Central Louisiana Home Health v. Alex Azar, II, Secretary
Defendant / Appellant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Plaintiff / Appellee: CENTRAL LOUISIANA HOME HEALTH CARE, L.L.C.
Case Number: 19-30450
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 filed by Appellant Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. [ # 9077036-2 ] [19-30450] (RLL) [Entered: 06/17/2019 02:12 PM]
June 17, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Karen Julian King for Appellant Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services in 19-30450. [19-30450] (RLL) [Entered: 06/17/2019 02:09 PM]
June 17, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 [9077036-2]. Date of service: 06/17/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Kiefer; Attorney for Appellant: King; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Kiefer [19-30450] (Karen Julian King ) [Entered: 06/17/2019 11:47 AM]
June 17, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Karen Julian King for Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30450] (Karen Julian King ) [Entered: 06/17/2019 10:08 AM]
June 12, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:17-CV-346. Electronic ROA due on 06/27/2019. [19-30450] (MCS) [Entered: 06/12/2019 12:24 PM]
June 12, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9074125-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-30450] (MCS) [Entered: 06/12/2019 12:20 PM]
June 5, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services [19-30450] (MCS) [Entered: 06/05/2019 08:09 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Central Louisiana Home Health v. Alex Azar, II, Secretary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Karen Julian King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CENTRAL LOUISIANA HOME HEALTH CARE, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shawn Harris Kiefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?