Judith Gonzalez Rivera v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Petitioner: JUDITH MARISOL GONZALEZ RIVERA
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL and WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 19-60052
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 23, 2020 Judith Gonzalez Rivera v. William Barr, U. S. Atty

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/03/2019 for Petitioner Judith Marisol Gonzalez Rivera. [19-60052] (DDL) [Entered: 02/22/2019 01:18 PM]
February 21, 2019 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: We are sending to the parties a copy of the revised caption. [19-60052] (MCS) [Entered: 02/21/2019 12:23 PM]
February 21, 2019 IMMIGRATION RECORD FILED. [19-60052] (DOJ Executive Office of Immigration Review ) [Entered: 02/21/2019 07:18 AM]
February 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Salvador Colon for Petitioner Judith Marisol Gonzalez Rivera in 19-60052 [19-60052] (MCS) [Entered: 02/05/2019 03:57 PM]
February 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60052] (Salvador Colon ) [Entered: 02/04/2019 08:53 PM]
January 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Timothy Bo Stanton for party(s) Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General, in case 19-60052 [19-60052] (MCS) [Entered: 01/22/2019 03:55 PM]
January 22, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8966152-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-60052] (SEP) [Entered: 01/22/2019 01:02 PM]
January 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60052] (Timothy Bo Stanton ) [Entered: 01/22/2019 07:40 AM]
January 18, 2019 IMMIGRATION CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Ms. Judith Marisol Gonzalez Rivera. Date received in 5th Circuit: 01/17/2019. Immigration File Number: A208 988 808. Administrative Record due on 02/27/2019. [19-60052] (SEP) [Entered: 01/18/2019 08:01 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Judith Gonzalez Rivera v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JUDITH MARISOL GONZALEZ RIVERA
Represented By: Salvador Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Timothy Bo Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?