Elizabeth Alexander, et al v. Global Tel Link Corporation, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JAI GIBSON, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, PATRICIA BROUSSARD, SANDRA GLASSMIRE, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, SHARON JOSEPH, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, MARY SESSUMS, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, JOHN P. ALEXANDER, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated and ELIZABETH R. ALEXANDER, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: CHRISTOPHER EPPS, GLOBAL TEL LINK CORPORATION and SAM WAGGONER
Case Number: 19-60287
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 5, 2020 Elizabeth Alexander, et al v. Global Tel Link Corp

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Ms. Elizabeth R. Alexander, Mr. John P. Alexander, Ms. Patricia Broussard, Ms. Jai Gibson, Ms. Sandra Glassmire, Ms. Sharon Joseph and Ms. Mary Sessums. Extension Granted to and including 07/25/2019. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 07/25/2019, for Appellants Elizabeth R. Alexander, John P. Alexander, Patricia Broussard, Jai Gibson, Sandra Glassmire, Sharon Joseph and Mary Sessums. [19-60287] (DLJ) [Entered: 06/25/2019 04:00 PM]
June 25, 2019 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Ms. Elizabeth R. Alexander, Mr. John P. Alexander, Ms. Patricia Broussard, Ms. Jai Gibson, Ms. Sandra Glassmire, Ms. Sharon Joseph and Ms. Mary Sessums for filing Extension to File Brief of Appellants until 07/25/2019 [19-60287] (Bradley S. Clanton ) [Entered: 06/25/2019 01:31 PM]
May 20, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Luther T. Munford for party Appellee Global Tel Link Corporation in case 19-60287 [19-60287] (AGL) [Entered: 05/20/2019 09:16 AM]
May 20, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Robert McKinley Frey for Appellee Global Tel Link Corporation, in case 19-60287. [19-60287] (DLJ) [Entered: 05/20/2019 08:32 AM]
May 20, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Patrick Ryan Beckett for Appellee Global Tel Link Corporation in 19-60287. [19-60287] (DLJ) [Entered: 05/20/2019 08:24 AM]
May 16, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-60287] (Robert McKinley Frey ) [Entered: 05/16/2019 11:11 AM]
May 16, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-60287] (Luther T. Munford ) [Entered: 05/16/2019 11:08 AM]
May 16, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60287] (Patrick Ryan Beckett ) [Entered: 05/16/2019 11:01 AM]
May 16, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/25/2019 for Appellants Elizabeth R. Alexander, John P. Alexander, Patricia Broussard, Jai Gibson, Sandra Glassmire, Sharon Joseph and Mary Sessums. [19-60287] (CB) [Entered: 05/16/2019 10:40 AM]
May 16, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-60287] (CB) [Entered: 05/16/2019 10:39 AM]
May 7, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:17-CV-560. Electronic ROA due on 05/22/2019. [19-60287] (MAS) [Entered: 05/07/2019 05:19 PM]
May 7, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9047402-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-60287] (MAS) [Entered: 05/07/2019 05:17 PM]
April 29, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Elizabeth R. Alexander, Mr. John P. Alexander, Ms. Patricia Broussard, Ms. Jai Gibson, Ms. Sandra Glassmire, Ms. Sharon Joseph and Ms. Mary Sessums [19-60287] (MAS) [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:38 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Elizabeth Alexander, et al v. Global Tel Link Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAI GIBSON, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Bradley S. Clanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PATRICIA BROUSSARD
Represented By: Bradley S. Clanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SANDRA GLASSMIRE, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Bradley S. Clanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHARON JOSEPH, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Bradley S. Clanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY SESSUMS, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Bradley S. Clanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN P. ALEXANDER, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Bradley S. Clanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELIZABETH R. ALEXANDER, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Bradley S. Clanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTOPHER EPPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GLOBAL TEL LINK CORPORATION
Represented By: Patrick Ryan Beckett
Represented By: Robert McKinley Frey
Represented By: Luther T. Munford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAM WAGGONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?