Aaron Francois v. Stephanie Lamartiniere, et al
Defendant / Appellee: LYNETTE JARVIS, STEPHANIE LAMARTINIERE, Assistant Warden for Health Services, JOHN MCCAIN, Dr., JOHN MORRISON, JANNIE JOHNSON, CARL SMITH, PAUL TOCE, REBECCA CHILDS, JAMES M. LEBLANC, SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND CORRECTIONS, JANE DOE, (2,4) and CURTIS GREEN
Plaintiff / Appellant: AARON FRANCOIS
Case Number: 19-30559
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. Aaron Francois. [19-30559] (RLL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:20 PM]
July 22, 2019 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 07/18/2019 denying dkt#208 - motion for reconsideration. [19-30559] (RLL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:19 PM]
July 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Kristian Blaine Dobard for Appellee John Morrison in 19-30559, Attorney Kristian Blaine Dobard for Appellee Carl Smith in 19-30559, Attorney Kristian Blaine Dobard for Appellee Paul Toce in 19-30559, Attorney Kristian Blaine Dobard for Appellee Curtis Green in 19-30559, Attorney Kristian Blaine Dobard for Appellee Rebecca Childs in 19-30559, Attorney Kristian Blaine Dobard for Appellee Lynette Jarvis in 19-30559 [19-30559] (LLL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 11:54 AM]
July 19, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30559] (Kristian Blaine Dobard ) [Entered: 07/19/2019 04:18 PM]
July 18, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process after monitoring for ruling on Motion for Reconsideration pending in District Court (document number 208). [9100675-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-30559] (DLJ) [Entered: 07/18/2019 12:15 PM]
July 12, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Aaron Francois. [19-30559] (DLJ) [Entered: 07/12/2019 01:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Aaron Francois v. Stephanie Lamartiniere, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LYNETTE JARVIS
Represented By: Kristian Blaine Dobard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHANIE LAMARTINIERE, Assistant Warden for Health Services
Represented By: LeeAnne Jenise Sharlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN MCCAIN, Dr.
Represented By: Kristian Blaine Dobard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN MORRISON
Represented By: Kristian Blaine Dobard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANNIE JOHNSON
Represented By: Kristian Blaine Dobard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARL SMITH
Represented By: Kristian Blaine Dobard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL TOCE
Represented By: Kristian Blaine Dobard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REBECCA CHILDS
Represented By: Kristian Blaine Dobard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES M. LEBLANC, SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND CORRECTIONS
Represented By: LeeAnne Jenise Sharlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANE DOE, (2,4)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CURTIS GREEN
Represented By: Kristian Blaine Dobard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AARON FRANCOIS
Represented By: Aaron Francois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?