Yu-Wen Chiu, et al v. Charles Lincoln, III
Not Yet Classified: JOSEPH THOMAS CAPPADORA, C.P.A., CHARLES EDWARD LINCOLN, III, KURT E. TRAUB and FOUNDATION FOR THE CHILD VICTIMS OF THE FAMILY COURTS
Plaintiff / Appellee: CHIH-YANG HU and YU-WEN CHIU
Case Number: 19-30248
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30248] (CAS) [Entered: 05/13/2019 09:32 AM]
May 13, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/24/2019 for Appellant Charles Edward Lincoln III. [19-30248] (CAS) [Entered: 05/13/2019 09:34 AM]
April 23, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:17-CV-12275 & 2:18-CV-6308. Electronic ROA due on 05/08/2019. [19-30248] (SEP) [Entered: 04/23/2019 03:12 PM]
April 23, 2019 FEE PAID by Appellant Mr. Charles Edward Lincoln, III. Fee deadline satisfied. [19-30248] (SEP) [Entered: 04/23/2019 03:12 PM]
April 4, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9022244-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 04/19/2019 for Appellant Charles Edward Lincoln III [19-30248] (CBW) [Entered: 04/04/2019 02:38 PM]
March 29, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Charles Edward Lincoln, III [19-30248] (CBW) [Entered: 03/29/2019 03:08 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Yu-Wen Chiu, et al v. Charles Lincoln, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JOSEPH THOMAS CAPPADORA, C.P.A.
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Cappadora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHARLES EDWARD LINCOLN, III
Represented By: Charles Edward Lincoln III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KURT E. TRAUB
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Plunkett Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FOUNDATION FOR THE CHILD VICTIMS OF THE FAMILY COURTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHIH-YANG HU
Represented By: Matthew Paul Chenevert
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Plunkett Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: YU-WEN CHIU
Represented By: Matthew Paul Chenevert
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Plunkett Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?