Greenbrier Hospital, L.L.C. v. HHS
Defendant / Appellee: ALEX M. AZAR, II, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Plaintiff / Appellant: GREENBRIER HOSPITAL, L.L.C.
Case Number: 19-30331
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 9, 2020 Summary Greenbrier Hospital, LLC v. Azar

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Greenbrier Hospital, L.L.C.. Extension Granted to and including 07/08/2019. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 07/08/2019 for Appellant Greenbrier Hospital, L.L.C. [19-30331] (LEF) [Entered: 06/24/2019 03:11 PM]
June 24, 2019 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Greenbrier Hospital, L.L.C. for filing Appellant's Principal Brief until 07/08/2019 [19-30331] (Karl J. Koch ) [Entered: 06/24/2019 02:46 PM]
June 13, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Karl J. Koch for Appellant Greenbrier Hospital, L.L.C. in 19-30331 [19-30331] (LEF) [Entered: 06/13/2019 11:11 AM]
June 13, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Karl J. Koch for Greenbrier Hospital, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30331] (Karl J. Koch ) [Entered: 06/13/2019 05:48 AM]
May 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Daniel J. Aguilar for party(s) Appellee Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, in case 19-30331 [19-30331] (LEF) [Entered: 05/22/2019 10:10 AM]
May 21, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30331] (Daniel J. Aguilar ) [Entered: 05/21/2019 09:05 AM]
May 16, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/25/2019 for Appellant Greenbrier Hospital, L.L.C.. [19-30331] (CB) [Entered: 05/16/2019 01:13 PM]
May 16, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30331] (CB) [Entered: 05/16/2019 01:13 PM]
May 16, 2019 CASE CAPTION updated. Involvement terminated for Appellee HHS in 19-30331. Reason: incorrectly entered at case opening; Secretary of HHS is only party to the appeal. [19-30331] (RLL) [Entered: 05/16/2019 12:51 PM]
May 8, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:17-CV-6420. Electronic ROA due on 05/23/2019. [19-30331] (SEP) [Entered: 05/08/2019 08:09 AM]
May 8, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9047497-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-30331] (SEP) [Entered: 05/08/2019 08:06 AM]
April 29, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Greenbrier Hospital, L.L.C. [19-30331] (RLL) [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Greenbrier Hospital, L.L.C. v. HHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEX M. AZAR, II, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Peter M. Mansfield
Represented By: Daniel J. Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Peter M. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GREENBRIER HOSPITAL, L.L.C.
Represented By: Karl J. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?