Family Rehabilitation, Inc. v. Alex Azar, II, Secretary HHS, et al
Defendant / Appellant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and SEEMA VERMA, Acting Administrator for the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Plaintiff / Appellee: FAMILY REHABILITATION, INCORPORATED, doing business as Family Care Texas, doing business as Angels Care Home Health
Case Number: 20-10271
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 COURT ORDER granting Motion to stay further proceedings in this court pending a resolution in Sahara Health Care Inc. v. Alex Azar, II, Secretary, et al No. 18-41120 filed by Appellant Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services [ # 9279595-2 ] [20-10271] (RAJ) [Entered: 03/30/2020 09:53 AM]
March 25, 2020 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services to stay further proceedings in this court. Reason: pending resolution of the same issue in Sahara Health Care v. Azar, No.18-41120 (5th Cir.) (argued Nov. 7, 2019). Date of service: 03/25/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Loegering, Plowman; Attorney for Appellant: Salzman [20-10271] (Joshua Marc Salzman ) [Entered: 03/25/2020 12:49 PM]
March 19, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9274874-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 04/03/2020 for Appellants Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and Seema Verma [20-10271] (RAJ) [Entered: 03/19/2020 10:35 AM]
March 19, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Joshua Marc Salzman for party(s) Appellant Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, in case 20-10271 [20-10271] (RAJ) [Entered: 03/19/2020 08:38 AM]
March 18, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10271] (Joshua Marc Salzman ) [Entered: 03/18/2020 01:40 PM]
March 12, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and Ms. Seema Verma [20-10271] (CAG) [Entered: 03/12/2020 02:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Family Rehabilitation, Inc. v. Alex Azar, II, Secretary HHS, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Nicholas Cartier
Represented By: Joshua Marc Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SEEMA VERMA, Acting Administrator for the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Represented By: Nicholas Cartier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FAMILY REHABILITATION, INCORPORATED, doing business as Family Care Texas, doing business as Angels Care Home Health
Represented By: Weston C. Loegering
Represented By: James A. Cox
Represented By: Rebekah N. Plowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?