Harman Singh v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Petitioner: HARMAN PREET SINGH
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL and WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 19-60098
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/17/2019 for Petitioner Harman Preet Singh. [19-60098] (DDL) [Entered: 03/08/2019 01:46 PM]
March 8, 2019 IMMIGRATION RECORD FILED. [19-60098] (DOJ Executive Office of Immigration Review ) [Entered: 03/08/2019 01:34 PM]
February 27, 2019 COURT ORDER denying Motion for stay of deportation filed by Petitioner Mr. Harman Preet Singh [ # 8983133-2 ] [19-60098] (MAS) [Entered: 02/27/2019 03:42 PM]
February 15, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8984898-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-60098] (AGL) [Entered: 02/15/2019 09:01 AM]
February 14, 2019 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [8984240-1] to the Motion for stay of deportation filed by Petitioner Mr. Harman Preet Singh in 19-60098 [ # 8983133-2 ]Response/Opposition deadline satisfied. [19-60098] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General [8984240-1] to the Motion filed by Petitioner Mr. Harman Preet Singh [ # 8983133-2 ] Date of Service: 02/14/2019 via email - Attorney for Petitioner: Gupta; Attorney for Respondents: OIL, Smith. [19-60098] (Katherine Ann Smith ) [Entered: 02/14/2019 11:49 AM]
February 14, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Katherine Ann Smith for party(s) Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General, in case 19-60098 [19-60098] (CB) [Entered: 02/14/2019 11:13 AM]
February 13, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60098] (Katherine Ann Smith ) [Entered: 02/13/2019 11:06 AM]
February 13, 2019 MOTION filed by Petitioner Mr. Harman Preet Singh for stay of deportation [8983133-2]. Date of service: 02/12/2019 Response/Opposition due on 02/25/2019. [19-60098] (AGL) [Entered: 02/13/2019 10:37 AM]
February 13, 2019 IMMIGRATION CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Mr. Harman Preet Singh. Date received in 5th Circuit: 02/12/2019. Immigration File Number: A216 403 760 Administrative Record due on 03/25/2019 [19-60098] (AGL) [Entered: 02/13/2019 10:32 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Harman Singh v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HARMAN PREET SINGH
Represented By: Viney K. Gupta Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Katherine Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?