Billy Diaz v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Petitioner: BILLY ALEXANDER DIAZ, also known as Villi Alexander Flores Diaz
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL and MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 19-60074
Filed: January 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Matthew E. Price for Petitioner Billy Alexander Diaz in 19-60074. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. [19-60074] (SEP) [Entered: 03/29/2019 01:44 PM]
March 28, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Matthew E. Price for Mr. Billy Alexander Diaz for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60074] (Matthew E. Price ) [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:48 AM]
March 27, 2019 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 04/02/2019 for Petitioner Billy Alexander Diaz. [19-60074] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Petitioner Mr. Billy Alexander Diaz. Date of service: 03/27/2019 via email - Attorney for Respondents: Anderson, OIL; Attorney for Petitioners: Cherry, Price [19-60074] (Matthew E. Price ) [Entered: 03/27/2019 08:33 PM]
March 27, 2019 PETITIONER'S BRIEF FILED. Brief NOT Sufficient: An appearance form from counsel signing the brief is required (Attorney Matthew Price). Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0. A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 04/11/2019 for Petitioner Billy Alexander Diaz.. Respondent's Brief due on 04/26/2019 for Respondent William P. Barr, U. S. Attorney General. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/02/2019 for Petitioner Billy Alexander Diaz. [19-60074] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Billy Alexander Diaz. Date of service: 03/27/2019 via email - Attorney for Respondents: Anderson, OIL; Attorney for Petitioners: Cherry, Price [19-60074] (Matthew E. Price ) [Entered: 03/27/2019 08:30 PM]
March 18, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Andrew Brown Cherry for party(s) Petitioner Billy Alexander Diaz, in case 19-60074. [19-60074] (SEP) [Entered: 03/19/2019 10:37 AM]
March 18, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-60074] (Andrew Brown Cherry ) [Entered: 03/18/2019 10:55 AM]
March 1, 2019 SUPPLEMENTAL IMMIGRATION RECORD FILED. [19-60074] ( Office of Immigration Litigation ) [Entered: 03/01/2019 12:56 PM]
February 20, 2019 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: Advising parties of updated caption in light of new Attorney General. [19-60074] (SEP) [Entered: 02/20/2019 10:20 AM]
February 15, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/27/2019 for Petitioner Billy Alexander Diaz. [19-60074] (DDL) [Entered: 02/15/2019 03:42 PM]
February 15, 2019 IMMIGRATION RECORD FILED. [19-60074] (DOJ Executive Office of Immigration Review ) [Entered: 02/15/2019 01:21 PM]
February 4, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8975759-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-60074] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/04/2019 09:44 AM]
February 1, 2019 COURT ORDER granting opposed motion for stay of deportation pending review, filed by Petitioner Mr. Billy Alexander Diaz [ # 8973836-2 ]. [19-60074] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/01/2019 04:02 PM]
January 31, 2019 REPLY filed by Petitioner Mr. Billy Alexander Diaz [8974346-1] to the Response/Opposition filed by Respondent Mr. Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General [ # 8974247-2 ], to the Motion filed by Petitioner Mr. Billy Alexander Diaz [ # 8973836-2 ]. Date of Service: 01/31/2019 via email - Attorney for Respondents: Anderson, OIL; Attorney for Petitioner: Price. [19-60074] (Matthew E. Price ) [Entered: 01/31/2019 09:45 PM]
January 31, 2019 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General [8974247-1] to the Motion for stay of deportation filed by Petitioner Mr. Billy Alexander Diaz [ # 8973836-2 ] Date of Service: 01/31/2019 via email - Attorney for Respondents: Anderson, OIL; Attorney for Petitioner: Price. [19-60074] (Aric Allan Anderson ) [Entered: 01/31/2019 04:06 PM]
January 31, 2019 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of Motion for stay of deportation [ # 8973836-2 ] filed by Petitioner Mr. Billy Alexander Diaz. Date of Service: 01/31/2019. [19-60074] (DLJ) [Entered: 01/31/2019 02:25 PM]
January 31, 2019 OPPOSED MOTION for stay of deportation [8973836-2]. [19-60074] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: MOTION filed by Petitioner Mr. Billy Alexander Diaz for stay of deportation [8973836-2]. Date of service: 01/31/2019, via email - Attorney for Respondents: Anderson, OIL; Attorney for Petitioner: Price. [19-60074] (Matthew E. Price ) [Entered: 01/31/2019 01:01 PM]
January 31, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Aric Allan Anderson for party(s) Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General, in case 19-60074 [19-60074] (CB) [Entered: 01/31/2019 09:21 AM]
January 30, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60074] (Aric Allan Anderson ) [Entered: 01/30/2019 01:23 PM]
January 30, 2019 IMMIGRATION CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Mr. Billy Alexander Diaz. Date received in 5th Circuit: 01/30/2019. Immigration File Number: a071 773 952 Administrative Record due on 03/11/2019 [19-60074] (CB) [Entered: 01/30/2019 11:49 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Billy Diaz v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Aric Allan Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BILLY ALEXANDER DIAZ, also known as Villi Alexander Flores Diaz
Represented By: Matthew E. Price
Represented By: Andrew Brown Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?