Bahia Amawi v. Pflugerville Indep Sch Dist, et al
Defendant / Appellant: TRUSTEES OF THE KLEIN INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, KEN PAXTON, in his official capacity as Attorney General of Texas, TRUSTEES OF THE LEWISVILLE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM and BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
Plaintiff / Appellee: JOHN PLUECKER, BAHIA AMAWI, ZACHARY ABDELHADI, GEORGE HALE and OBINNA DENNAR
Case Number: 19-50384
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System and Mr. Ken Paxton. Extension Granted to and including 08/01/2019. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 08/01/2019 for Appellants Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System and Ken Paxton [19-50384] (MFY) [Entered: 06/18/2019 11:28 AM]
June 18, 2019 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Trustees of the Klein Independent School District and Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District. Extension Granted to and including 08/01/2019. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 08/01/2019 for Appellants Trustees of the Klein Independent School District and Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District [19-50384] (MFY) [Entered: 06/18/2019 11:26 AM]
June 17, 2019 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System and Mr. Ken Paxton for filing Opening Brief until 08/01/2019 [19-50384] (Kyle Douglas Hawkins ) [Entered: 06/17/2019 10:36 PM]
June 17, 2019 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Trustees of the Klein Independent School District and Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District for filing Appellants Briefs until 08/01/2019 [19-50384] (Thomas Phillip Brandt ) [Entered: 06/17/2019 04:19 PM]
May 28, 2019 COURT ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Appellants motion to stay injunction pending appeal is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Appellants motion for a temporary administrative stay of injunction pending a ruling on the motion to stay injunction pending appeal is DENIED AS MOOT. [ # 9050540-2 ]; [ # 9050540-3 ] [19-50384] (MFY) [Entered: 05/28/2019 01:41 PM]
May 24, 2019 COURT ORDER denying the alternative motion seeking an extension of "10 days after service of the motion," or until May 28, 2019, to respond to appellants' opposed motion for stay [ # 9057178-3 ]; granting the alternative motion seeking to adopt the response of the Plueker Plaintiffs in the event the Court deems appellants' motion to be timely served as of May 10, 2019 filed by Appellee Ms. Bahia Amawi [ # 9057178-4 ] [19-50384] (PAC) [Entered: 05/24/2019 08:49 AM]
May 23, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/02/2019 for Appellants Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System, Ken Paxton, Trustees of the Klein Independent School District and Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District. [19-50384] (MBC) [Entered: 05/23/2019 11:46 AM]
May 23, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-50384] (MBC) [Entered: 05/23/2019 11:31 AM]
May 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Andre Segura for party(s) Appellee Obinna Dennar Appellee George Hale Appellee John Pluecker Appellee Zachary Abdelhadi, in case 19-50384 [19-50384] (MRW) [Entered: 05/22/2019 08:48 AM]
May 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Edgar Saldivar for party(s) Appellee Obinna Dennar Appellee George Hale Appellee John Pluecker Appellee Zachary Abdelhadi, in case 19-50384 [19-50384] (MRW) [Entered: 05/22/2019 08:45 AM]
May 21, 2019 REPLY filed by Appellants Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System and Mr. Ken Paxton [9058108-1] to the Response/Opposition filed by Appellee Ms. Bahia Amawi [ # 9057178-2 ], to the Motion filed by Appellee Ms. Bahia Amawi [ # 9057178-3 ], to the Motion filed by Appellee Ms. Bahia Amawi [ # 9057178-4 ], to the Response/Opposition filed by Appellees Mr. Zachary Abdelhadi, Mr. Obinna Dennar, Mr. George Hale and Mr. John Pluecker [ # 9057169-2 ], to the Motion filed by Appellants Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System and Mr. Ken Paxton [ # 9050540-2 ], to the Motion filed by Appellants Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System and Mr. Ken Paxton [ # 9050540-3 ]. Date of Service: 05/21/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Abrams, Brandt, Hawkins, O'Leary, Valenzuela; Attorney for Appellees: Floyd, Hauss, Homer, Pinon; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Masri. [19-50384] (Kyle Douglas Hawkins ) [Entered: 05/21/2019 03:47 PM]
