Travis Phillips v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: TRAVIS R. PHILLIPS
Defendant / Appellee: GROVER J. GEISELMAN, III, JOHN G. HOFFMAN, H. DALTON WALLACE, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. and FIRST NATIONAL BANK
Case Number: 19-50797
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Mr. Travis R. Phillips [ # 9165880-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 11/18/2019 for Appellant Travis R. Phillips [19-50797] (PAC) [Entered: 10/11/2019 01:56 PM]
October 11, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Travis R. Phillips to extend time to file brief as appellant until 11/18/2019 [9165880-2]. Date of service: 10/11/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Lewis, Schout, Sudbury; Attorney for Appellant: Slade [19-50797] (George Blaine Slade ) [Entered: 10/11/2019 10:49 AM]
October 10, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney George Blaine Slade for Appellant Travis R. Phillips in 19-50797 [19-50797] (RAJ) [Entered: 10/10/2019 08:37 AM]
October 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. George Blaine Slade for Mr. Travis R. Phillips for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50797] (George Blaine Slade ) [Entered: 10/09/2019 11:54 AM]
September 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) William Lance Lewis for party(s) Appellee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 19-50797 [19-50797] (WMJ) [Entered: 09/05/2019 04:03 PM]
September 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Marcie Lynn Schout for party(s) Appellee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 19-50797 [19-50797] (WMJ) [Entered: 09/05/2019 04:02 PM]
September 4, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/15/2019 for Appellant Travis R. Phillips. [19-50797] (DDL) [Entered: 09/04/2019 09:51 AM]
September 4, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-50797] (DDL) [Entered: 09/04/2019 09:50 AM]
September 3, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-50797] (William Lance Lewis ) [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:56 PM]
September 3, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50797] (Marcie Lynn Schout ) [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:53 PM]
September 3, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:18-CV-501. Electronic ROA due on 09/18/2019. [19-50797] (CCR) [Entered: 09/03/2019 11:14 AM]
September 3, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9135104-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-50797] (CCR) [Entered: 09/03/2019 11:02 AM]
August 26, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Travis R. Phillips [19-50797] (CCR) [Entered: 08/26/2019 10:06 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Travis Phillips v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TRAVIS R. PHILLIPS
Represented By: George Blaine Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GROVER J. GEISELMAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN G. HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: H. DALTON WALLACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Gregory Marshall Sudbury Esq.
Represented By: Marcie Lynn Schout Esq.
Represented By: William Lance Lewis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIRST NATIONAL BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?