Courtney Williams v. Darrel Vannoy, Warden
Respondent / Appellee: DARREL VANNOY, WARDEN, LOUISIANA STATE PENITENTIARY
Petitioner / Appellant: COURTNEY WILLIAMS
Case Number: 19-30682
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. Courtney Williams. Fee deadline satisfied. [19-30682] (motions for IFP and COA pending in DC) (MCS) [Entered: 09/24/2019 09:45 AM]
September 20, 2019 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 09/20/2019 the order advised Courtney Williams that he has 21 days from 9/20/19 to pay the $505.00 filing fee or file a properly completed motion to proceed IFP. Fee or motion for IFP deadline updated to 10/11/2019 for Appellant Courtney Williams. [19-30682] (MCS) [Entered: 09/20/2019 11:50 AM]
September 18, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting Implied Motion to extend time to pay filing fee filed by Appellant Mr. Courtney Williams [ # 9147781-2 ] Fee deadline updated to 10/01/2019 for Appellant Courtney Williams [19-30682] (MRW) [Entered: 09/18/2019 02:37 PM]
September 18, 2019 Implied MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Courtney Williams to extend time to pay filing fee [9147781-2]. [19-30682] (MRW) [Entered: 09/18/2019 02:36 PM]
August 30, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9134163-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 09/16/2019 for Appellant Courtney Williams [19-30682] (CB) [Entered: 08/30/2019 01:31 PM]
August 22, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Courtney Williams [19-30682] (WMJ) [Entered: 08/22/2019 04:09 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Courtney Williams v. Darrel Vannoy, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: DARREL VANNOY, WARDEN, LOUISIANA STATE PENITENTIARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: COURTNEY WILLIAMS
Represented By: Courtney Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?