Wayne Smith v. MTGLQ Investors, L.P.
Defendant / Appellee: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.
Plaintiff / Appellant: WAYNE SMITH
Case Number: 19-20665
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 BRIEFING RESUMED. A/Pet's Brief Due on 12/04/2019 for Appellant Wayne Smith. [19-20665] (JMW) [Entered: 10/25/2019 10:35 AM]
October 25, 2019 BRIEFING SUSPENDED - issued prematurely. EROA was not yet filed. A/Pet's Brief deadline canceled [19-20665] (JMW) [Entered: 10/25/2019 10:30 AM]
October 25, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-20665] (DDL) [Entered: 10/25/2019 09:59 AM]
October 23, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 12/02/2019 for Appellant Wayne Smith. [19-20665] (JMW) [Entered: 10/23/2019 09:40 AM]
October 23, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:19-CV-1888. Electronic ROA due on 11/07/2019. [19-20665] (JMW) [Entered: 10/23/2019 09:39 AM]
October 23, 2019 SIGNED NOTICE OF APPEALS FILED filed by Appellant Mr. Wayne Smith. [19-20665] NOA's docketed 9/19/19 and 9/27/19 (JMW) [Entered: 10/23/2019 09:36 AM]
October 2, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9158457-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-20665] (JMW) [Entered: 10/02/2019 12:22 PM]
October 1, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Wayne Smith advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [19-20665] (JMW) [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:54 PM]
September 27, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Robert Brandon Hakari for Appellee MTGLQ Investors, L.P. in 19-20665 [19-20665] (JMW) [Entered: 09/27/2019 02:05 PM]
September 27, 2019 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9154797-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Wayne Smith. [9154797-1] [19-20665] (DMS) [Entered: 09/27/2019 11:51 AM]
September 26, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Robert Brandon Hakari for MTGLQ Investors, L.P. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20665] (Robert Brandon Hakari ) [Entered: 09/26/2019 01:24 PM]
September 26, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9153597-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Miscellaneous due on 10/31/2019 for Appellant Wayne Smith [19-20665] (signed NOA) (JMW) [Entered: 09/26/2019 10:25 AM]
September 19, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Wayne Smith [19-20665] (AS) [Entered: 09/19/2019 12:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wayne Smith v. MTGLQ Investors, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.
Represented By: Robert Brandon Hakari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WAYNE SMITH
Represented By: Wayne Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?