Supreme Home Health Services, et al v. Alex Azar, II, Secretary, et al
Defendant / Appellee: ALEX M. AZAR, II, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, PALMETTO GBA, L.L.C. and SEEMA VERMA, Administrator, on behalf of Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Plaintiff / Appellant: EMILY WINSTON and SUPREME HOME HEALTH SERVICES, INCORPORATED
Case Number: 19-30480
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 15, 2020 Supreme Home Health Services, et al v. Alex Azar,

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting, in part, unopposed motion to extend time to file appellants' brief filed by Appellants Supreme Home Health Services, Incorporated and Ms. Emily Winston. [ # 9114318-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 08/19/2019 for Appellants Supreme Home Health Services, Incorporated and Emily Winston. [19-30480] (SEP) [Entered: 08/06/2019 10:34 AM]
August 6, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney La Koshia Reconda Roberts for Appellant Emily Winston in 19-30480, Attorney La Koshia Reconda Roberts for Appellant Supreme Home Health Services, Incorporated in 19-30480 [19-30480] (LLL) [Entered: 08/06/2019 09:03 AM]
August 5, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION to extend time to file brief as appellant until 09/05/2019. [9114318-2] Date of service: 08/05/2019. [19-30480] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Supreme Home Health Services, Incorporated and Ms. Emily Winston for filing Appellants' Brief until 09/05/2019 [19-30480] (La Koshia Reconda Roberts ) [Entered: 08/05/2019 04:24 PM]
August 5, 2019 Attorney La Koshia Reconda Roberts added as counsel of record for Appellants Supreme Home Health Services, Incorporated and Emily Winston in 19-30480. [19-30480] (SEP) [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:13 PM]
August 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30480] (La Koshia Reconda Roberts ) [Entered: 08/05/2019 02:55 PM]
July 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Karen Julian King for Appellee Palmetto GBA, L.L.C. in 19-30480, Attorney Karen Julian King for Appellee Seema Verma in 19-30480, Attorney Karen Julian King for Appellee Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services in 19-30480 [19-30480] (AGL) [Entered: 07/09/2019 11:50 AM]
July 8, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30480] (Karen Julian King ) [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:30 AM]
June 26, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/05/2019 for Appellants Supreme Home Health Services, Incorporated and Emily Winston. [19-30480] (DDL) [Entered: 06/26/2019 02:55 PM]
June 26, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30480] (DDL) [Entered: 06/26/2019 02:54 PM]
June 19, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:18-CV-1370. Electronic ROA due on 07/05/2019. [19-30480] (SEP) [Entered: 06/19/2019 10:11 AM]
June 19, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9079049-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-30480] (SEP) [Entered: 06/19/2019 10:08 AM]
June 11, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Supreme Home Health Services, Incorporated and Ms. Emily Winston [19-30480] (CSG) [Entered: 06/11/2019 03:55 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Supreme Home Health Services, et al v. Alex Azar, II, Secretary, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEX M. AZAR, II, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Karen Julian King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PALMETTO GBA, L.L.C.
Represented By: Karen Julian King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SEEMA VERMA, Administrator, on behalf of Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Represented By: Karen Julian King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EMILY WINSTON
Represented By: Frederick Douglass Jones
Represented By: La Koshia Reconda Roberts Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUPREME HOME HEALTH SERVICES, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Frederick Douglass Jones
Represented By: La Koshia Reconda Roberts Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?