Darryl Puderer v. Burl Cain, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: DARRYL PUDERER
Defendant / Appellee: TRISH FOSTER, Legal Programs Director, Employed at Louisiana State Penitentiary, Individually and in their official capacities, BURL N. CAIN, Warden, Individually and in their official capacities, TIMOTHY DELANEY, Assistant Warden, Individually and in their official capacities and JAMES LEBLANC, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Individually and in their official capacities
Case Number: 19-30809
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 4, 2020 Darryl Puderer v. Burl Cain, et al

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30809] (DDL) [Entered: 11/13/2019 01:53 PM]
November 7, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:19-CV-156. Electronic ROA due on 11/22/2019. [19-30809] (AGL) [Entered: 11/07/2019 01:31 PM]
November 7, 2019 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 11/06/2019 denying IFP for Appellant Mr. Darryl Puderer because appeal is not taken in good faith - fee assessed - BAUGH case. Fee due on 12/06/2019 for Appellant Darryl Puderer [19-30809] (AGL) [Entered: 11/07/2019 01:28 PM]
October 24, 2019 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. Darryl Puderer. [19-30809] (AGL) [Entered: 10/24/2019 02:14 PM]
October 3, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9159864-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. [19-30809] (MCS) [Entered: 10/03/2019 03:09 PM]
October 3, 2019 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. Darryl Puderer. [19-30809] (MCS) [Entered: 10/03/2019 03:05 PM]
September 30, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Darryl Puderer [19-30809] (MCS) [Entered: 09/30/2019 03:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Darryl Puderer v. Burl Cain, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DARRYL PUDERER
Represented By: Darryl Puderer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRISH FOSTER, Legal Programs Director, Employed at Louisiana State Penitentiary, Individually and in their official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BURL N. CAIN, Warden, Individually and in their official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY DELANEY, Assistant Warden, Individually and in their official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES LEBLANC, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Individually and in their official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?