Nelson Romero v. Lorie Davis, Director
Petitioner / Appellant: NELSON ROMERO
Respondent / Appellee: LORIE DAVIS, DIRECTOR, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE, CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTIONS DIVISION
Case Number: 19-40729
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 COURT ORDER denying Motion for reconsideration of the court's order dismissing the appeal filed by Appellant Mr. Nelson Romero [ # 9162454-2 ] [19-40729] (ABT) [Entered: 10/14/2019 08:40 AM]
October 4, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Nelson Romero for reconsideration of the 09/17/2019 court order dismissing appeal for lack of jurisdictional [9144484-2] [9162454-2]. [19-40729] (MRW) [Entered: 10/08/2019 09:55 AM]
September 30, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appellant's brief received from Appellant Mr. Nelson Romero because this case is closed [19-40729] (CAG) [Entered: 09/30/2019 12:54 PM]
September 17, 2019 COURT ORDER granting jurisdictional review to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction (IN DETAIL) [9144484-2]. [19-40729] (ABT) [Entered: 09/17/2019 04:50 PM]
September 13, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-40729] (CAG) [Entered: 09/13/2019 02:24 PM]
September 13, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Elizabeth Alisse Goettert for Appellee Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in 19-40729 [19-40729] (CAG) [Entered: 09/13/2019 02:15 PM]
September 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Elizabeth Alisse Goettert for Ms. Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-40729] (Elizabeth Alisse Goettert ) [Entered: 09/12/2019 02:22 PM]
August 30, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Certificate of Appealability received from Appellant Mr. Nelson Romero jurisdictional review [19-40729] (MRW) [Entered: 09/11/2019 02:55 PM]
August 22, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Nelson Romero [19-40729] (WMJ) [Entered: 08/22/2019 08:42 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson Romero v. Lorie Davis, Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: NELSON ROMERO
Represented By: Nelson Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: LORIE DAVIS, DIRECTOR, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE, CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTIONS DIVISION
Represented By: Elizabeth Alisse Goettert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?