USA v. Roman Gonzales
Defendant / Appellant: ROMAN GABRIEL GONZALES, also known as Roman, also known as Gabe Roman, also known as Roman Gonzales, also known as Roman G. Gonzales
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-50820
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 31, 2020 USA v. Roman Gonzales

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 CJA APPOINTMENT for Attorney Mr. James Scott Sullivan, Esq. for Mr. Roman Gabriel Gonzales. Counsel must use the eVoucher system to file the voucher at disposition of the case. Please see the attached document for further guidance. ORIGINATING COURT DISTRICT: WTX ORIGINATING CASE NUMBER: 5:17-CR-391-18 DEFENDANT NUMBER: 18 DATE OF APPOINTMENT: 09/05/2019 [19-50820] (CBW) [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:23 AM]
September 9, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9139739-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 09/24/2019 for Appellant Roman Gabriel Gonzales [19-50820] (CBW) [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:19 AM]
September 6, 2019 DIRECT CRIMINAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Roman Gabriel Gonzales [19-50820] (CBW) [Entered: 09/06/2019 10:34 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. Roman Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ROMAN GABRIEL GONZALES, also known as Roman, also known as Gabe Roman, also known as Roman Gonzales, also known as Roman G. Gonzales
Represented By: James Scott Sullivan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Joseph H. Gay Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?