Flight Training Intl, Inc. v. FAA
Petitioner: FLIGHT TRAINING INTL, INC.
Respondent: FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 19-60317
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting unopposed motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42, filed by Petitioner Flight Training Intl, Inc. [ # 9083953-2 ]. [19-60317] (DLJ) [Entered: 06/25/2019 04:06 PM]
June 25, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Petitioner Flight Training Intl, Inc. to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 [9083953-2]. Date of service: 06/25/2019 via email - Attorney for Petitioner: Caughey; Attorney for Respondents: Kaersvang, Wright; US mail - Attorney for Respondent: Huerta; Attorney for Petitioner: Struble [19-60317] (Jennifer Vosko Caughey ) [Entered: 06/25/2019 03:26 PM]
June 17, 2019 AMENEDED APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jennifer Vosko Caughey for Petitioner Flight Training Intl, Inc. in 19-60317 [19-60317] (CB) [Entered: 06/17/2019 09:16 AM]
June 14, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60317] (Jennifer Vosko Caughey ) [Entered: 06/14/2019 11:46 AM]
May 31, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Dana Lydia Kaersvang for party(s) Respondent FAA, in case 19-60317. [19-60317] (CB) [Entered: 05/31/2019 11:24 AM]
May 30, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60317] (Dana Lydia Kaersvang ) [Entered: 05/30/2019 03:44 PM]
May 23, 2019 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Mark L. Walters is designated as inactive in this case. Reason: See letter filed 05/23/2019, requesting removal as counsel of record for Petitioner Flight Training Intl, Inc. [19-60317] (DLJ) [Entered: 05/23/2019 12:40 PM]
May 23, 2019 LETTER filed requesting removal of attorney Mr. Mark L. Walters as counsel of record in this case. Hereinafter, attorney Walters will not receive notifications of filings in this case, from this Court. [19-60317] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LETTER filed by Petitioner Flight Training Intl, Inc. Removal as counsel of record. Date of Service: 05/23/2019, via email - Attorney for Petitioners: Caughey, Walters; Attorney for Respondent: Wright; US mail - Attorney for Respondent: Huerta; Attorney for Petitioner: Struble. [19-60317] (Mark L. Walters ) [Entered: 05/23/2019 11:49 AM]
May 20, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jennifer Vosko Caughey for Petitioner Flight Training Intl, Inc., in case 19-60317. [19-60317] (DLJ) [Entered: 05/20/2019 08:09 AM]
May 16, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-60317] (Jennifer Vosko Caughey ) [Entered: 05/16/2019 03:58 PM]
May 16, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9054762-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-60317] (SEP) [Entered: 05/16/2019 02:50 PM]
May 16, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Abby Christine Wright for party(s) Respondent FAA, in case 19-60317 [19-60317] (CB) [Entered: 05/16/2019 02:03 PM]
May 16, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60317] (Abby Christine Wright ) [Entered: 05/16/2019 12:24 PM]
May 15, 2019 SIGNED PETITION FOR REVIEW FILED. [19-60317] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: SIGNED NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED filed by Petitioner Flight Training Intl, Inc. [19-60317] (Mark L. Walters ) [Entered: 05/15/2019 02:33 PM]
May 14, 2019 AGENCY CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Flight Training Intl, Inc. Date received in 5th Circuit: 05/10/2019. Administrative Record due on 06/24/2019. [19-60317] (SEP) [Entered: 05/14/2019 08:37 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flight Training Intl, Inc. v. FAA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FLIGHT TRAINING INTL, INC.
Represented By: Mark L. Walters
Represented By: James D. Struble
Represented By: James D. Struble Esq.
Represented By: Jennifer Vosko Caughey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Michael Peter Huerta
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Dana Lydia Kaersvang Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?