FFGGP, Incorporated. v. Specialized Loan Servicing
Plaintiff / Appellant: FFGGP, INCORPORATED., a Delaware Corporation as Trustee for the Fairway Park 2775 Land Trust
Defendant / Appellee: SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C., a Delaware Limited Liability Company
Case Number: 20-10378
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 17, 2020 FFGGP, Incorporated. v. Specialized Loan Servicing

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/22/2020 for Appellant FFGGP, Incorporated.. [20-10378] (DDL) [Entered: 05/13/2020 10:12 AM]
May 13, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-10378] (DDL) [Entered: 05/13/2020 10:11 AM]
May 8, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Branch Masterson Sheppard for Appellee Specialized Loan Servicing, L.L.C. in 20-10378 [20-10378] (RSM) [Entered: 05/08/2020 11:13 AM]
May 7, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Branch Masterson Sheppard for Specialized Loan Servicing, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10378] (Branch Masterson Sheppard ) [Entered: 05/07/2020 01:00 PM]
May 4, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:18-CV-875. Electronic ROA due on 05/19/2020. [20-10378] (MBC) [Entered: 05/04/2020 04:17 PM]
May 4, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Kenneth Stuart Harter for Appellant FFGGP, Incorporated. in 20-10378 [20-10378] (RSM) [Entered: 05/04/2020 10:24 AM]
May 2, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [20-10378] No hearings. REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant FFGGP, Incorporated. advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 05/02/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Harter; Attorney for Appellee: Sheppard [20-10378] (Kenneth Stuart Harter ) [Entered: 05/02/2020 01:06 PM]
May 2, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10378] (Kenneth Stuart Harter ) [Entered: 05/02/2020 01:04 PM]
April 15, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9294126-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 04/30/2020 for Appellant FFGGP, Incorporated. [20-10378] (MRW) [Entered: 04/15/2020 04:13 PM]
April 9, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant FFGGP, Incorporated. [20-10378] (MBC) [Entered: 04/09/2020 01:08 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: FFGGP, Incorporated. v. Specialized Loan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FFGGP, INCORPORATED., a Delaware Corporation as Trustee for the Fairway Park 2775 Land Trust
Represented By: Kenneth Stuart Harter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C., a Delaware Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Branch Masterson Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?