Miguel Benitez-Garay v. Dept. of Homeland Security, et al
Respondent / Appellee: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, THOMAS D. HOMAN, Acting Director of United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, HOMELAND SECURITY INVESTIGATIONS, MARK S. INCH, Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, JACOB CASTRO, Warden of South Texas Detention Complex, SHANE M. FOLDEN, Special Agent in Charge of the San Antonio Homeland Security Investigations Field Office, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, DANIEL BIBLE, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement San Antonio, Texas, Field Office Director, JOSEPH SOTO, Homeland Security Investigations Agent, ANDREW HURON, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement San Antonio Field Office, Assistant Field Office Director and KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, ACTING SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Petitioner / Appellant: MIGUEL ANGEL BENITEZ-GARAY
Case Number: 19-50242
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/18/2019 for Appellant Miguel Angel Benitez-Garay. [19-50242] (PAC) [Entered: 05/09/2019 12:21 PM]
May 9, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. State Court Papers included? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-50242] (PAC) [Entered: 05/09/2019 12:20 PM]
April 16, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 5:18-CV-422. Electronic ROA due on 05/01/2019. [19-50242] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:54 PM]
April 16, 2019 CLERK ORDER denying Motion to consolidate cases filed by Appellant Mr. Miguel Angel Benitez-Garay [ # 9013887-2 ] [19-50242] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:34 PM]
April 15, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Miguel Angel Benitez-Garay to proceed in forma pauperis [9029974-2] Fee deadline canceled. Date of service: 04/15/2019 [19-50242] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Miguel Angel Benitez-Garay to proceed in forma pauperis [9029974-2]. Date of service: 04/15/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Govindaiah; Attorney for Appellee: Schottenstein [19-50242] (Manoj Govindaiah ) [Entered: 04/15/2019 05:38 PM]
April 12, 2019 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: Advising parties of updated case caption [19-50242] (PAC) [Entered: 04/12/2019 03:30 PM]
April 1, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9017860-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 04/16/2019 for Appellant Miguel Angel Benitez-Garay [19-50242] (CBW) [Entered: 04/01/2019 08:07 AM]
March 26, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Noah Mariano Schottenstein for Appellee Joseph Soto in 19-50242, Attorney Noah Mariano Schottenstein for Appellee Shane M. Folden in 19-50242, Attorney Noah Mariano Schottenstein for Appellee Homeland Security Investigations in 19-50242, Attorney Noah Mariano Schottenstein for Appellee Jacob Castro in 19-50242, Attorney Noah Mariano Schottenstein for Appellee Andrew Huron in 19-50242, Attorney Noah Mariano Schottenstein for Appellee Daniel Bible in 19-50242, Attorney Noah Mariano Schottenstein for Appellee Thomas D. Homan in 19-50242, Attorney Noah Mariano Schottenstein for Appellee Mark S. Inch in 19-50242, Attorney Noah Mariano Schottenstein for Appellee Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security in 19-50242, Attorney Noah Mariano Schottenstein for Appellee William P. Barr, U. S. Attorney General in 19-50242, Attorney Noah Mariano Schottenstein for Appellee Federal Bureau of Prisons in 19-50242, Attorney Noah Mariano Schottenstein for Appellee ICE in 19-50242, Attorney Noah Mariano Schottenstein for Appellee Department of Homeland Security in 19-50242 [19-50242] (RAJ) [Entered: 03/26/2019 10:29 AM]
March 26, 2019 OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Miguel Angel Benitez-Garay to consolidate cases No. 18-60859 and No. 19-50242 for briefing and oral argument purposes. Date of service: 03/26/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Govindaiah; Attorney for Appellee: Schottenstein [19-50242] (Manoj Govindaiah ) [Entered: 03/26/2019 10:28 AM]
March 25, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50242] (Noah Mariano Schottenstein ) [Entered: 03/25/2019 10:13 AM]
March 25, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Manoj Govindaiah for Appellant Miguel Angel Benitez-Garay in 19-50242 [19-50242] (PAC) [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:29 AM]
March 24, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [19-50242] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Miguel Angel Benitez-Garay advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 03/24/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Govindaiah; Attorney for Appellee: Schottenstein [19-50242] (Manoj Govindaiah ) [Entered: 03/24/2019 04:44 PM]
March 24, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Manoj Govindaiah for Mr. Miguel Angel Benitez-Garay for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50242] (Manoj Govindaiah ) [Entered: 03/24/2019 04:44 PM]
March 22, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITH COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Miguel Angel Benitez-Garay [19-50242] (CBW) [Entered: 03/22/2019 02:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Miguel Benitez-Garay v. Dept. of Homeland Security, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Represented By: Noah Mariano Schottenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Noah Mariano Schottenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Noah Mariano Schottenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: THOMAS D. HOMAN, Acting Director of United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Noah Mariano Schottenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: HOMELAND SECURITY INVESTIGATIONS
Represented By: Noah Mariano Schottenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: MARK S. INCH, Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Noah Mariano Schottenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Noah Mariano Schottenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JACOB CASTRO, Warden of South Texas Detention Complex
Represented By: Noah Mariano Schottenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: SHANE M. FOLDEN, Special Agent in Charge of the San Antonio Homeland Security Investigations Field Office
Represented By: Noah Mariano Schottenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Noah Mariano Schottenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: DANIEL BIBLE, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement San Antonio, Texas, Field Office Director
Represented By: Noah Mariano Schottenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JOSEPH SOTO, Homeland Security Investigations Agent
Represented By: Noah Mariano Schottenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ANDREW HURON, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement San Antonio Field Office, Assistant Field Office Director
Represented By: Noah Mariano Schottenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, ACTING SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Noah Mariano Schottenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: MIGUEL ANGEL BENITEZ-GARAY
Represented By: Manoj Govindaiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?