Robert Cledera v. United States, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Kevin K. McAleenan, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Will Johnson, Arlington Police Department, Arlington, Texas, Dominique Artis, Dallas Fire Department, Dallas, Texas, Charles Edge, Ellis County Sheriff, LG Electronics, USA Incorporated, U. Renee Hall, Dallas Police Department, Dallas, Texas, Gregory Fellows, Menifee Police Department, Menifee, California, William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General, Ryan Holt, Waco Police Department, Waco, Texas, Target Corporation, Steve Dye, Grand Prairie Police Department, Grand Prairie, Texas, HomePro Operating, L.L.C., Gary C. Thomas, Dallas Area Rapid Transit, City of Mansfield, Apple, Incorporated, United States, City of Grand Prairie, RING (Amazon.com, Incorporated), Walmart, Incorporated, ARLO (Arlo Technologies, Incorporated), Brian Manley, Austin Police Department, Austin, Texas, James McHenry, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Tracy Aaron, Mansfield Police Department, Mansfield, Texas, Robert Fite, Grand Prairie Fire Department, Grand Prairie, Texas, Best Buy Company, Incorporated, Home Depot Product Authority, L.L.C., Menifee Police Department, Steven McCraw, Texas Department of Public Safety, Verizon Communications, Incorporated and Walt Disney Company
Plaintiff / Appellant: Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera
Case Number: 20-10914
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Tab Henry Keener for Appellee Verizon Communications, Incorporated in 20-10914 [20-10914] (CBW) [Entered: 10/29/2020 04:54 PM]
October 29, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Tab Henry Keener for Verizon Communications, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10914] (Tab Henry Keener ) [Entered: 10/29/2020 11:11 AM]
October 20, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Aaron George Stendell for party(s) Appellee Walmart, Incorporated, in case 20-10914 [20-10914] (CBW) [Entered: 10/20/2020 04:20 PM]
October 19, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10914] (Aaron George Stendell ) [Entered: 10/19/2020 01:04 PM]
October 13, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Michael Edward Coles for Appellee HomePro Operating, L.L.C. in 20-10914 [20-10914] (MVM) [Entered: 10/13/2020 08:20 AM]
October 8, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Michael Edward Coles, Esq. for HomePro Operating, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10914] (Michael Edward Coles ) [Entered: 10/08/2020 04:55 PM]
October 8, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Robert A. Ewert for Appellee Home Depot Product Authority, L.L.C. in 20-10914 [20-10914] (MVM) [Entered: 10/08/2020 10:34 AM]
October 8, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Donna C. Peavler for Appellee Target Corporation in 20-10914, Attorney Donna C. Peavler for Appellee Best Buy Company, Incorporated in 20-10914 [20-10914] (MVM) [Entered: 10/08/2020 10:22 AM]
October 8, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10914] (Robert A. Ewert ) [Entered: 10/08/2020 09:21 AM]
October 8, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Elizabeth Aten Lamberson for Appellee HomePro Operating, L.L.C. in 20-10914 [20-10914] (MVM) [Entered: 10/08/2020 08:21 AM]
October 7, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10914] (Donna C. Peavler ) [Entered: 10/07/2020 04:43 PM]
October 7, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Ryan Spear for party(s) Appellee RING (Amazon.com, Incorporated), in case 20-10914 [20-10914] (CB) [Entered: 10/07/2020 11:02 AM]
October 7, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10914] (Elizabeth Aten Lamberson ) [Entered: 10/07/2020 08:16 AM]
October 7, 2020 Attorney Tab Henry Kenner for Cellco Paternship (Verizon) is advised to resubmit an appearance form as the party we have listed on the docket is Verizon Communications, Inc. If counsel would like to have the party corrected on the docket a motion would be necessary. [20-10914] (MVM) [Entered: 10/07/2020 07:43 AM]
October 6, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Tab Henry Keener for Verizon Communications, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10914] (Tab Henry Keener ) [Entered: 10/06/2020 12:37 PM]
October 5, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 11/16/2020 for Appellant Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera. [20-10914] (DDL) [Entered: 10/05/2020 01:37 PM]
October 5, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-10914] (DDL) [Entered: 10/05/2020 01:36 PM]
October 2, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10914] (Ryan Spear ) [Entered: 10/02/2020 08:55 PM]
October 1, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Derek Shane Davis for Appellee Walmart, Incorporated in 20-10914 [20-10914] (CNF) [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:29 PM]
October 1, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Derek Shane Davis for Walmart, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10914] (Derek Shane Davis ) [Entered: 10/01/2020 12:50 PM]
September 30, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Roy Lee Barrett for Appellee Ryan Holt in 20-10914 [20-10914] (RAJ) [Entered: 09/30/2020 09:59 AM]
September 30, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Joe Anthony Rivera for party(s) Appellee Ryan Holt, in case 20-10914 [20-10914] (RAJ) [Entered: 09/30/2020 09:54 AM]
September 29, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Skyler Howton for party(s) Appellee RING (Amazon.com, Incorporated), in case 20-10914 [20-10914] (LEF) [Entered: 09/29/2020 04:45 PM]
September 29, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Skyler Howton for ARLO (Arlo Technologies, Incorporated) for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10914] (Skyler Howton ) [Entered: 09/29/2020 03:28 PM]