May 20, 2019 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [9057178-1] to the Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellants Mr. Ken Paxton, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System and Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System in 19-50384 [ # 9050540-2 ], Motion for extraordinary relief filed by Appellants Mr. Ken Paxton, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System and Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System in 19-50384] [ # 9050540-3 ]Response/Opposition deadline satisfied.. Response/Opposition to Incorporated Motion due on 05/30/2019 and INCORPORATED MOTION to extend the time to file a response to the Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 9050540-2 ] filed by Appellants Mr. Ken Paxton, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System and Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System in 19-50384 , Motion for extraordinary relief [ # 9050540-3 ] filed by Appellants Mr. Ken Paxton, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System and Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System in 19-50384 until 05/28/2019 [9057178-3], Appellee adopts responsive position of the Pluecker Plaintiffs' opposition to motion for stay [9057178-4] [19-50384] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Ms. Bahia Amawi [9057178-1] to the Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellants Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System and Mr. Ken Paxton [ # 9050540-2 ], Motion for extraordinary relief filed by Appellants Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System and Mr. Ken Paxton [ # 9050540-3 ] Date of Service: 05/20/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Abrams, Brandt, Hawkins, O'Leary, Valenzuela; Attorney for Appellees: Floyd, Hauss, Homer, Masri, Pinon. [19-50384] (Carolyn M. Homer ) [Entered: 05/20/2019 09:25 PM]
May 20, 2019 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [9057169-1] to the Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellants Mr. Ken Paxton, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System and Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System in 19-50384 [ # 9050540-2 ], Motion for extraordinary relief filed by Appellants Mr. Ken Paxton, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System and Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System in 19-50384 [ # 9050540-3 ]Response/Opposition deadline satisfied.Response/Opposition deadline satisfied. [19-50384] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Zachary Abdelhadi, Mr. Obinna Dennar, Mr. George Hale and Mr. John Pluecker [9057169-1] to the Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellants Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System and Mr. Ken Paxton [ # 9050540-2 ], Motion for extraordinary relief filed by Appellants Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System and Mr. Ken Paxton [ # 9050540-3 ] Date of Service: 05/20/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Abrams, Brandt, Hawkins, O'Leary, Valenzuela; Attorney for Appellees: Floyd, Hauss, Homer, Pinon; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Masri. [19-50384] (Adriana Cecilia Pinon ) [Entered: 05/20/2019 07:54 PM]
May 20, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50384] (Edgar Saldivar ) [Entered: 05/20/2019 03:36 PM]
May 20, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-50384] (Andre Segura ) [Entered: 05/20/2019 12:24 PM]
May 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Carolyn M. Homer for party(s) Appellee Bahia Amawi, in case 19-50384 [19-50384] (MFY) [Entered: 05/15/2019 02:44 PM]
May 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Michael Abrams for Appellant Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System in 19-50384, Attorney Michael Abrams for Appellant Board of Regents of the University of Houston System in 19-50384, Attorney Michael Abrams for Appellant Ken Paxton in 19-50384 [19-50384] (PAC) [Entered: 05/15/2019 10:10 AM]
May 13, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. [19-50384] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System and Mr. Ken Paxton advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 05/13/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Abrams, Brandt, Hawkins, O'Leary, Valenzuela; Attorney for Appellees: Floyd, Hauss, Pinon; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Masri [19-50384] (Michael Abrams ) [Entered: 05/13/2019 02:37 PM]
May 13, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Michael Abrams for Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System and Mr. Ken Paxton for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-50384] (Michael Abrams ) [Entered: 05/13/2019 02:13 PM]
May 10, 2019 OPPOSED MOTION for a temporary administrative stay of Injunction pending a ruling on the motion to stay the injunction pending appeal [9050540-3]. Date of service: 05/10/2019 Response/Opposition due on 05/20/2019. [19-50384] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System and Mr. Ken Paxton for stay of the injunction pending appeal [9050540-2]. Date of service: 05/10/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Abrams, Brandt, Hawkins, O'Leary, Valenzuela; Attorney for Appellees: Floyd, Hauss, Masri, Pinon [19-50384] (Kyle Douglas Hawkins ) [Entered: 05/10/2019 05:17 PM]
