Abet Life, Incorporated v. Alex Azar, II
Defendant / Appellee: Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff / Appellant: Abet Life, Incorporated
Case Number: 20-20399
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 CLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Abet Life, Incorporated [ # 9393514-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 10/08/2020 for Appellant Abet Life, Incorporated [20-20399] (SDH) [Entered: 09/08/2020 03:48 PM]
September 4, 2020 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Abet Life, Incorporated to extend time to file brief as appellant [9393514-2]. Date of service: 09/04/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Kennedy, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Klein, Schoen, Vela [20-20399] (Calvin Trey Scott ) [Entered: 09/04/2020 02:01 PM]
August 17, 2020 COURT ORDER DENYING Appellant's motion for injunction pending appeal [ # 9364250-2 ]. [20-20399] (CAG) [Entered: 08/17/2020 10:49 AM]
August 12, 2020 REPLY filed by Appellant Abet Life, Incorporated [9376416-1] to the Response/Opposition filed by Appellee Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services [ # 9371123-2 ]. Date of Service: 08/12/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Kennedy, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Klein, Schoen, Vela. [20-20399] (Mark S. Kennedy ) [Entered: 08/12/2020 07:38 PM]
August 6, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Mark S. Kennedy for Appellant Abet Life, Incorporated in 20-20399 [20-20399] (CAG) [Entered: 08/06/2020 04:10 PM]
August 6, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Calvin Trey Scott for party(s) Appellant Abet Life, Incorporated, in case 20-20399 [20-20399] (CAG) [Entered: 08/06/2020 04:09 PM]
August 6, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Mark S. Kennedy, Esq. for Abet Life, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-20399] (Mark S. Kennedy ) [Entered: 08/06/2020 02:00 PM]
August 6, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-20399] (Calvin Trey Scott ) [Entered: 08/06/2020 01:56 PM]
August 5, 2020 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services [9371123-1] to the Motion filed by Appellant Abet Life, Incorporated [ # 9364250-2 ] Date of Service: 08/05/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Kennedy; Attorney for Appellees: Klein, Schoen, Vela. [20-20399] (Karen Schoen ) [Entered: 08/05/2020 11:21 AM]
July 30, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Alisa Beth Klein for party(s) Appellee Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, in case 20-20399 [20-20399] (MRW) [Entered: 07/30/2020 07:42 AM]
July 29, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/08/2020 for Appellant Abet Life, Incorporated. [20-20399] (MRW) [Entered: 07/29/2020 07:31 AM]
July 28, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-20399] (MRW) [Entered: 07/28/2020 04:27 PM]
July 28, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Karen Schoen for party(s) Appellee Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, in case 20-20399 [20-20399] (ABT) [Entered: 07/28/2020 02:30 PM]
July 28, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-20399] (Karen Schoen ) [Entered: 07/28/2020 09:43 AM]
July 28, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:20-CV-1169. Electronic ROA due on 08/12/2020. [20-20399] (MAS) [Entered: 07/28/2020 08:51 AM]
July 28, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9364453-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-20399] (MAS) [Entered: 07/28/2020 08:48 AM]
July 27, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-20399] (Alisa Beth Klein ) [Entered: 07/27/2020 05:05 PM]
July 27, 2020 OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Abet Life, Incorporated for injunction pending appeal [9364250-2] Ruling is requested by: 08/17/2020. Date of service: 07/27/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Kennedy; Attorney for Appellee: Vela [20-20399] (Mark S. Kennedy ) [Entered: 07/27/2020 04:57 PM]
July 27, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Abet Life, Incorporated [20-20399] (ABT) [Entered: 07/27/2020 09:22 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Abet Life, Incorporated v. Alex Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Karen Schoen
Represented By: Jose Vela Jr.
Represented By: Alisa Beth Klein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Abet Life, Incorporated
Represented By: Mark S. Kennedy Esq.
Represented By: Calvin Trey Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?