Boubacar Sissoko v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Petitioner: BOUBACAR SISSOKO
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL and WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 19-60057
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 LETTER filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko requesting guidance on preparing a brief. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/20/2019 09:02 AM]
March 18, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Motion to Amend His Renewed Request for Stay of Removal Pending Review received 03/18/2019, from Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko, because the motion largely presents the same argument that has already been considered and ruled on. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/18/2019 11:12 AM]
March 11, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Exhibits received 03/11/2019, from Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko, because we are unable to determine the relief sought. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:38 AM]
March 8, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/17/2019, for Petitioner Boubacar Sissoko. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/08/2019 10:17 AM]
March 8, 2019 COURT ORDER granting motion to proceed IFP, filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko [ # 8966334-2 ] (IN DETAIL). [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/08/2019 10:12 AM]
March 8, 2019 COURT ORDER denying motion to expedite the proceeding, filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko [ # 8966344-2 ]. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/08/2019 10:05 AM]
March 6, 2019 COURT ORDER denying motion for leave to file a third amended motion for reconsideration of the January 28, 2019 court order denying the opposed motion for stay of deportation pending review, filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko [ # 8987818-2 ]. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/06/2019 08:21 AM]
March 4, 2019 MEMO IN SUPPORT of Motion to proceed IFP [ # 8966334-2 ] filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/07/2019 10:44 AM]
February 25, 2019 The Motion to proceed IFP filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko in 19-60057 [ # 8966334-2 ] has been made sufficient. Sufficient Motion deadline satisfied. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/06/2019 09:12 AM]
February 25, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the "Petitioner's Letter to Provide Informations to the Court" received 02/25/2019, from Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko, because we are unable to determine the relief sought. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/26/2019 01:21 PM]
February 22, 2019 COURT ORDER denying Motion for leave to file second amended motion for reconsideration filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko [ # 8983082-2 ] [19-60057] (RLL) [Entered: 02/22/2019 05:05 PM]
February 22, 2019 COURT ORDER denying Motion for reconsideration filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko [ # 8978240-2 ] [19-60057] (RLL) [Entered: 02/22/2019 05:02 PM]
February 20, 2019 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: Updated case caption sent to parties for use on all future filings in this case. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/20/2019 02:38 PM]
February 19, 2019 MOTION filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko for leave to file a third amended motion for reconsideration of the 01/28/2019 court order denying opposed motion for stay of deportation pending review [8987818-2]. Date of service: 02/14/2019. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/20/2019 09:40 AM]
February 14, 2019 SUFFICIENT MOTION REQUESTED: Motion to proceed IFP filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko in 19-60057 [ # 8966334-2 ], does not comply with FRAP 24(a)(1)(B) and (C). Sufficient Motion due on 03/07/2019, for Petitioner Boubacar Sissoko. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/14/2019 10:42 AM]
February 12, 2019 COURT ORDER granting motion for leave to file an amended motion for reconsideration of the January 28, 2019 court order denying the opposed motion for stay of deportation pending review, filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko [ # 8979590-2 ]. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/12/2019 04:10 PM]
February 12, 2019 IMMIGRATION RECORD FILED. [19-60057] (DOJ Executive Office of Immigration Review ) [Entered: 02/12/2019 12:47 PM]
February 11, 2019 "PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROVIDE INFORMATIONS TO THE COURT" treated as a LETTER filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko requesting guidance on whether the administrative record for prior case 18-60863 can be used in preparation of the petitioner's brief for this case [ # 8982283-2 ]. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/13/2019 10:10 AM]
February 11, 2019 MOTION filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko for leave to file a second amended motion for reconsideration of the 01/28/2019 court order denying opposed motion for stay of deportation pending review [8983082-2]. Date of service: 02/07/2019. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/13/2019 10:06 AM]
