Richard Winfrey, Jr., et al v. San Jacinto County
Plaintiff / Appellee: Richard Winfrey, Jr. and Megan Winfrey
Defendant / Appellant: Lenard Johnson, Former San Jacinto County Sheriff's Department Deputy
Case Number: 20-20477
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 NO COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT RECEIVED for Mr. Dion Rupa. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Dion Rupa, Dt. Ct. Rprt. Time Begins: 10/05/2020. Transcript deadlines created - Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment deadline canceled. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 11/04/2020 for Dion Rupa [20-20477] (SDH) [Entered: 10/23/2020 10:06 AM]
October 23, 2020 NO COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT RECEIVED for Mr. Fred E. Warner. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Fred E. Warner, Dt. Ct. Rprt. Time Begins: 10/07/2020. Transcript deadlines created - Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment deadline canceled. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 11/06/2020 for Fred E. Warner, Court Reporter [20-20477] (SDH) [Entered: 10/23/2020 10:17 AM]
October 9, 2020 ACKNOWLEDGMENT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Nichole Forrest, Est. Completion Dt: 11/09/2020, Est. No.of Pgs: 1100, Dt. Fin Arrangements Made: 10/06/2020, Dt. Trans. to be Filed: 11/05/2020, Proceeding Type and Date: Jury Trial 02/03/2020 - 02/13/2020. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment ddl satisfied. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 11/05/2020 for Nichole Forrest, Court Reporter [20-20477] (JMW) [Entered: 10/09/2020 01:19 PM]
October 9, 2020 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Court Reporter Ms. Nichole Forrest. [20-20477] (Nichole Forrest ) [Entered: 10/09/2020 01:14 PM]
October 7, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Lenard Johnson. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Fred E. Warner, Proceeding Type and Date: Hearing 09/11/2018. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 10/15/2020 for Fred Warner, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9413070-2 ] [20-20477] (JMW) [Entered: 10/07/2020 09:52 AM]
October 6, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney William S. Helfand for Appellant Lenard Johnson in 20-20477 [20-20477] (CCR) [Entered: 10/06/2020 10:30 AM]
October 6, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Norman Ray Giles for party(s) Appellant Lenard Johnson, in case 20-20477 [20-20477] (CCR) [Entered: 10/06/2020 10:33 AM]
October 5, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Lenard Johnson. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Nichole Forrest, Proceeding Type and Date: Jury Trial 02/03/2020 - 02/13/2020. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 10/15/2020 for Nichole Forrest, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9413089-2 ], [ # 9413095-2 ], [ # 9413097-2 ] [20-20477] (CCR) [Entered: 10/05/2020 09:29 AM]
October 5, 2020 ACKNOWLEDGMENT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Laura Wells, Est. Completion Dt: 10/15/2020, Est. No.of Pgs: 30, Dt. Fin Arrangements Made: 09/24/2020, Dt. Trans. to be Filed: 10/15/2020, Proceeding Type and Date: Jury Trial 02/13/2020 , Jury Trial 02/18/2020. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment ddl satisfied. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 10/05/2020 for Laura Wells, Court Reporter [20-20477] (CCR) [Entered: 10/05/2020 09:38 AM]
October 5, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Lenard Johnson. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Dion Rupa, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Conference 10/15/2019 , Motion Hearing 12/03/2019 , Docket Call 01/09/2020. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 10/15/2020 for Dion Rupa. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9413077-2 ] [20-20477] (CCR) [Entered: 10/05/2020 01:31 PM]
October 5, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Lenard Johnson. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Laura Wells, Proceeding Type and Date: Jury Trial 02/13/2020 , Jury Trial 02/18/2020. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 10/15/2020 for Laura Wells, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9413082-2 ] [20-20477] (CCR) [Entered: 10/05/2020 09:25 AM]
October 5, 2020 TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Laura Wells, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 10/02/2020 Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date canceled [20-20477] (CCR) [Entered: 10/05/2020 09:40 AM]
October 2, 2020 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Laura Wells. [20-20477] (Laura Wells ) [Entered: 10/02/2020 04:09 PM]
October 2, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Norman Ray Giles for Mr. Lenard Johnson for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-20477] (Norman Ray Giles ) [Entered: 10/02/2020 11:25 AM]
October 2, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. William S. Helfand for Mr. Lenard Johnson for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-20477] (William S. Helfand ) [Entered: 10/02/2020 11:23 AM]
October 2, 2020 Attorney William Helfand added as counsel of record for Appellant Lenard Johnson in 20-20477 [20-20477] (JMW) [Entered: 10/02/2020 10:53 AM]
October 2, 2020 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Mr. Lenard Johnson Argument heard on 5th Circuit Opinion for the Court to process. Date of service: 10/02/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Giles, Helfand; Attorney for Appellee: Wang. [20-20477] (Norman Ray Giles ) [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:28 PM]
October 2, 2020 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Mr. Lenard Johnson ERO for the Court to process. Date of service: 10/02/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Giles, Helfand; Attorney for Appellee: Wang. [20-20477] (Norman Ray Giles ) [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:31 PM]
October 2, 2020 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Mr. Lenard Johnson Transcript of day 9 of jury trial for the Court to process. Date of service: 10/02/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Giles, Helfand; Attorney for Appellee: Wang. [20-20477] (Norman Ray Giles ) [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:42 PM]
October 2, 2020 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Mr. Lenard Johnson Transcript of days 5, 6, 7 and 8 of jury trial for the Court to process. Date of service: 10/02/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Giles, Helfand; Attorney for Appellee: Wang. [20-20477] (Norman Ray Giles ) [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:41 PM]
October 2, 2020 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Mr. Lenard Johnson Transcript of days 1, 2, 3 and 4 of jury trial for the Court to process. Date of service: 10/02/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Giles, Helfand; Attorney for Appellee: Wang. [20-20477] (Norman Ray Giles ) [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:39 PM]
October 2, 2020 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Mr. Lenard Johnson Transcript of day 9 and 10 of jury trial for the Court to process. Date of service: 10/02/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Giles, Helfand; Attorney for Appellee: Wang. [20-20477] (Norman Ray Giles ) [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:34 PM]
September 22, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9405396-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 10/07/2020 for Appellant Lenard Johnson [20-20477] (JMW) [Entered: 09/22/2020 02:12 PM]
September 14, 2020 CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Lenard Johnson [20-20477] (ABT) [Entered: 09/14/2020 07:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Richard Winfrey, Jr., et al v. San Jacinto County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Richard Winfrey, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Wang Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Megan Winfrey
Represented By: Elizabeth Wang Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Lenard Johnson, Former San Jacinto County Sheriff's Department Deputy
Represented By: Norman Ray Giles
Represented By: William S. Helfand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?