Roberto Garcia Torres v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Petitioner: ROBERTO GARCIA TORRES
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL and WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 19-60085
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 LETTER filed referencing Motion for stay of deportation filed by Petitioner Mr. Roberto Garcia Torres in 19-60085 [ # 8995941-2 ]. [19-60085]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LETTER filed by Respondent Mr. William P. Barr, U. S. Attorney General referencing Motion filed by Petitioner Mr. Roberto Garcia Torres [ # 8995941-2 ]. Informing the Court that Petitioner was removed from the United States to Cuba on March 1, 2019. Date of Service: 03/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Respondents: Brady, OIL; Attorney for Petitioner: Thompson [19-60085] (Surell Brady ) [Entered: 03/01/2019 05:03 PM]
March 1, 2019 MOTION for stay of deportation [8995941-2]. Date of service: 03/01/2019 Document is insufficient for the following reasons: a certificate of compliance is required and the wrong party is listed throughout the motion as it reflects that the respondent is in custody [19-60085]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: MOTION filed by Petitioner Mr. Roberto Garcia Torres for stay of deportation [8995941-2]. Date of service: 03/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Respondents: Brady, OIL; Attorney for Petitioner: Thompson; US mail - Attorney for Respondent: Brady [19-60085] (Marvic Gonzalez Thompson ) [Entered: 03/01/2019 10:35 AM]
February 25, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/08/2019 for Petitioner Roberto Garcia Torres. [19-60085] (DDL) [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:16 PM]
February 25, 2019 IMMIGRATION RECORD FILED. [19-60085] (DOJ Executive Office of Immigration Review ) [Entered: 02/25/2019 01:30 PM]
February 21, 2019 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: providing parties with revised caption to be used in all future filings. [19-60085] (RLL) [Entered: 02/21/2019 03:30 PM]
February 7, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Surell Brady for party(s) Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General, in case 19-60085 [19-60085] (RLL) [Entered: 02/07/2019 12:46 PM]
February 6, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8978076-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-60085] (CB) [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:35 AM]
February 6, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60085] (Surell Brady ) [Entered: 02/06/2019 10:50 AM]
February 5, 2019 IMMIGRATION CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Mr. Roberto Garcia Torres. Date received in 5th Circuit: 02/04/2019. Immigration File Number: a216 567 090 Administrative Record due on 03/18/2019 [19-60085] (CB) [Entered: 02/05/2019 08:47 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Roberto Garcia Torres v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROBERTO GARCIA TORRES
Represented By: Marvic Gonzalez Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Surell Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?