Laiq Khan v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Petitioner: LAIQ KHAN
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL and WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 19-60059
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 11, 2020 Laiq Khan v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/10/2019 for Petitioner Laiq Khan. [19-60059] (DDL) [Entered: 03/01/2019 01:25 PM]
February 28, 2019 IMMIGRATION RECORD FILED. [19-60059] (DOJ Executive Office of Immigration Review ) [Entered: 02/28/2019 01:00 PM]
February 21, 2019 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: providing parties with revised caption to be used in all future filings. [19-60059] (RLL) [Entered: 02/21/2019 02:44 PM]
January 24, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Joanna Leigh Watson for party(s) Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General, in case 19-60059 [19-60059] (CB) [Entered: 01/24/2019 10:01 AM]
January 23, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8966942-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-60059] (CB) [Entered: 01/23/2019 10:04 AM]
January 23, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60059] (Joanna Leigh Watson ) [Entered: 01/23/2019 09:45 AM]
January 22, 2019 IMMIGRATION CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Mr. Laiq Khan. Date received in 5th Circuit: 01/22/2019. Immigration File Number: a209 159 340 Administrative Record due on 03/04/2019 [19-60059] (CB) [Entered: 01/22/2019 03:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Laiq Khan v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LAIQ KHAN
Represented By: Alfonso Otero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Joanna Leigh Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?