Darla Davis v. HUD
Plaintiff / Appellant: Darla Davis, and the Unknnown Heirs of Sedalia Johnson, Deceased
Defendant / Appellee: United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, C/O HUD C/O NOVAD MANAGEMENT CONSULTING, L.L.C.
Case Number: 20-10794
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 11/12/2020 for Appellant Darla Davis. [20-10794] (MRW) [Entered: 10/02/2020 11:59 AM]
October 2, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-10794] (MRW) [Entered: 10/02/2020 11:59 AM]
September 28, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:20-CV-320. Electronic ROA due on 10/13/2020. [20-10794] (MVM) [Entered: 09/28/2020 12:58 PM]
September 28, 2020 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 09/08/2020 granting IFP for Appellant Ms. Darla Davis.Fee deadline satisfied [20-10794] (MVM) [Entered: 09/28/2020 12:57 PM]
September 4, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Mary M. Watkins Cherry for Appellee HUD in 20-10794 [20-10794] (MVM) [Entered: 09/04/2020 09:44 AM]
September 3, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10794] (Mary M. Watkins Cherry ) [Entered: 09/03/2020 08:59 AM]
September 2, 2020 UPDATED CASE PROCESSING NOTICE sent. [20-10794] (MVM) [Entered: 09/02/2020 11:26 AM]
August 12, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9375877-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 08/27/2020 for Appellant Darla Davis [20-10794] (MVM) [Entered: 08/12/2020 12:06 PM]
August 10, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Mary M. Watkins Cherry for Appellee HUD in 20-10794 [20-10794] (CNF) [Entered: 08/10/2020 12:32 PM]
August 7, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10794] (Mary M. Watkins Cherry ) [Entered: 08/07/2020 12:37 PM]
August 6, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Darla Davis [20-10794] (RAJ) [Entered: 08/06/2020 09:08 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Darla Davis v. HUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Darla Davis, and the Unknnown Heirs of Sedalia Johnson, Deceased
Represented By: Darla Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, C/O HUD C/O NOVAD MANAGEMENT CONSULTING, L.L.C.
Represented By: Mary M. Watkins Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?