May 10, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kyle Douglas Hawkins for party(s) Appellant Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System Appellant Ken Paxton Appellant Board of Regents of the University of Houston System, in case 19-50384 [19-50384] (MFY) [Entered: 05/10/2019 11:39 AM]
May 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Laura Dahl O'Leary for party(s) Appellant Trustees of the Klein Independent School District Appellant Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District, in case 19-50384 [19-50384] (NFD) [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:28 PM]
May 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Francisco J. Valenzuela for party(s) Appellant Trustees of the Klein Independent School District Appellant Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District, in case 19-50384 [19-50384] (NFD) [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:27 PM]
May 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Thomas Phillip Brandt for Appellant Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District in 19-50384, Attorney Thomas Phillip Brandt for Appellant Trustees of the Klein Independent School District in 19-50384 [19-50384] (NFD) [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:26 PM]
May 9, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:18-CV-1091 and consolidated case 1:18-CV-1100. Electronic ROA due on 05/24/2019. [19-50384] (CMB) [Entered: 05/09/2019 10:59 AM]
May 9, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process (as to additional appeal filed 05/03/2019). [9048867-2] [19-50384] (CMB) [Entered: 05/09/2019 10:48 AM]
May 9, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9048852-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-50384] (CMB) [Entered: 05/09/2019 10:38 AM]
May 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50384] (Kyle Douglas Hawkins ) [Entered: 05/09/2019 08:10 AM]
May 8, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-50384] (Laura Dahl O'Leary ) [Entered: 05/08/2019 01:24 PM]
May 8, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-50384] (Francisco J. Valenzuela ) [Entered: 05/08/2019 01:22 PM]
May 8, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Thomas Phillip Brandt for Trustees of the Klein Independent School District and Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50384] (Thomas Phillip Brandt ) [Entered: 05/08/2019 01:19 PM]
May 3, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-50384] (Carolyn M. Homer ) [Entered: 05/03/2019 02:35 PM]
May 3, 2019 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9044310-2] Parties added: Appellants Trustees of the Klein Independent School District and Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District. NOA filed by Appellants Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District and Trustees of the Klein Independent School District. [9044310-1] [19-50384] (RSM) [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:02 AM]
May 2, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System and Mr. Ken Paxton [19-50384] (RAJ) [Entered: 05/02/2019 12:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bahia Amawi v. Pflugerville Indep Sch Dist, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TRUSTEES OF THE KLEIN INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Thomas Phillip Brandt
Represented By: Laura Dahl O'Leary
Represented By: Francisco J. Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KEN PAXTON, in his official capacity as Attorney General of Texas
Represented By: Michael Abrams
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TRUSTEES OF THE LEWISVILLE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Thomas Phillip Brandt
Represented By: Laura Dahl O'Leary
Represented By: Francisco J. Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM
Represented By: Michael Abrams
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
Represented By: Michael Abrams
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN PLUECKER
Represented By: Adriana Cecilia Pinon
Represented By: Brian Hauss
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Andre Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BAHIA AMAWI
Represented By: John Thomas Floyd III
Represented By: Lena F. Masri
Represented By: Carolyn M. Homer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ZACHARY ABDELHADI
Represented By: Adriana Cecilia Pinon
Represented By: Brian Hauss
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Andre Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GEORGE HALE
Represented By: Adriana Cecilia Pinon
Represented By: Brian Hauss
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Andre Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: OBINNA DENNAR
Represented By: Adriana Cecilia Pinon
Represented By: Brian Hauss
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Andre Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?