February 7, 2019 MOTION filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko for leave to file amended motion for reconsideration of the 01/28/2019 court order denying opposed motion for stay of deportation pending review [8979590-2]. Date of service: 02/04/2019. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/08/2019 08:37 AM]
February 4, 2019 MOTION filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko for reconsideration of the 01/28/2019 court order denying opposed motion for stay of deportation pending review, filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko in 19-60057 [ # 8966348-2 ] [8978240-2]. Date of service: 01/31/2019. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/06/2019 01:36 PM]
February 4, 2019 AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL STATUS filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko, in support of the motion to proceed IFP filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko in 19-60057 [ # 8966334-2 ]. Affidavit deadline satisfied. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/06/2019 01:16 PM]
January 28, 2019 COURT ORDER denying opposed motion for stay of deportation pending review, filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko [ # 8966348-2 ]. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:40 PM]
January 24, 2019 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [8968742-1] to the Motion for stay of deportation filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko in 19-60057 [ # 8966348-2 ], Motion to expedite appeal filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko in 19-60057 [ # 8966344-2 ]Response/Opposition deadline satisfied. Date of Service: 01/24/2019. [19-60057] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General [8968742-1] to the Motion for stay of deportation filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko [ # 8966348-2 ] Date of Service: 01/24/2019 via email - Attorney for Respondents: Bowen, OIL, Payne; US mail - Petitioner Sissoko. [19-60057] (Anthony Cardozo Payne ) [Entered: 01/24/2019 05:04 PM]
January 24, 2019 NOTICE OF INTENT TO DEPORT: The petitioner is currently in custody and is scheduled for removal, which will not occur prior to Tuesday, February 5, 2019. Date of Removal: 02/05/2019. Notice of Intent Due deadline satisfied. [19-60057] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DEPORT filed by Respondent Mr. Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General. The petitioner is currently in custody and is scheduled for removal. Date of Removal: 02/05/2019. Date of Service: 01/24/2019, via email - Attorney for Respondents: Bowen, OIL, Payne; US mail - Petitioner Sissoko. [19-60057] (Anthony Cardozo Payne ) [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:13 PM]
January 24, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Anthony Cardozo Payne for Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General, in case 19-60057. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 01/24/2019 01:38 PM]
January 24, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jennifer Arrington Bowen for Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General, in case 19-60057. [19-60057] (DLJ) [Entered: 01/24/2019 12:35 PM]
January 23, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-60057] (Anthony Cardozo Payne ) [Entered: 01/23/2019 10:33 AM]
January 23, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60057] (Jennifer Arrington Bowen ) [Entered: 01/23/2019 10:14 AM]
January 23, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8966872-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-60057] (CB) [Entered: 01/23/2019 09:23 AM]
January 22, 2019 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of Motion for stay of deportation [ # 8966348-2 ] filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko [19-60057] (CB) [Entered: 01/22/2019 02:54 PM]
January 22, 2019 MOTION filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko for stay of deportation [8966348-2] Notice of Intent Due on 01/28/2019 for Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General. Response/Opposition due on 02/01/2019. [19-60057] (CB) [Entered: 01/22/2019 02:52 PM]
January 22, 2019 MOTION filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko to expedite the petition for review. [8966344-2]. [19-60057] (CB) [Entered: 01/22/2019 02:49 PM]
January 22, 2019 MOTION filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko to appoint counsel [8966339-2]. [19-60057] (CB) [Entered: 01/22/2019 02:48 PM]
January 22, 2019 MOTION filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko to proceed in forma pauperis [8966334-2]. [19-60057] (CB) [Entered: 01/22/2019 02:46 PM]
January 22, 2019 IMMIGRATION CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Mr. Boubacar Sissoko. Date received in 5th Circuit: 01/22/2019. Immigration File Number: a209 482 819 Administrative Record due on 03/04/2019. Affidavit due on 02/12/2019 for Petitioner Boubacar Sissoko [19-60057] (CB) [Entered: 01/22/2019 02:42 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Boubacar Sissoko v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BOUBACAR SISSOKO
Represented By: Boubacar Sissoko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Anthony Cardozo Payne
Represented By: Jennifer Arrington Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?