Donna Cerigny, et al v. Joseph Cappadora, et al
Defendant / Appellee: FAMILY RESOLUTION CENTER, VERONICA ELIZABETH HENRY, Honorable Judge, ANGELIQUE A. REED, Honorable Judge, U.S. WHISTLEBLOWER, (uswhistleblower.org), MONIQUE G. MORIAL, Honorable Judge, JILL JONES-SODERMAN, CHILD FORENSIC ADVOCATE SAFETY CENTER, L.L.C., JOSEPH THOMAS CAPPADORA, CPA, FOUNDATION FOR THE CHILD VICTIMS OF THE FAMILY COURTS, (fcvfc.org), CONSOLIDATED FINANCIAL SERVICES, L.L.C., YU-WEN CHIU, KURT TRAUB, UNIDENTIFIED PARTIES, John Does, Jane Roes, & Corporate Coes 1-5, IN THE BEST INTEREST, (of the Child), JT CAPPADORA, INCORPORATED, MATTHEW PAUL CHENEVERT, CHIH-YANG HU, E. ANDERSON-TRAHAN, Honorable Judge, also known as Teena Anderson-Trahan, MATTHEW CHENEVERT, KURT E. TRAUB and VERONICA E. HENRY, Honorable Judge
Plaintiff / Appellant: CHARLES EDWARD LINCOLN, III, KRISTIE S. HOOTS-MEYER and DONNA CERIGNY
Petitioner / Appellant: ANITA HARRIS
Case Number: 19-30202
Filed: March 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30202] (MRB) [Entered: 04/26/2019 11:07 AM]
April 25, 2019 SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:17-CV-11111; 2:18-CV-869. Electronic ROA due on 05/10/2019. [19-30202] (CCR) [Entered: 04/25/2019 11:54 AM]
April 24, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting in part Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief to and including 6/5/19 filed by Appellant Mr. Charles Edward Lincoln, III [9036619-2]. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 06/05/2019 for Appellant Charles Edward Lincoln III [19-30202] (MCS) [Entered: 04/24/2019 04:00 PM]
April 23, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Charles Edward Lincoln, III to extend time to file brief as appellant until 08/06/2019 [9036619-2]. Date of service: 04/23/2019 [19-30202] (MCS) [Entered: 04/24/2019 02:53 PM]
April 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Daniel Thomas Plunkett for Appellee Kurt E. Traub in 19-30202 [19-30202] (MCS) [Entered: 04/09/2019 12:02 PM]
April 8, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Daniel Thomas Plunkett, Esq. for Mr. Kurt E. Traub for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30202] (Daniel Thomas Plunkett ) [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:53 PM]
April 2, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9019584-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-30202] (CCR) [Entered: 04/02/2019 10:39 AM]
March 27, 2019 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9014923-2] Parties added: Appellants Donna Cerigny, Kristie S. Hoots-Meyer and Anita Harris. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Anita Harris, Ms. Kristie S. Hoots-Meyer and Ms. Donna Cerigny. [9014923-1], added to case. Reason: Additional Appeal Filed. [19-30202] (CCR) [Entered: 03/27/2019 09:56 AM]
March 26, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. SPECIAL ISSUES TO BE BRIEFED. A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/06/2019 for Appellant Charles Edward Lincoln III. [19-30202] (DDL) [Entered: 03/26/2019 10:57 AM]
March 26, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30202] (DDL) [Entered: 03/26/2019 10:55 AM]
March 25, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney David Glen Sanders for Appellee E. Anderson-Trahan in 19-30202, Attorney David Glen Sanders for Appellee Veronica E. Henry in 19-30202, Attorney David Glen Sanders for Appellee Angelique A. Reed in 19-30202, Attorney David Glen Sanders for Appellee Monique G. Morial in 19-30202 [19-30202] (MCS) [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:28 PM]
March 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. David Glen Sanders for E. Anderson-Trahan, Ms. Veronica E. Henry, Ms. Monique G. Morial and Ms. Angelique A. Reed for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30202] (David Glen Sanders ) [Entered: 03/22/2019 09:15 AM]
March 20, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:17-CV-11111 2:18-CV-869. Electronic ROA due on 04/04/2019. [19-30202] (CBW) [Entered: 03/20/2019 01:40 PM]
March 20, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: OK to Process with Special Issues to be Briefed. [9009595-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-30202] (CBW) [Entered: 03/20/2019 01:35 PM]
March 13, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Charles Edward Lincoln, III [19-30202] (CBW) [Entered: 03/13/2019 04:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donna Cerigny, et al v. Joseph Cappadora, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FAMILY RESOLUTION CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VERONICA ELIZABETH HENRY, Honorable Judge
Represented By: David Glen Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANGELIQUE A. REED, Honorable Judge
Represented By: David Glen Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. WHISTLEBLOWER, (uswhistleblower.org)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONIQUE G. MORIAL, Honorable Judge
Represented By: David Glen Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JILL JONES-SODERMAN
Represented By: Jill Jones-Soderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHILD FORENSIC ADVOCATE SAFETY CENTER, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSEPH THOMAS CAPPADORA, CPA
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Cappadora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FOUNDATION FOR THE CHILD VICTIMS OF THE FAMILY COURTS, (fcvfc.org)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CONSOLIDATED FINANCIAL SERVICES, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: YU-WEN CHIU
Represented By: Matthew Paul Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KURT TRAUB
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Plunkett Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNIDENTIFIED PARTIES, John Does, Jane Roes, & Corporate Coes 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IN THE BEST INTEREST, (of the Child)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JT CAPPADORA, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATTHEW PAUL CHENEVERT
Represented By: Matthew Paul Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHIH-YANG HU
Represented By: Matthew Paul Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: E. ANDERSON-TRAHAN, Honorable Judge, also known as Teena Anderson-Trahan
Represented By: David Glen Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATTHEW CHENEVERT
Represented By: Matthew Paul Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KURT E. TRAUB
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Plunkett Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VERONICA E. HENRY, Honorable Judge
Represented By: David Glen Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES EDWARD LINCOLN, III
Represented By: Charles Edward Lincoln III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KRISTIE S. HOOTS-MEYER
Represented By: Kristie S. Hoots-Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONNA CERIGNY
Represented By: Donna Cerigny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ANITA HARRIS
Represented By: Anita Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?