2019 02:00 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Moses Kanja v. Select Portfolio Svc, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY, N.A.
Represented By: Michael F. Hord Esq.
Represented By: Michael Doyle Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Michael F. Hord Esq.
Represented By: Michael Doyle Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MOSES KANJA
Represented By: Moses Kanja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?