Ilyas Muradi v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Petitioner: ILYAS MURADI
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL and MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 19-60055
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Maris Liss for party(s) Petitioner Ilyas Muradi, in case 19-60055 [19-60055] (RLL) [Entered: 02/26/2019 12:54 PM]
February 26, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60055] (Maris Liss ) [Entered: 02/26/2019 09:58 AM]
February 22, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/03/2019 for Petitioner Ilyas Muradi. [19-60055] (DDL) [Entered: 02/22/2019 11:23 AM]
February 21, 2019 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: providing parties with revised caption to be used in all future filings. [19-60055] (RLL) [Entered: 02/21/2019 02:37 PM]
February 21, 2019 IMMIGRATION RECORD FILED. [19-60055] (DOJ Executive Office of Immigration Review ) [Entered: 02/21/2019 10:51 AM]
February 13, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Anthony Ogden Pottinger for party(s) Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General, in case 19-60055 [19-60055] (RLL) [Entered: 02/13/2019 02:41 PM]
February 13, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60055] (Anthony Ogden Pottinger ) [Entered: 02/13/2019 07:37 AM]
January 24, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Elizabeth Karen Fitzgerald-Sambou for party(s) Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General, in case 19-60055 [19-60055] (CB) [Entered: 01/24/2019 08:01 AM]
January 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60055] (Elizabeth Karen Fitzgerald-Sambou ) [Entered: 01/22/2019 03:28 PM]
January 22, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8965764-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-60055] (CB) [Entered: 01/22/2019 10:07 AM]
January 18, 2019 FEE PAID by Petitioner Mr. Ilyas Muradi. Fee deadline satisfied [19-60055] (CB) [Entered: 01/18/2019 11:55 AM]
January 18, 2019 IMMIGRATION CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Mr. Ilyas Muradi. Date received in 5th Circuit: 01/18/2019. Immigration File Number: a079 856 821 Fee due on 02/04/2019 for Petitioner Ilyas Muradi. Administrative Record due on 02/27/2019 [19-60055] (CB) [Entered: 01/18/2019 11:44 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ilyas Muradi v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Elizabeth Karen Fitzgerald-Sambou
Represented By: Anthony Ogden Pottinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ILYAS MURADI
Represented By: Maris Liss
Represented By: David Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?