September 29, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Roy Lee Barrett for Mr. Ryan Holt for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10914] (Roy Lee Barrett ) [Entered: 09/29/2020 01:20 PM]
September 29, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10914] (Joe Anthony Rivera ) [Entered: 09/29/2020 01:17 PM]
September 29, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michelle Elaine Robberson for party(s) Appellee Walmart, Incorporated, in case 20-10914 [20-10914] (MVM) [Entered: 09/29/2020 10:17 AM]
September 29, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Devin Quaalon Alexander for party(s) Appellee U. Renee Hall Appellee Dominique Artis, in case 20-10914 [20-10914] (MVM) [Entered: 09/29/2020 10:11 AM]
September 28, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10914] (Michelle Elaine Robberson ) [Entered: 09/28/2020 02:57 PM]
September 25, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Sameer Singh Birring for Appellee Brian Manley in 20-10914 [20-10914] (MRW) [Entered: 09/25/2020 11:58 AM]
September 25, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) James Bickford Pinson for party(s) Appellee U. Renee Hall Appellee Dominique Artis, in case 20-10914 [20-10914] (MRW) [Entered: 09/25/2020 11:56 AM]
September 25, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Tatia R. Wilson for Appellee Dominique Artis in 20-10914, Attorney Tatia R. Wilson for Appellee U. Renee Hall in 20-10914 [20-10914] (MRW) [Entered: 09/25/2020 11:53 AM]
September 24, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10914] (Devin Quaalon Alexander ) [Entered: 09/24/2020 04:31 PM]
September 24, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Robert Harris Fugate for Appellee Will Johnson in 20-10914 [20-10914] (MRW) [Entered: 09/24/2020 02:03 PM]
September 24, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Nicholas Dane Palmer for party(s) Appellee U. Renee Hall Appellee Dominique Artis, in case 20-10914 [20-10914] (MRW) [Entered: 09/24/2020 02:01 PM]
September 24, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Cynthia Jane Withers for party(s) Appellee Will Johnson, in case 20-10914 [20-10914] (MRW) [Entered: 09/24/2020 01:57 PM]
September 24, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kelsey Warren for party(s) Appellee Steven McCraw, in case 20-10914 [20-10914] (MVM) [Entered: 09/24/2020 07:33 AM]
September 23, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10914] (Tatia R. Wilson ) [Entered: 09/23/2020 05:35 PM]
September 23, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10914] (James Bickford Pinson ) [Entered: 09/23/2020 04:52 PM]
September 23, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10914] (Sameer Singh Birring ) [Entered: 09/23/2020 04:12 PM]
September 23, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Kelsey Warren for Mr. Steven McCraw for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10914] (Kelsey Warren ) [Entered: 09/23/2020 02:24 PM]
September 23, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10914] (Cynthia Jane Withers ) [Entered: 09/23/2020 12:50 PM]
September 23, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10914] (Nicholas Dane Palmer ) [Entered: 09/23/2020 11:47 AM]
September 23, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10914] (Robert Harris Fugate ) [Entered: 09/23/2020 11:30 AM]
September 21, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Christopher Michael Boeck for Appellee Walt Disney Company in 20-10914 [20-10914] (MVM) [Entered: 09/21/2020 03:26 PM]
September 21, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [20-10914] (AS) [Entered: 09/21/2020 02:19 PM]
September 21, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney James Thomas Jeffrey Jr. for Appellee City of Mansfield in 20-10914, Attorney James Thomas Jeffrey Jr. for Appellee City of Grand Prairie in 20-10914, Attorney James Thomas Jeffrey Jr. for Appellee Tracy Aaron in 20-10914, Attorney James Thomas Jeffrey Jr. for Appellee Robert Fite in 20-10914, Attorney James Thomas Jeffrey Jr. for Appellee Steve Dye in 20-10914 [20-10914] (MVM) [Entered: 09/21/2020 11:12 AM]
September 21, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jana H. Taylor for Appellee LG Electronics, USA Incorporated in 20-10914 [20-10914] (MVM) [Entered: 09/21/2020 11:05 AM]
September 18, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Christopher Michael Boeck for Walt Disney Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10914] (Christopher Michael Boeck ) [Entered: 09/18/2020 03:47 PM]
September 18, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Brian Walters Stoltz for Appellee Kevin K. McAleenan, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security in 20-10914, Attorney Brian Walters Stoltz for Appellee James McHenry in 20-10914, Attorney Brian Walters Stoltz for Appellee William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General in 20-10914, Attorney Brian Walters Stoltz for Appellee United States in 20-10914 [20-10914] (MVM) [Entered: 09/18/2020 02:09 PM]
September 18, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney David Randall Montgomery for Appellee Charles Edge in 20-10914 [20-10914] (MVM) [Entered: 09/18/2020 11:07 AM]
September 18, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10914] (Jana H. Taylor ) [Entered: 09/18/2020 10:14 AM]
September 18, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. James Thomas Jeffrey, Jr., Esq. for Ms. Tracy Aaron, City of Grand Prairie, City of Mansfield, Mr. Steve Dye and Mr. Robert Fite for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10914] (James Thomas Jeffrey Jr.) [Entered: 09/18/2020 09:21 AM]
September 17, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Brian Walters Stoltz for Mr. William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General, Mr. Kevin K. McAleenan, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Mr. James McHenry and United States for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10914] (Brian Walters Stoltz ) [Entered: 09/17/2020 02:57 PM]
