Brandon LaVergne v. Keith Stutes, et al
Defendant / Appellee: MICHAEL HARSON, Former District Attorney Louisiana 15th Judicial District Court, N. BURL CAIN, Former Louisiana State Prison Warden, HERMAN CLAUSE, Former District Court Judge Louisiana 15th Judicial District Court, KEITH STUTES, District Attorney Louisiana 15th Judicial District Court, DANIEL M. LANDRY, III, Assistant District Attorney, BURLIEGH DOGA, Assistant District Attorney Louisiana 15th Judicial District Court, ALAN HANEY, Assistant District Attorney, DARREL VANNOY, WARDEN, LOUISIANA STATE PENITENTIARY, PAUL SMITH, J. CLAY LEJUENE, KEVIN BENJAMIN, Former Warden of Security, JAMES M. LEBLANC, SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND CORRECTIONS, DOUG WELBORN, Clerk of Court Louisiana 19th Judicial District Court, ROGER HAMILTON, Assistant District Attorney and TAYLOR CURTIER
Plaintiff / Appellant: BRANDON S. LAVERGNE
Case Number: 19-30842
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Thomas McHenry Long for party(s) Appellee Daniel M. Landry III, Appellee Roger Hamilton, Appellee Alan Haney, in case 19-30842. [19-30842] (SEP) [Entered: 12/06/2019 03:41 PM]
December 6, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellee's brief filed by Appellee Mr. Herman Clause. [ # 9204166-2 ] Appellee's Brief due on 01/09/2020 for Appellee Herman Clause. [19-30842] (SEP) [Entered: 12/06/2019 01:39 PM]
December 6, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Thomas McHenry Long for Mr. Burliegh Doga, Mr. Michael Harson and Mr. Keith Stutes for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30842] (Thomas McHenry Long ) [Entered: 12/06/2019 10:19 AM]
December 6, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Mr. Burliegh Doga, Mr. Michael Harson and Mr. Keith Stutes to extend the time to file a response to the Appellant Brief [ # 9187132-2 ] filed by Appellant Mr. Brandon S. LaVergne until 01/09/2020 [9204409-2]. Date of service: 12/06/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Coffey, DeCuir, Evans, Gibson, Lejuene, Long, Sanders; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: DeCuir, Lejuene; Appellant LaVergne [19-30842] (Thomas McHenry Long ) [Entered: 12/06/2019 08:58 AM]
December 5, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file brief of appellee until 01/09/2020. [9204166-2] Date of service: 12/05/2019. [19-30842] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: MOTION filed by Appellee Mr. Herman Clause to extend time to file brief of appellee until 01/09/2020 [9204166-2]. Date of service: 12/05/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Coffey, DeCuir, Evans, Gibson, Lejuene, Long, Sanders; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Coffey; Appellant LaVergne [19-30842] (William David Coffey ) [Entered: 12/05/2019 03:44 PM]
November 8, 2019 LETTER filed by Appellant Mr. Brandon S. LaVergne advising to file the premature Appellant Brief filed by Appellant Mr. Brandon S. LaVergne in 19-30842 [ # 9187132-2 ]. [19-30842] (MRW) [Entered: 11/11/2019 12:30 PM]
November 8, 2019 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Brandon S. LaVergne. # of Copies Provided: 2 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 12/09/2019 for Appellees N. Burl Cain, Herman Clause, Burliegh Doga, Michael Harson, James M. LeBlanc, Secretary, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, J. Clay Lejuene, Keith Stutes and Doug Welborn [19-30842] (MRW) [Entered: 11/11/2019 12:29 PM]
October 30, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30842] (DDL) [Entered: 10/30/2019 08:47 AM]
October 29, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney James Garrison Evans for Appellee James M. LeBlanc, Secretary, Department of Public Safety and Corrections in 19-30842, Attorney James Garrison Evans for Appellee N. Burl Cain in 19-30842 [19-30842] (MCS) [Entered: 10/29/2019 01:59 PM]
October 28, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30842] (James Garrison Evans ) [Entered: 10/28/2019 03:43 PM]
October 28, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) William David Coffey for party(s) Appellee Herman Clause, in case 19-30842 [19-30842] (MCS) [Entered: 10/28/2019 02:18 PM]
October 28, 2019 Attorney Mr. James Garrison Evans for Appellees Mr. James M. LeBlanc, Secretary, Department of Public Safety and Corrections and Mr. N. Burl Cain is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: Counsel failed to complete the lower portion of the form. [19-30842] (LBM) [Entered: 10/28/2019 12:04 PM]
October 28, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30842] (William David Coffey ) [Entered: 10/28/2019 11:29 AM]
October 25, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. James Garrison Evans for Mr. N. Burl Cain and Mr. James M. LeBlanc, Secretary, Department of Public Safety and Corrections for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30842] (James Garrison Evans ) [Entered: 10/25/2019 04:27 PM]
October 25, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief due on 12/04/2019 for Appellant Brandon S. LaVergne. [19-30842] (MCS) [Entered: 10/25/2019 02:19 PM]
October 25, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:17-CV-1696 and 3:18-CV-693. Electronic ROA due on 11/12/2019. [19-30842] (MCS) [Entered: 10/25/2019 02:17 PM]
October 25, 2019 FEE PAID by Appellant Mr. Brandon S. LaVergne. Fee deadline satisfied [19-30842] (MCS) [Entered: 10/25/2019 02:14 PM]
October 17, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Appellant's brief received from Appellant Mr. Brandon S. LaVergne because the brief is premature. The briefing notice has not issued. [19-30842] (MCS) [Entered: 10/25/2019 02:05 PM]
October 16, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9168452-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 10/31/2019 for Appellant Brandon S. LaVergne [19-30842] (CB) [Entered: 10/16/2019 01:57 PM]
October 9, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Brandon S. LaVergne [19-30842] (LEF) [Entered: 10/09/2019 02:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Brandon LaVergne v. Keith Stutes, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL HARSON, Former District Attorney Louisiana 15th Judicial District Court
Represented By: Paul Daniel Gibson
Represented By: Thomas McHenry Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: N. BURL CAIN, Former Louisiana State Prison Warden
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HERMAN CLAUSE, Former District Court Judge Louisiana 15th Judicial District Court
Represented By: David Glen Sanders
Represented By: William David Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEITH STUTES, District Attorney Louisiana 15th Judicial District Court
Represented By: Paul Daniel Gibson
Represented By: Thomas McHenry Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL M. LANDRY, III, Assistant District Attorney
Represented By: Thomas McHenry Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BURLIEGH DOGA, Assistant District Attorney Louisiana 15th Judicial District Court
Represented By: Paul Daniel Gibson
Represented By: Thomas McHenry Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALAN HANEY, Assistant District Attorney
Represented By: Thomas McHenry Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DARREL VANNOY, WARDEN, LOUISIANA STATE PENITENTIARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. CLAY LEJUENE
Represented By: J. Clay Lejuene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN BENJAMIN, Former Warden of Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES M. LEBLANC, SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND CORRECTIONS
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOUG WELBORN, Clerk of Court Louisiana 19th Judicial District Court
Represented By: Brandon James DeCuir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROGER HAMILTON, Assistant District Attorney
Represented By: Thomas McHenry Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TAYLOR CURTIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRANDON S. LAVERGNE
Represented By: Brandon S. LaVergne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?