James Myart, Jr. v. Steven Mach, et al
Defendant / Appellee: WILLIAM P. MCMANUS, Chief of San Antonio Police Department, ERIK WALSH, JACOB LAVENDER, Trooper, Department of Public Safety, RHONDA FLEMING, CITY OF SAN ANTONIO, STEVEN P. MACH, DPS, Chairman, PHILIP AYALA, STEVEN C. MCCRAW, Director, Texas Department of Public Safety, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, KENT COLEMAN, Trooper, Texas Department of Public Safety, STATE OF TEXAS, RON NIRENBERG, Mayor, City of San Antonio and ROBERT DRIGGERS, Trooper, Texas Department of Public Safety
Plaintiff / Appellant: JAMES W. MYART, JR.
Case Number: 19-51181
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. James W. Myart, Jr.. [19-51181] (CB) [Entered: 02/11/2020 10:37 AM]
January 23, 2020 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. James W. Myart, Jr.. [19-51181] (CB) [Entered: 01/23/2020 09:12 AM]
January 16, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Nathan Mark Ralls for Appellee Erik Walsh in 19-51181, Attorney Nathan Mark Ralls for Appellee William P. McManus in 19-51181, Attorney Nathan Mark Ralls for Appellee Ron Nirenberg in 19-51181, Attorney Nathan Mark Ralls for Appellee City of San Antonio in 19-51181 [19-51181] (RAJ) [Entered: 01/16/2020 01:29 PM]
January 16, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Nathan Mark Ralls for City of San Antonio, Mr. William P. McManus, Mr. Ron Nirenberg and Mr. Erik Walsh for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-51181] (Nathan Mark Ralls ) [Entered: 01/16/2020 11:06 AM]
January 3, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Kelsey Warren for Appellee State of Texas in 19-51181, Attorney Kelsey Warren for Appellee Texas Department of Public Safety in 19-51181, Attorney Kelsey Warren for Appellee Philip Ayala in 19-51181, Attorney Kelsey Warren for Appellee Robert Driggers in 19-51181, Attorney Kelsey Warren for Appellee Kent Coleman in 19-51181, Attorney Kelsey Warren for Appellee Jacob Lavender in 19-51181, Attorney Kelsey Warren for Appellee Rhonda Fleming in 19-51181, Attorney Kelsey Warren for Appellee Steven C. McCraw in 19-51181, Attorney Kelsey Warren for Appellee Steven P. Mach in 19-51181 [19-51181] (RAJ) [Entered: 01/03/2020 03:35 PM]
January 3, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Kelsey Warren for Mr. Philip Ayala, Mr. Kent Coleman, Mr. Robert Driggers, Ms. Rhonda Fleming, Mr. Jacob Lavender, Mr. Steven P. Mach, Mr. Steven C. McCraw, State of Texas and Texas Department of Public Safety for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-51181] (Kelsey Warren ) [Entered: 01/03/2020 11:08 AM]
January 3, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9221554-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. (IFPPDC)[19-51181] (RAJ) [Entered: 01/03/2020 09:29 AM]
December 23, 2019 CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. James W. Myart, Jr. [19-51181] (RLL) [Entered: 12/23/2019 05:05 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: James Myart, Jr. v. Steven Mach, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. MCMANUS, Chief of San Antonio Police Department
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIK WALSH
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACOB LAVENDER, Trooper, Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Kelsey Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RHONDA FLEMING
Represented By: Kelsey Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF SAN ANTONIO
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN P. MACH, DPS, Chairman
Represented By: Kelsey Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIP AYALA
Represented By: Kelsey Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN C. MCCRAW, Director, Texas Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Kelsey Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY
Represented By: Kelsey Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENT COLEMAN, Trooper, Texas Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Kelsey Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: Kelsey Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RON NIRENBERG, Mayor, City of San Antonio
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT DRIGGERS, Trooper, Texas Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Kelsey Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES W. MYART, JR.
Represented By: James W. Myart Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?