September 17, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10914] (David Randall Montgomery ) [Entered: 09/17/2020 01:42 PM]
September 17, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney William Gray Cochran for Appellee Apple, Incorporated in 20-10914 [20-10914] (MAS) [Entered: 09/17/2020 01:25 PM]
September 17, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Skyler Howton for Appellee ARLO (Arlo Technologies, Incorporated) in 20-10914 [20-10914] (MAS) [Entered: 09/17/2020 01:23 PM]
September 17, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Skyler Howton for ARLO (Arlo Technologies, Incorporated) for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10914] (Skyler Howton ) [Entered: 09/17/2020 12:35 PM]
September 17, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. William Gray Cochran for Apple, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10914] (William Gray Cochran ) [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:53 AM]
September 17, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:19-CV-1997. Electronic ROA due on 10/02/2020. [20-10914] (CB) [Entered: 09/17/2020 09:45 AM]
September 17, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9401870-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-10914] (CB) [Entered: 09/17/2020 09:42 AM]
September 8, 2020 CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera [20-10914] (LEF) [Entered: 09/08/2020 10:11 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Robert Cledera v. United States, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kevin K. McAleenan, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Brian Walters Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Will Johnson, Arlington Police Department, Arlington, Texas
Represented By: Robert Harris Fugate
Represented By: Cynthia Jane Withers Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dominique Artis, Dallas Fire Department, Dallas, Texas
Represented By: Tatia R. Wilson
Represented By: James Bickford Pinson
Represented By: Devin Quaalon Alexander
Represented By: Nicholas Dane Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Charles Edge, Ellis County Sheriff
Represented By: David Randall Montgomery Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LG Electronics, USA Incorporated
Represented By: Jana H. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U. Renee Hall, Dallas Police Department, Dallas, Texas
Represented By: Tatia R. Wilson
Represented By: James Bickford Pinson
Represented By: Devin Quaalon Alexander
Represented By: Nicholas Dane Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gregory Fellows, Menifee Police Department, Menifee, California
Represented By: David R. Reeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General
Represented By: Brian Walters Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ryan Holt, Waco Police Department, Waco, Texas
Represented By: Roy Lee Barrett
Represented By: Joe Anthony Rivera Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Target Corporation
Represented By: Donna C. Peavler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Steve Dye, Grand Prairie Police Department, Grand Prairie, Texas
Represented By: James Thomas Jeffrey Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HomePro Operating, L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael Edward Coles Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth Aten Lamberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gary C. Thomas, Dallas Area Rapid Transit
Represented By: Harold R. McKeever Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of Mansfield
Represented By: James Thomas Jeffrey Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Apple, Incorporated
Represented By: William Gray Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States
Represented By: Brian Walters Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of Grand Prairie
Represented By: James Thomas Jeffrey Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RING (Amazon.com, Incorporated)
Represented By: Skyler Howton
Represented By: Ryan Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Walmart, Incorporated
Represented By: Derek Shane Davis
Represented By: Aaron George Stendell Esq.
Represented By: Michelle Elaine Robberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARLO (Arlo Technologies, Incorporated)
Represented By: Skyler Howton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brian Manley, Austin Police Department, Austin, Texas
Represented By: Sameer Singh Birring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James McHenry, Executive Office for Immigration Review
Represented By: Brian Walters Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tracy Aaron, Mansfield Police Department, Mansfield, Texas
Represented By: James Thomas Jeffrey Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert Fite, Grand Prairie Fire Department, Grand Prairie, Texas
Represented By: James Thomas Jeffrey Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Best Buy Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Donna C. Peavler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Home Depot Product Authority, L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert A. Ewert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Menifee Police Department
Represented By: David R. Reeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Steven McCraw, Texas Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Kelsey Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Verizon Communications, Incorporated
Represented By: Tab Henry Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Walt Disney Company
Represented By: Christopher Michael Boeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera
Represented By: Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?