Aetna Life Insurance Company v. Won Yi, et al
Defendant / Appellant: COMPLETE ANESTHESIA SERVICES, P.A., PARADIGM PHYSICIAN SERVICES, L.L.C., WON YI, Medical Doctor, PARAGON AMBULATORY HEALTH RESOURCES, L.L.C., PHYSICIANS AUDITING & BILLING SERVICES, INCORPORATED, PARADIGM ANESTHESIA SERVICES, P.A., PARADIGM AMBULATORY MEDICAL SERVICES, P.A. and PARADIGM AMBULATORY ASSOCIATES, L.L.C.
Plaintiff / Appellee: AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 19-20575
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 filed by Appellants Mr. Won Yi, Paradigm Ambulatory Medical Services, P.A., Paradigm Anesthesia Services, P.A., Paradigm Ambulatory Associates, L.L.C., Complete Anesthesia Services, P.A., Paragon Ambulatory Health Resources, L.L.C. and Paradigm Physician Services, L.L.C. [ # 9152332-2 ] [19-20575] (JMW) [Entered: 09/25/2019 01:59 PM]
September 25, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 filed by Appellant Physicians Auditing & Billing Services, Incorporated [ # 9149995-2 ] [19-20575] (JMW) [Entered: 09/25/2019 01:56 PM]
September 25, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Complete Anesthesia Services, P.A., Paradigm Ambulatory Associates, L.L.C., Paradigm Ambulatory Medical Services, P.A., Paradigm Anesthesia Services, P.A., Paradigm Physician Services, L.L.C., Paragon Ambulatory Health Resources, L.L.C. and Mr. Won Yi to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 [9152332-2]. Date of service: 09/25/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Durham, Fordan; Attorney for Appellee: Shely [19-20575] (Frederick Leighton Durham III) [Entered: 09/25/2019 09:22 AM]
September 23, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the motoin to dismiss appeal received from Appellants Complete Anesthesia Services, P.A., Paradigm Ambulatory Associates, L.L.C., Paradigm Ambulatory Medical Services, P.A., Paradigm Anesthesia Services, P.A., Paradigm Physician Services, L.L.C., Paragon Ambulatory Health Resources, L.L.C., Physicians Auditing & Billing Services, Incorporated and Mr. Won Yi because the incorrect event, "Anders Brief Filed" was used [19-20575] (JMW) [Entered: 09/23/2019 12:31 PM]
September 20, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Physicians Auditing & Billing Services, Incorporated to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 [9149995-2]. Date of service: 09/20/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Durham, Fordan; Attorney for Appellee: Shely [19-20575] (Amie Pina Fordan ) [Entered: 09/20/2019 06:45 PM]
September 11, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney John Bruce Shely for Appellee Aetna Life Insurance Company in 19-20575 [19-20575] (JMW) [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:41 PM]
September 10, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. John Bruce Shely, Esq. for Aetna Life Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20575] (John Bruce Shely ) [Entered: 09/10/2019 03:13 PM]
August 30, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Amie Pina Fordan for Appellant Physicians Auditing & Billing Services, Incorporated in 19-20575 [19-20575] (DMS) [Entered: 09/03/2019 08:43 AM]
August 30, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Amie Pina Fordan for Physicians Auditing & Billing Services, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20575] (Amie Pina Fordan ) [Entered: 08/30/2019 02:46 PM]
August 27, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. SPECIAL ISSUES TO BE BRIEFED. A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/07/2019 for Appellants Complete Anesthesia Services, P.A., Paradigm Ambulatory Associates, L.L.C., Paradigm Ambulatory Medical Services, P.A., Paradigm Anesthesia Services, P.A., Paradigm Physician Services, L.L.C., Paragon Ambulatory Health Resources, L.L.C., Physicians Auditing & Billing Services, Incorporated and Won Yi. [19-20575] (CB) [Entered: 08/27/2019 01:32 PM]
August 27, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-20575] (CB) [Entered: 08/27/2019 01:31 PM]
August 22, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:14-CV-900. Electronic ROA due on 09/06/2019. [19-20575] (WMJ) [Entered: 08/22/2019 01:08 PM]
August 22, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: OK to Process with Special Issues to be Briefed. [9127684-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-20575] (WMJ) [Entered: 08/22/2019 01:01 PM]
August 16, 2019 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9123450-2] NOA filed by Appellant Physicians Auditing & Billing Services, Incorporated. [9123450-1] [19-20575] (WMJ) [Entered: 08/16/2019 03:04 PM]
August 16, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Complete Anesthesia Services, P.A., Paradigm Ambulatory Associates, L.L.C., Paradigm Ambulatory Medical Services, P.A., Paradigm Anesthesia Services, P.A., Paradigm Physician Services, L.L.C., Paragon Ambulatory Health Resources, L.L.C. and Mr. Won Yi [19-20575] (WMJ) [Entered: 08/16/2019 02:58 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Aetna Life Insurance Company v. Won Yi, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: COMPLETE ANESTHESIA SERVICES, P.A.
Represented By: Frederick Leighton Durham III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PARADIGM PHYSICIAN SERVICES, L.L.C.
Represented By: Frederick Leighton Durham III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WON YI, Medical Doctor
Represented By: Frederick Leighton Durham III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PARAGON AMBULATORY HEALTH RESOURCES, L.L.C.
Represented By: Frederick Leighton Durham III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PHYSICIANS AUDITING & BILLING SERVICES, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Amie Pina Fordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PARADIGM ANESTHESIA SERVICES, P.A.
Represented By: Frederick Leighton Durham III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PARADIGM AMBULATORY MEDICAL SERVICES, P.A.
Represented By: Frederick Leighton Durham III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PARADIGM AMBULATORY ASSOCIATES, L.L.C.
Represented By: Frederick Leighton Durham III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: John Bruce Shely Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?